UET RR, LLC v. Comis et al
Plaintiff: UET RR, LLC
Defendant: Benjamin D. Comis, Talanda Sykes, K3B Partners, ULC, Barry W. Comis, Falcon Creek Asset Management, Inc. and RKB Investments, Ltd.
Case Number: 1:2014cv01237
Filed: April 30, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Richard P. Matsch
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 158 FINDINGS OF FACT, CONCLUSIONS OF LAW AND ORDER FOR JUDGMENT by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 5/9/17. (ktera)
April 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 124 PROTECTIVE ORDER filed by Plaintiff UET RR, LLC, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 4/13/16. (ktera)
January 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE Pursuant to Procedural Order Number One 116 , a scheduling conference will be held on February 24, 2016, at 10:00 a.m. in the Conference Room, Second Floor, the Byron White United States Courthouse, 1823 Sto ut Street, Denver, Colorado. The proposed order (original only) on paper, shall be submitted directly to chambers by 4:00 p.m. on February 4, 2016. The conference is conducted with lead counsel present in person. No parties or representatives of parties will be permitted to attend, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 1/20/16. (ktera)
December 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 116 PROCEDURAL ORDER NUMBER ONE Counsel will meet and confer as required by Rule 26 (f)(2) within 30 days from the date of this order. Lead counsel shall attend the conference in person. The disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1)(A) shall be made with in 14 days after that conference. The proposed discovery plan will be in the form of the Scheduling Order which will be submitted to chambers in paper form 10 days before the date of the Scheduling Conference. Counsel for the plaintiff will telep hone chambers within 10 days after the disclosures to set a date and time for a Scheduling Conference pursuant to Rule 16. The instructions for preparation of the Scheduling Order and the form of that order are found at http://www.cod.uscourts.gov/judges/judges.aspx, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 12/9/15. (ktera)
October 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER HOLDING MOTION IN ABEYANCE Plaintiff's motion for leave to file amended complaint to add demand for punitive damages 102 is at this time premature. The motion will be considered at the scheduling conference when it is convened under Rule 16, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 10/16/15. (ktera)
October 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS 82 Defendants' motion to dismiss pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(2) for lack of personal jurisdiction is denied; Defendants' motion to dismiss pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(7) for failure to join an indispensable party is denied; plaintiff's motion for dismissal pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(6) for failure to state a claim is granted as to the plaintiff's sixth claim (for violation of the Colorado Civil Theft Act); seve nth claim (RICO); the eighth claim (COCCA), eleventh claim (unjust enrichment); twelfth claim (for breach of the February Lease); thirteenth claim (for breach of the March Lease), and fourteenth claim (for breach of the alleged repayment agreement ). The motion is denied as to the plaintiff's claims of fraudulent misrepresentation; fraudulent non-disclosure and concealment; promissory fraud; fraudulent transfer; civil conspiracy, and negligent misrepresentation. The plaintiff shall file an amended complaint on or before October 16, 2015, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 10/2/15. (ktera)
August 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 98 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Senior Judge Richard P. Matsch: Motion Hearing held on 8/26/2015. Taking under advisement 82 Motion to Dismiss. Denying 85 Motion for Order. Granting 92 Motion to Supplement. FTR: K. Terasaki. (rkeec)
May 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER granting 93 plaintiffs unopposed motion for leave to restrict access, at Level 1, to certain exhibits submitted in connection with its opposition to defendants motion to dismiss, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 5/19/2015.(evana, )
February 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER granting 77 the Motion for Establishing March 10, 2015, as the Due Date for Defendants K3B Partners, ULC and Viero Group, Inc., to File Responses to Plaintiffs 58 Amended Complaint, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 2/27/2015.(evana, )
February 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER Directing K3B Partners, ULC to Respond to Amended Complaint, on or before 2/24/2015, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 2/10/15. (dkals, )
February 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 59 MINUTE ENTRY for Status Conference proceedings held before Judge Richard P. Matsch on 2/3/2015. Granting 57 Motion to Amend. Existing Defendants shall respond by February 24, 2015. FTR: Kathy Terasaki. (babia)
November 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER Extending Deadlines re 36 Motion: The deadline for jurisdictional discovery is extended to December 31, 2014 (Para. #4); The deadline for plaintiffs response to defendants' jurisdictional motions is extended to January 30, 2015 (Para. #5); and, The deadline for defendants' replies is extended to February 13, 2015 (Para. #5), by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 11/4/2014.(jsmit)
September 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER Granting 31 Stipulation and Order Regarding Defendants' Jurisdictional Motions, Discovery due by 11/14/2014, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 9/5/2014.(jsmit)
August 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Courtroom Minutes for Motion Hearing held on 8/29/2014 before Judge Richard P. Matsch. ORDERED: Unopposed Motion for Leave to Take Discovery to Respond to Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction 22 , is granted. Scope of discovery is for the purpose of establishing personal jurisdiction. FTR: K. Terasaki. (jsmit)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UET RR, LLC v. Comis et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UET RR, LLC
Represented By: Bruce A. Featherstone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benjamin D. Comis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Talanda Sykes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K3B Partners, ULC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barry W. Comis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Falcon Creek Asset Management, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RKB Investments, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?