Olivas-Sepulbeda v. Attorney General of the State of Colorado, The
Petitioner: Abraham Olivas-Sepulbeda
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Colorado, The
Case Number: 1:2014cv01100
Filed: April 17, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Chaffee
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER dismissing this action without prejudice, and denying without prejudice leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 8/1/14. No certificate of appealability will issue. (dkals, )
June 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Directing Applicant to File Second Amended Application, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 6/26/2014. (slibi, )
May 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SECOND ORDER Directing Plaintiff to Cure Deficiency, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 5/21/2014. (slibi, )
April 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Directing Applicant to Cure Deficiencies, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 4/18/2014. (morti, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Olivas-Sepulbeda v. Attorney General of the State of Colorado, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Colorado, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Abraham Olivas-Sepulbeda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?