USA v. Martens
Plaintiff: USA
Defendant: Gregory Martens
Case Number: 1:2014cv01199
Filed: April 29, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Wiley Y. Daniel
Presiding Judge: Kathleen M. Tafoya
Nature of Suit: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
Cause of Action: 26:7401
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER Granting 68 the Plaintiffs Motion for Entry and Order of Sale. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. §§ 2001 and 2002 and 26 U.S.C. §§ 7402 and 7403, the Court enters this Order of Foreclosure and Decree of Sale, by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 4/18/2016.(evana, )
April 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 66 SECOND AMENDED JUDGMENT by Clerk in favor of USA against In God We Trust, Gregory Martens, Jennifer Martens re: 64 Default Judgment entered by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 4/1/16. (rkeec)
March 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER that the Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge Tafoya ECF No. 58 is AFFIRMED and ADOPTED. In accordance therewith, it is ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motion for Summary Judgment ECF No. 48 is GRANTED, by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 3/28/2016.(evana, )
April 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER denying 37 Defendant Gregory Martens Motion to Restrain Assessment and Collections, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 4/2/2015.(evana, )
November 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MINUTE ORDER granting 19 Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint". Plaintiff may file its Amended Complaint on or before November 14, 2014, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 11/12/2014.(evana, )
September 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MINUTE ORDER denying 16 Plaintiff's Motion for Court to Take Judicial Notice of the Following Facts That Are Not Subject to Reasonable Dispute, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 9/10/14.(sgrim)
June 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 9/8/2014 at 09:45 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 6/16/14. (sgrim)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. Martens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory Martens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: Aaron Michael Bailey(Designation Federal Agency Attorney)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?