Gallegos et al v. Safeco Insurance Company of America
Plaintiff: |
Eugene Gallegos and Diane Gallegos |
Defendant: |
Safeco Insurance Company of America |
Case Number: |
1:2014cv01114 |
Filed: |
April 18, 2014 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Colorado |
Office: |
Denver Office |
County: |
Conejos |
Presiding Judge: |
William J. Martinez |
Presiding Judge: |
Michael J. Watanabe |
Nature of Suit: |
Insurance |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1332 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Both |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
June 4, 2015 |
Filing
119
FINAL JUDGMENT. re: 118 , by Clerk on 6/4/2015. (dhans, )
|
May 13, 2015 |
Filing
112
ORDER denying 108 Plaintiffs' Motion for Issuance of Sanctions Against Non- Party PT & C and Corey Schrauben, as set forth in the order. On or before 5/29/2015, PT&C and Corey Schrauben shall file with the court under Level 2 Restriction, in conformance with D.C.COLO.LCivR 7.2, the documents this court ordered be produced in its Order of March 4, 2015 81 , as set forth in the order. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 5/13/2015.(emill)
|
March 19, 2015 |
Filing
96
MINUTE ORDER denying 91 Motion to Stay Order Compelling Production Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.R. 72(a); D.C.COLO.L.CivR 30.2(b). By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 3/19/2015.(alowe)
|
March 16, 2015 |
Filing
89
MINUTE ORDER denying 87 Motion to Stay Order Compelling Production. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 3/16/2015.(alowe)
|
March 4, 2015 |
Filing
81
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 37 Motion to Compel and for Sanctions Regarding Selective Assertion of Attorney-Client Privileges; granting 38 Motion to Compel Documents From PT & C and Corey Schrauben, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 3/04/2015.(slibi, )
|
March 3, 2015 |
Filing
80
MINUTE ORDER denying 63 Plaintiffs' Motion for Protective Order Re: Scope ofSecond Deposition of Scott Johnson, P.E. Denying 66 Plaintiffs' Supplement to Plaintiffs' Motion for Protective Order Re: Scope of Second Deposition of Scott Johnson, P.E. Discovery cut off date is extended to 3/31/2015, to allow the completion of Scott Johnson, P.E.'s deposition. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 3/3/2015. (emill)
|
January 13, 2015 |
Filing
62
MINUTE ORDER denying 42 Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Discovery Re: Interrogatory 3, as set forth in the Order, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 1/13/2015. (emill)
|
December 16, 2014 |
Filing
49
ORDER granting 44 Defendant's Motion to Clarify Scheduling Order Deadlines. Non-expert Discovery due by 1/7/2015. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 12/16/2014.(emill)
|
October 7, 2014 |
Filing
32
COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe: Telephonic Motion Hearing held on 10/7/2014. Granting in part and denying in part 27 Plaintiffs' Motion to Amend Scheduling Order and Extend Deadlines by 60 Days. Scheduling Order 22 is amended. Discovery due by 1/1/2015. Dispositive Motions deadline remains 2/9/2015. Court Reporter: FTR - E. E. Miller. FTR: Courtroom A502. (emill)
|
July 15, 2014 |
Filing
26
STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER Entered by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 7/15/2014. (emill)
|
May 6, 2014 |
Filing
16
ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 7/7/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 5/6/2014. (evana, )
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?