Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. CollegeAmerica Denver, Inc.
Plaintiff: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Defendant: CollegeAmerica Denver, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2014cv01232
Filed: April 30, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Lewis T. Babcock
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 29:621 Job Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 210 ORDER denying 202 EEOC's Motion for Preliminary Injunction, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 4/30/2019. (ebuch)
November 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 167 Order denying 147 MOTION for Attorneys' Fees by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 11/17/16. (dkals, )
February 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 90 MINUTE ORDER granting 88 Motion for Modification of Final Pretrial Order, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 2/05/2016. Three-Day Jury Trial set for 6/20/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom C401 before Judge Lewis T. Babcock.(slibi, ) Modified on 2/5/2016 to edit text (slibi, ).
December 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 70 Plaintiff EEOC's Motion to Compel, as set forth in the order, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 12/17/2015.(emill)
December 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER Granting in Part, Denying in Part, Deferring Ruling in Part on 70 Plaintiff EEOC's Motion to Compel, By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 12/3/2015.(emill)
December 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 76 MINUTE ORDER denying 68 Plaintiff EEOC's Motion for Protective Order Concerning Debbi Potts' Deposition, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 12/2/2015.(emill)
October 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 64 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 50 Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration of Court's Order Dismissing Plaintiff's Second Claim for Relief, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 10/23/2015. (ebuch)
September 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER granting 48 Defendant's Motion to Compel, as set forth in the order, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 9/21/2015.(emill)
July 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting 45 Parties' Joint Motion to Modify Deadlines in Scheduling Order. Scheduling Order 30 is amended. Discovery due by 11/16/2015. Dispositive Motions due by 12/18/2015. Final Pretrial Conference 12/2/2015 09:00 AM is vacated. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 1/29/2016. Final Pretrial Conference re-set for 2/9/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 7/23/2015.(emill)
May 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting 20 Motion for Jury Trial by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 5/1/15. (dkals, )
February 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 27 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 2/9/2015. (emill)
January 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 2/18/2015 10:30 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 1/8/2015. (emill)
December 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 6 Defendant CollegeAmerica's Motion to Dismiss Complaint, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 12/2/2014. (eseam)
August 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER denying 12 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Surreply to Defendant's Reply in Support of Its Motion to Dismiss Complaint, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 8/22/2014. (eseam)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. CollegeAmerica Denver, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Represented By: David Andrew Winston(Designation Federal Agency Attorney)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CollegeAmerica Denver, Inc.
Represented By: Raymond W. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?