Kemp v. Falk et al
Defendant: John Suthers
Petitioner: Glenn H. Kemp
Respondent: James Falk
Case Number: 1:2014cv00821
Filed: March 20, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Arapahoe
Presiding Judge: Richard P. Matsch
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Final JUDGMENT re 15 Order: this civil action is dismissed, by Clerk on 11/17/2014. (jsmit)
July 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER TO FILE REPLY re 9 : pursuant to Rule 5(e) of the Rules Governing Section 2254 Cases, the Applicant shall file a reply on or before August 25, 2014, addressing these contentions and any other matters in the Answer that the Applicant wishes to argue, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 7/28/2014. (jsmit)
March 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO ANSWER CERTAIN CLAIMS re 1 Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus: Deadlines: James Falk and John Suthers answers addressing the allegations in Claims One, Three, Four, Five, Six and Nine due 5/15/2014, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 3/27/2014. (jsmit )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kemp v. Falk et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: James Falk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Glenn H. Kemp
Represented By: Brett Daniel Lampiasi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Suthers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?