Metropolitan Life Insurance Company v. Johnson et al
Plaintiff: |
Metropolitan Life Insurance Company |
Defendant: |
George H. Johnson, Jamie Johnson and Jennifer Johnson |
Case Number: |
1:2014cv00811 |
Filed: |
March 19, 2014 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Colorado |
Office: |
Denver Office |
County: |
XX US, Outside State |
Presiding Judge: |
Kristen L. Mix |
Nature of Suit: |
Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974 |
Cause of Action: |
29 U.S.C. § 1001 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
April 29, 2015 |
Filing
35
ORDER; Defendant George J. Johnson's (Movant) Motion for Default Judgment Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 55(b) Against Co-Defendants Jamie Johnson and Jennifer Johnson 34 and the Brief in Support of Motion forDefault Judgment Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ .P. 55(b) Against Co-Defendants JamieJohnson and Jennifer Johnson [34-1] is GRANTED. The Clerk of the Court shall enter JUDGMENT in favor of Defendant George H. Johnson declaring that Defendants Jennifer and Jamie Johnson have defaulted in this inte rpleader action and have thereby waived any entitlement to payment of the proceeds of the benefits of the Federal Employees Group Life Insurance Policy payable as a result of the death of Bruce R. Johnson. The Clerk of the Court shall distribute the funds deposited by Plaintiff into the Courts Registry, see Receipt 32 , in the amount of $343,653.78 to Defendant George H. Johnson. As this Order resolves all remaining issues in this case, IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall close this case, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 4/29/15.(morti, )
|
September 2, 2014 |
Filing
25
MINUTE ORDER; Defendant George Johnsons Unopposed Motion For Clerks Entry of Default Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 55(a) and For Default Judgment Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 5(b) Against Co-Defendants Jamie Johnson and JenniferJohnson 22 is DENIED without prejudice, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 9/2/14.(morti, )
|
June 17, 2014 |
Filing
21
MINUTE ORDER granting 20 Unopposed Motion to Vacate June 23, 2014 Scheduling Conference and for Extension or Suspension of Scheduling Deadlines. Scheduling Conference reset for 9/16/2014 11:00 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 6/17/2014. (eseam)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?