April 5, 2019 |
Filing
443
ORDER OF FORECLOSURE AND JUDICIAL SALE entered by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 4/5/2019. (cpear)
|
April 4, 2019 |
Filing
438
ORDER the Plaintiff's 427 Motion to Enjoin Further Pro Se Pleadings or, in the Alternative, to Withdraw the Reference or Stay Adversary Proceeding is GRANTED in Part and DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE in Part. Defendants Hook and Smith's 248 Motion to Strike, for Sanctions and for Order to Show Cause is DENIED. The Plaintiff's 430 Request for a Status Conference is DENIED AS MOOT. Defendants Hook and Smith's 431 Motion for Sanctions against Plaintiff LNV Corporation and its Counsel, Duncan E. Barber and Julie A. Trent is DENIED. Defendants Hook and Smith's 432 Motion for Sanctions against the United States of America and its Counsel at the U.S. Department of Justice in Washington, DC is DENIED. Defendants Hook and Smith's 433 Request for Evidentiary Hearing on Motion for Sanctions is DENIED. ORDERED by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 4/4/2019. (cthom, )
|
April 30, 2018 |
Filing
387
ORDER Defendants' 369 Objections to Magistrate Judge's Final Pretrial Order is OVERRULED and Defendants' 371 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction. ORDERED by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 4/30/2018. (cthom, )
|
March 9, 2018 |
Filing
370
ORDER. The "Supplement to Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration of February 20, 2018 Order, or for Leave to Amend and/or Supplement Pleadings" (ECF No. 368 ) is GRANTED. Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration of February 20, 2018 Order, or for Leave to Amend and/or Supplement Pleadings (ECF No. 360 ) is DENIED. By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 03/09/2018. (athom, )
|
February 20, 2018 |
Filing
355
ORDER denying 354 Motion for Leave "to Amend Proposed Final Pretrial Order; Objection to Magistrates Judge's Determination". ORDERED by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 2/20/2018. (cthom, )
|
February 8, 2018 |
Filing
349
ORDER denying 348 Defendants' Objections to Magistrate Judge's Rulings and Orders. The Plaintiff's counsel shall send Defendant David L. Smith a copy of this Order via email at the email address located in the Objection at ECF No. 348 , page 6. ORDERED by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 2/8/2018. (cthom, )
|
December 4, 2017 |
Filing
334
ORDER that Defendants' "Motion to Vacate and Set Aside November 20, 2017 Order; Request for Stay of Case Pending Resolution of Motion" ECF No. 333 is DENIED, by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 12/4/2017. (evana, )
|
March 8, 2016 |
Filing
230
COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer: Status Conference held on 3/8/2016. Denying 204 Motion to Compel. LNV Corporation's responses to Ms. Hook's discovery must be produced on or before 3/14/2016. Dispositive Motions deadline extended until 4/14/2016. FTR: Courtroom A-402. (amont, )
|
January 7, 2016 |
Filing
223
ORDER denying 215 Motion for Reconsideration, by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 01/07/2016.(cthom, )
|
December 14, 2015 |
Filing
222
ORDER denying 220 Motion for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b); denying 220 Motion for Reconsideration ; denying 220 Motion to Vacate, by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 12/14/2015.(cthom, )
|
December 3, 2015 |
Filing
218
ORDER granting 156 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; denying 208 Motion to Strike. Defendant Hooks Compulsory Counterclaims (ECF No. 189, pages 23-81) are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 12/03/2015.(cthom, )
|
December 2, 2015 |
Filing
217
ORDER denying 203 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 12/02/2015.(cthom, )
|
October 22, 2015 |
Filing
196
ORDER denying 190 Motion for Reconsideration, by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 10/22/2015.(cthom, )
|
October 20, 2015 |
Filing
195
ORDER OVERRUELS IN PART and SUSTAINS in PART 173 Objection to Magistrate Judge's Order Denying Defendant M. Julia Hook's Motion for Order Compelling Discovery from Plaintiff LNV Corporation; Request for Oral Argument. AFFIRMS IN PART [172 ] denying Defendant M. Julia Hook's Motion for Order Compelling Discovery 150 as stated herein; and ORDERS that on or before October 30, 2015, Plaintiff LNV Corporation shall serve on Defendant Hook an amended privilege log identifying all rec ipients. If Defendant Hook determines that the amended privilege log is insufficient as to the identity of such recipients, and the parties are unable to resolve their differences, Hook may seek relief addressing such alleged insufficiencies within two weeks of the service of the amended privilege log, by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 10/20/2015. (cthom, )
|
September 25, 2015 |
Filing
183
ORDER granting 99 Defendant M. Julia Hook's Motion to Dismiss United States' Amended Cross Claim, as to relief sought under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(f) to the extent it seeks to strike the United States' "Claim for Proceeds" set forth in the United States Answer and Claim 93 as a cross claim against Defendant Hook, and DENIED AS MOOT as to relief sought under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b). The United States' Claim is hereby STRICKEN only to the extent it seeks to assert a claim or cause of action against Defendant Hook, by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 09/25/2015.(cthom, )
|
August 26, 2015 |
Filing
172
COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer: Motion Hearing held on 8/26/2015. Denying without prejudice 150 Motion to Compel. Denying 160 Motion to Compel. FTR: Courtroom A-402. (amont, )
|
February 11, 2015 |
Filing
134
ORDER denying 116 Defendant M. Julia Hook's Motion for Order Granting Injunction Pending Appeal. By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 2/11/2015.(tscha, )
|
November 17, 2014 |
Filing
125
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer: Status Conference held on 11/17/2014. ORDERED: After discussion with the parties, all discovery deadlines and the dispositive motion deadline are VACATED pending a ruling on the pending motions to dismiss. A Telephonic Status Conference is set for February 12, 2015 at 10:00 a.m. Mr. Smith MUST attend this hearing. Parties participating in the telephone conference shall first initiate a call amongst themselves and cal l the court at (303) 844-2117 at the scheduled time. If all the motions to dismiss are ruled on before February 12th, parties shall initiate a conference call and contact Magistrate Judge Shaffer's chambers within 72 hours of a ruling to set an earlier status conference. MOTION 123 for Reconsideration is DENIED as stated on the record. FTR: Courtroom A-402. (amont)
|
November 7, 2014 |
Filing
122
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer: Telephonic Discovery Hearing held on 11/7/2014. ORDERED: Joint MOTION 76 to Dismiss Claims Against Saint Lukes Lofts Homeowner Assoc., Inc. is DENIED without prejudice. Stipulated MOTION 84 for Entry of Judgment Against Debra Johnson in Her Official Capacity as the Public Trustee for the City and County of Denver, Colorado is DENIED without prejudice. Plaintiff's Second MOTION 67 for Entry of Default Judgment Against the Prudential Home Mortgage Company, Inc. is DENIED without prejudice. FTR: Courtroom A-402. (amont)
|
September 26, 2014 |
Filing
101
USCA ORDER Denying 90 Emergency Petition for Permission to Appeal filed by M. Julia Hook, by Clerk on 9/26/2014. (evana, )
|
August 26, 2014 |
Filing
79
ORDER denying 57 Motion for TRO; denying as moot 62 Motion to Expedite, by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 8/26/2014.(trlee, )
|
August 21, 2014 |
Filing
66
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer: Scheduling Conference held on 8/21/2014. ORDERED: Defendant M. Julia Hook's Verified Motion to Quash Service of Process 13 is MOOT in light of subsequent procedural developments from the State Court. LNV Corporation's Second Motion to Amend Complaint 43 is GRANTED. Defendant M. Julia Hook's Motion to Withdraw Motion to Compel Disclosures and Production of Documents from Defendant United States of Am erica 64 is GRANTED. Defendant M. Julia Hook's Motion to Compel Disclosures and Production of Documents from Defendant United States of America 60 is MOOT in light on the Court granting Motion to Withdraw 64 . Discovery with the exception of cross claims against the government due by 12/31/2014. Dispositive Motions with the exception of cross claims against the government due by 1/31/2015. A Status Conference is set for November 17, 2014 at 9:00 a.m. to discuss Motion to Dismiss Cro ss Claims, how discovery has progressed, and to re-visit deadlines if needed. If a ruling on Motion to Dismiss Cross Claims has been decided before November 17, 2014, counsel shall put together a conference call with Judge Shaffer's chambers at (303) 844-2117 within 72 hours of the ruling. Ms. Hook may re-file her Motion to Compel with the changes suggested in court. If Ms. Hook re-files her Motion, Mr. Schwartz and Ms. Hook shall put together a conference call with Judge Shaffer's chambers at (303) 844-2117 within 72 hours of the filing of the Motion to further discuss the merits of the Motion. FTR: Courtroom A-402. (amont)
|
July 17, 2014 |
Filing
46
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer: Scheduling Conference held on 7/17/2014. ORDERED: Motion to Amend/Correct/Modify Complaint 34 is DENIED AS MOOT. Once the case has been re-drawn to a district judge, a new Scheduling Conference will be set. FTR: Courtroom A-402. (amont)
|
April 29, 2014 |
Filing
24
ORDER granting 23 Plaintiff's Verified Motion to Serve the Prudential Home Mortgage Company, Inc. by Publication, by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 4/29/2014. (eseam)
|