Ruiz et al v. Act Fast Delivery of Colorado, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Domingo Ruiz and Michael Bryant
Defendant: Act Fast Delivery of Colorado, Inc., Powerforce of Colorado, Inc. and John L. Jackson
Case Number: 1:2014cv00870
Filed: March 25, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Pueblo
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Presiding Judge: Marcia S. Krieger
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:0216
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 132 OPINION AND ORDER Denying Motion to Approve Settlement. The Court DENIES the Motion to Approve Settlement Agreement (# 131 ). Within 45 days of the date of this Order, the parties shall: 1) Request that the case be closed or all claims dismissed wi th prejudice premised upon an express representation that all plaintiffs, both named and those who have opted-in, have resolved their claims against the Defendant. If not all claims are settled, then specify those to be tried. or 2) Request approval of a settlement supplementing the motion as indicated in this Order, by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 1/9/2017. (agarc, )
April 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 123 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang: granting in part and denying in part 120 Motion to Amend/Correct/Modify; and granting in part and denying in part 120 Motion to Supplement. Status Conference held on 4/2 0/2016. No further extensions will be allowed absent extraordinary circumstances. The Scheduling Order 119 is modified as follows: Experts disclosures due: June 6, 2016; Rebuttal expert disclosures due: July 5, 2016; Deadline to file a motion for class certification: June 16, 2016; Discovery cut-off: August 4, 2016; Deadline to file a motion for decertification: August 4, 2016; Dispositive motion deadline: August 25, 2016. Hearing concluded. FTR: C-204 AM. (nmarb, )
December 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER SETTING Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference for 1/14/2016 11:00 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. The parties or their counsel shall submit their proposed scheduling order, including a copy of the proposed scheduling order in a Word format sent via email to Wang_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov, on or before seven days prior to the Scheduling Conference By Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 12/30/15. (nywlc1)
July 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 101 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 7/23/15 re: Motion to Withdraw as Attorney 99 . The Motion is GRANTED. Stacy D. Mueller is granted leave to withdraw from the representation of Defendants and is to be removed from the electronic service. (bsimm, )
June 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 98 OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR CONDITIONAL CERTIFICATION and DENYING MOTIONS TO STRIKE: The Plaintiffs' Motion for Conditional Certification and Hoffman-La Roche 48 is GRANTED and the Notice and Consent forms are APPRO VED, subject to the limitations and modifications discussed above. The Defendants' Motion to Strike Portions of the Plaintiffs' Supplemental Reply 87 and Motion to Strike Plaintiffs' Second Supplemental Exhibit 92 are DENIED AS MOOT. by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 6/18/15.(msksec, )
February 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 64 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang: Motion Hearing held on 2/27/2015. ORDER: denying 51 Defendant's Motion for Sanctions. FTR: Wang-am. (nmarb, )
August 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 33 PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 8/11/14. (dkals, )
April 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Setting Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference and Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting for 7/25/2014 11:00 AM in Courtroom A 401, before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 4/24/14. (dkals, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ruiz et al v. Act Fast Delivery of Colorado, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Domingo Ruiz
Represented By: Galvin Bernard Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Bryant
Represented By: Galvin Bernard Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Act Fast Delivery of Colorado, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Powerforce of Colorado, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John L. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?