Tijuanas Produce, Inc. v. Mi Pueblo Latin Market, Inc., et al

Plaintiff: Tijuanas Produce, Inc.
Defendant: Mi Pueblo Latin Market, Inc., Jaime A. Cueva and Daneen Cueva
Case Number: 1:2014cv01034
Filed: April 10, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Presiding Judge: William J. Martinez
Nature of Suit: Agricultural Acts
Cause of Action: 07:499
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 3/12/15 denying 29 Motion to Reopen Case. (bsimm, )
September 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 9/30/14. The Motion to Dismiss Without Prejudice 24 is GRANTED, subject to the condition contained here, and this action is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. (bsimm, )
August 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 8/1/14 re: Unopposed Motion to Vacate and Reset August 7, 2014 Scheduling Conference 16 . The Motion is GRANTED and the Scheduling Conference set for August 7, 2014, is vacated and reset to 9/4/2014 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland. The proposed Scheduling Order is due on or before August 28, 2014. (bsimm, )
April 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 6/25/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland. by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 4/24/2014. (evana, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tijuanas Produce, Inc. v. Mi Pueblo Latin Market, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tijuanas Produce, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Patrick Walsh, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mi Pueblo Latin Market, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jaime A. Cueva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daneen Cueva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?