Big O Tires, LLC v. Black Toad Enterprises, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Big O Tires, LLC
Defendant: Black Toad Enterprises, LLC, Daniel E. Groman, Kelle C. Groman, James R. Groman and Cecilia Groman
Case Number: 1:2014cv00824
Filed: March 20, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Raymond P. Moore
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Watanabe
Nature of Suit: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER. The Court ADOPTS the Recommendation 65 to wit, the Court DIRECTS the Clerk of the Court to ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSE this matter, pursuant to Local Rule 41.2, subject to reopening for good cause. By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 2/9/2015. (tscha, )
November 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER on 56 Motion to Quantify Default Judgment by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 11/21/14. Plaintiff is entitled to $200,130.46 in amounts due and owing, to $5000 in damages for failure to return the Big O Manual and $782.78 in costs t o remove the Big O signage, to prejudgment interest of $29,347.95, and to costs and fees of $19,176.29. Default judgment shall be entered against Defendant Black Toad Enterprises, LLC in the amount of $254,437.48 plus post-judgment interest. (dkals, )
September 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER adopting 47 Report and Recommendations. The Clerk of the Court is directed to enter a default and Default judgment shall be entered against Defendant Black Toad Enterprises, LLC, by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 9/17/2014.(trlee, )
July 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 46 MINUTE ENTRY for Show Cause Hearing/Status Conference held before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 7/8/2014. Court will enter a recommendation to Judge Moore that default enter against Black Toad Enterprises, LLC. Plaintiff's Oral Motion to Withdraw Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment is granted. Withdrawing without prejudice 45 Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment. FTR: Courtroom A-502. (eseam)
May 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting 24 Motion to Withdraw Plaintiff Big O Tires, LLC's Motion for Preliminary Injunction and to Vacate Hearing 24 . The hearing currently scheduled for 5/13/2014 at 9:00 A.M. is hereby VACATED. By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 5/8/2014.(trlee, )
March 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 5/21/2014 10:30 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 3/21/2014. (emill)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Big O Tires, LLC v. Black Toad Enterprises, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Big O Tires, LLC
Represented By: Harold R. Bruno, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Black Toad Enterprises, LLC
Represented By: Patrick John Monahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel E. Groman
Represented By: Patrick John Monahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelle C. Groman
Represented By: Patrick John Monahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James R. Groman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cecilia Groman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?