Plummer v. McDermott et al
Plaintiff: |
Ronald Plummer |
Defendant: |
Lisa McDermott, David Allred and Brad Cink |
Case Number: |
1:2014cv01203 |
Filed: |
April 29, 2014 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Colorado |
Office: |
Denver Office |
County: |
XX US, Outside State |
Presiding Judge: |
Christine M. Arguello |
Presiding Judge: |
Michael J. Watanabe |
Nature of Suit: |
Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
February 27, 2015 |
Filing
54
FINAL JUDGMENT. Signed by Clerk on 2/27/2015 (shart)
|
October 20, 2014 |
Filing
50
ORDER Affirming 39 September 23, 2014 Recommendations of United States Magistrate Judge: the Federal Bureau of Prisons' Motion to Reconsider Granting Plaintiff In Forma Pauperis (Doc. # 32 ) is DENIED. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 10/20/2014.(athom, )
|
October 1, 2014 |
Filing
48
MINUTE ORDER granting 45 Motion to Stay, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 10/01/2014.(slibi, )
|
September 16, 2014 |
Filing
36
MINUTE ORDER denying 34 Motion for Reconsideration. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 09/16/2014. (athom, )
|
August 27, 2014 |
Filing
30
MINUTE ORDER granting 28 Motion to Vacate Scheduling Conference and Related Deadlines, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 8/27/2014. Scheduling Conference set for 9/03/2014 is VACATED. (slibi, )
|
July 9, 2014 |
Filing
22
COURTROOM MINUTES for Status Conference held on 7/9/2014 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. ORDERED: Plaintiff's Motion to Compel 20 is GRANTED. The Clerk is directed to mail a copy of the Local Rules of Practice, including the a ppendix, to the Plaintiff, Ronald Plummer #696494, Ohio - London Correctional Facility, P.O. Box 69, London, OH 43140. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for September 3, 2014 at 1:30 p.m.(MST) before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. Plain tiff is required to contact 303-844- 2403 at the time of the Scheduling Conference. The parties shall prepare and submit the proposed scheduling order on or before August 29, 2014. The United States Attorney representing the Defendants is directed to file the proposed scheduling order electronically on or before August 29, 2014 since the Plaintiff is not subject to electronic filing. The Clerk is directed to mail a copy of todays courtroom minutes to Sharon Carter, Case Manager for Ronald Plummer #696494, Ohio - London Correctional Facility, P.O. Box 69, London, OH 43140. FTR: MJW A502. (sgrim)
|
May 27, 2014 |
Filing
12
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE FOR PRO SE PLAINTIFF. Status Conference set for 7/9/2014 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 5/27/2014. (emill)
|
April 30, 2014 |
Filing
6
ORDER Directing Plaintiff To Cure Deficiencies, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 4/30/14. (nmarb, ) Modified on 4/30/2014 to show this was filed in incorrect case - see 14-cv-01211-BNB. (nmarb, ).
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?