June 30, 2015 |
Filing
130
JUDGMENT by Clerk in favor of Owners Insurance Company against Edge Construction, LLC re: 129 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, on 6/30/15. (morti, )
|
June 29, 2015 |
Filing
129
ORDER; 60 Plaintiff Edge Construction, LLCs Motion for Partial SummaryJudgment on Defendants Affirmative Defenses 1-6 is DENIED. 61 and 65 Plaintiff Edge Construction, LLCs Motion for Partial Summary Judgment is DENIED. 62 Defendant Owners Insurance Companys Motion for Summary Judgment, or in the Alternative, Motion for Determination of Law is GRANTED. Judgment shall enter for the defendant and against the plaintiff Edge. Defendant shall have its costs. 85 Motion to Exclude, 86 Motion in Limine, 88 Motion to Compel, 100 Motion in Limine, 101 Motion to Strike, 102 Motion in Limine, 103 Motion in Limine, 104 Motion in Limine, 105 Motion in Limine, 106 Motion in Limine, 107 Motion to Strike and 108 Motion in Limine are DENIED AS MOOT. The Trial Preparation Conference set on September 10, 2015, at 9:00 a.m. and the jury trial set for October 5, 2015, at 9:00 a.m. are VACATED. It is furtherORDERED that the Clerk shall enter final judgment in accordance with this Orderand shall terminate this case, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 6/29/15.(morti, )
|
March 30, 2015 |
Filing
87
MINUTE ORDER granting 84 defendant's Motion for Leave to File Response to Edge Constructions, LLC's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, (Doc. 61) Out of Time, up to and including 4/3/2015. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 3/30/2015. (emill)
|
March 17, 2015 |
Filing
83
MINUTE ORDER granting 82 plaintiff's Motion to Strike Defendant's Reply to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment or Alternatively, Motion for Leave to File A Sur-Reply, to the extent that the plaintiff shall have up to andincluding 4/1/ 2015, to file a sur-reply. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 3/17/2015.(emill)
|
February 26, 2015 |
Filing
78
COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe: Telephonic Motion Hearing held on 2/26/2015. Granting 67 Defendant's Emergency Motion for Reconsideration of Court Order regarding Plain tiff's Motion to Compel or, in the Alternative, Motion for Protective Order and Relief from Court Order Regarding Plaintiff's Motion to Compel (Docket No. 64). The deadline to complete the 30(b)(6)deposition of employee Donald Gibson is extended, and the deposition is set 3/4/2015 at 01:30 p.m. Court Reporter: FTR - E. E. Miller. FTR: Courtroom A502. (emill)
|
February 6, 2015 |
Filing
64
ORDER granting 44 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel, as set forth in the Order; granting 56 Defendant's Motion for Leave to File Surreply to Edge Construction, LLC's Motion to Compel, as set forth in the Order. Scheduling Order 20 is amended for the limited purpose to take and complete Mr. Gibson's deposition ONLY. Discovery, as outlined in the Order, due by 3/2/2015. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 2/6/2015. (emill)
|
January 22, 2015 |
Filing
53
MINUTE ORDER denying 52 Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Defendant's Response to Plaintiffs Motion to Compel 44 . On or before 1/30/3015, Plaintiff shall file a Reply to Defendant's Response 49 addressing the items set forth in the Order. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 1/22/2015.(emill)
|
January 14, 2015 |
Filing
48
MINUTE ORDER Denying 43 Plaintiff Edge Construction, LLC's Motion for Leave to File Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 1/14/2015. (emill)
|
January 6, 2015 |
Filing
46
MINUTE ORDER granting 45 Stipulated Motion to Amend Scheduling Order and to Extend Discovery Deadline. Scheduling Order 20 is amended. Discovery, for the limited purposes as set forth in the order, due by 1/27/2015. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 1/6/2015.(emill)
|
December 9, 2014 |
Filing
42
PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 12/09/2014. (slibi, )
|
December 3, 2014 |
Filing
38
MINUTE ORDER denying 34 Motion to Amend Scheduling Order and to Extend Discovery Deadlines, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 12/03/2014.(slibi, )
|
October 30, 2014 |
Filing
28
ORDER granting 26 Motion for Voluntary Dismissal, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 10/30/2014. DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE as to Sable Cove Condominium. (slibi, ) Modified on 10/30/2014 to reflect this case was dismissed as to one plaintiff (slibi, ).
|
September 5, 2014 |
Filing
25
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 12 Defendant Owners Insurance Company's Partial Motion to Dismiss. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 9/5/2014.(emill)
|
April 1, 2014 |
Filing
11
ORDER: Consent Form due by 5/13/2014. Scheduling Conference set for 5/27/2014 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 4/1/2014. (eseam)
|