Sheppard v. Weatherford International, LLC
Plaintiff: |
Mitch Sheppard |
Defendant: |
Weatherford International, LLC |
Case Number: |
1:2014cv01000 |
Filed: |
April 8, 2014 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Colorado |
Office: |
Denver Office |
County: |
Larimer |
Presiding Judge: |
Raymond P. Moore |
Presiding Judge: |
Craig B. Shaffer |
Nature of Suit: |
Fair Labor Standards Act |
Cause of Action: |
15 U.S.C. § 2 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
April 21, 2016 |
Filing
100
ORDER Granting Request for Extension of Stay re 97 Joint Status Report and Request for Extension of Stay and 99 Joint Status Report. ORDERED by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 04/21/2016. (cthom, )
|
March 15, 2016 |
Filing
96
ORDER granting 95 Request for Extension of Stay. It is ORDERED that all proceedings in this case are stayed through April 15, 2016. The Parties shall file a joint status report regarding mediation and settlement on or before April 15, 2016. Ordered by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 03/15/2016.(cthom, )
|
January 29, 2016 |
Filing
92
ORDER GRANTING REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF STAY. Re: 89 Status Report and Request for Extension of Stay. ORDERED that all proceedings in this case are stayed through March 15, 2016. The Parties shall file a joint status report regarding mediation and settlement on or before March 15, 2016, by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 1/29/2016. (agarc, )
|
December 10, 2015 |
Filing
84
ORDER granting 83 Request fro Extension of Stay. it is ORDERED that all proceedings in this case are stayed through January 29, 2016. The Parties shall file a joint status report regarding mediation and settlement on or before January 29, 2016, by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 12/10/2015. (cthom, )
|
September 16, 2015 |
Filing
78
ORDER re: 77 Joint Status Report and Request for Extension of Stay. All proceedings in this case are stayed through 12/10/2015. Status Report due by 12/10/2015. By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 09/16/2015. (athom, )
|
June 4, 2015 |
Filing
70
ORDER granting in part 69 Motion to Stay, denying without prejudice and granting leave to refile 61 Motion to Dismiss, as outlined in the attached order. Status Report due by 9/14/2015. By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 06/04/2015. (athom, )
|
October 21, 2014 |
Filing
37
ORDER granting 32 Agreed Motion to Approve Proposed Notice of Collective Action Lawsuit and Proposed Opt-In Consent Form (docketed as 'Motion for Discovery') by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 10/21/14.(cbssec)
|
August 4, 2014 |
Filing
23
PROTECTIVE ORDER signed and entered with interlineations by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 8/4/14. ORDERED that parties' 21 MOTION for Protective Order is GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that when filing documents under seal parties MUST fully comply with the requirements of D.C.ColoL.CivR. 7.2 and D.C.COLO. ECF. PROC. 5.1. (cbssec)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?