Medina et al v. Werner Enterprises, Inc.
Plaintiff: Ann Marie Julie Medina and Samuel Medina, Jr.
Defendant: Werner Enterprises, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2014cv01188
Filed: April 28, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Pueblo
Presiding Judge: Christine M. Arguello
Presiding Judge: Kathleen M. Tafoya
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER denying 36 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 39 Motion for Leave. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 08/13/2015. (athom, )
February 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER Adopting and Affirming 33 January 30, 2015 Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge: Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) (Doc. # 22 ) is GRANTED. Counts Two, Three, and Four are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Counts One and Five still remain. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 02/18/2015. (athom, )
July 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting 12 Motion for Leave; granting 13 Motion for Leave; denying as moot 15 Motion for Hearing/Conference. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 07/14/2014. (athom, )
July 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SECOND AMENDED ORDER Resetting Scheduling Conference for 8/29/2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 7/7/14. (sgrim)
June 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 8 AMENDED ORDER Resetting Scheduling Conference for 7/29/2014 at 09:45 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 6/2/14. (sgrim)
May 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 8/4/2014 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 5/8/14. (sgrim)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Medina et al v. Werner Enterprises, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ann Marie Julie Medina
Represented By: Zachary D. Cordova
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel Medina, Jr.
Represented By: Zachary D. Cordova
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Werner Enterprises, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?