Watts et al v. American Property Maintenance, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: |
TaHonie Watts and LaShawnda Jenkins |
Defendant: |
American Property Maintenance, Inc., Bing Tran and Bing Tran (I) |
Case Number: |
1:2014cv01161 |
Filed: |
April 24, 2014 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Colorado |
Office: |
Denver Office |
County: |
Denver |
Presiding Judge: |
Boyd N. Boland |
Presiding Judge: |
William J. Martinez |
Nature of Suit: |
Fair Labor Standards Act |
Cause of Action: |
15 U.S.C. § 2 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
February 3, 2015 |
Filing
43
FINAL JUDGMENT. Pursuant to the Order Granting Joint Motion For Approval Of Settlement Agreement entered by the Honorable William J. Martinez on 2/2/2015, 42 , IT IS ORDERED that: 1. The Parties' Joint Motion for Approval of Settlement Ag reement and Dismissal of Lawsuit 36 is GRANTED. 2. The settlement reached by the Parties represents a fair and equitable resolution of this action, reasonably resolves bona fide disagreements between the Parties regarding the merits of the claims asserted by Plaintiff, and demonstrates a good-faith intention by the Parties that the claims of the Plaintiff be fully and finally resolved, and not re-litigated in whole or in part at any point in the future; 3. The settlement reached by the Pa rties is approved by this Court; 4. Pursuant to the terms of the Parties' settlement agreement, the above-captioned action, including Plaintiff's Fair Labor Standards Act claims, and all claims for relief set forth therein, are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE; 5.Each party shall bear their own attorney's fees and costs, except as may otherwise be provided in the confidential settlement agreement, by clerk on 2/3/2015. (dhans, )
|
February 2, 2015 |
Filing
42
ORDER granting 36 Joint Motion for Approval of Settlement Agreement and Dismissal of Lawsuit. Pursuant to the terms of the Parties' settlement agreement, including Plaintiff's Fair Labor Standards Act claims, and all claims for relief se t forth therein are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Each party shall bear their own attorney's fees and costs, except as may otherwise be provided in the confidential settlement agreement. The Parties' 41 Stipulated Motion for Status Conference is DENIED AS MOOT. By Judge William J. Martinez on 2/2/2015. (alowe)
|
July 28, 2014 |
Filing
24
MINUTE ORDER granting 22 the Stipulated Motion to Submit Plaintiffs First Amended Collective and Class Action Complaint, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 7/28/2014.(evana, )
|
July 14, 2014 |
Filing
19
STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 7/14/14. (bsimm, )
|
May 9, 2014 |
Filing
9
ORDER SETTING RULE 16(b) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND RULE 26(f) PLANNING MEETING by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 5/9/14. Scheduling Conference set for 7/11/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland. (bsimm, )
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?