Radeker v. County of Elbert

Plaintiff: Cherie Radeker
Defendant: County of Elbert
Case Number: 1:2014cv01238
Filed: April 30, 2014
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Douglas
Presiding Judge: Christine M. Arguello
Referring Judge: Kathleen M. Tafoya
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 19, 2016 119 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 108 Motion for Reconsideration. The Court modifies its order denying Defendants' summary judgment motion (Doc. # 107 ) and hereby grants summary judgment in favor of Defendants Schlegel, Rowland, and Ross on Plaintiff's due process claim (claim one). By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 04/19/2016. (athom, )
March 4, 2016 118 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER; 83 Defendants Motion for Clarification or, in the Alternative, Objection to the Magistrate Judges August 20, 2015 Order, is DENIED, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 3/4/16.(morti, ) Modified on 3/4/2016 to include ruling of the motion (morti, ).
January 15, 2016 112 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Defendant's 109 Motion to Stay Notice of Appeal Deadline. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 01/15/2016. (athom, )
December 3, 2015 107 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 73 Motion for Summary Judgment. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 12/03/2015. (athom, )
August 20, 2015 78 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER; 46 Motion to Permit Limited Subject-Matter Waiver of the Attorney/Client Privilege is DENIED and the hearing scheduled on August 21, 2015 at 9:30 a.m. is VACATED, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 8/20/15.(morti, )
June 11, 2015 56 Opinion or Order of the Court COURTROOM MINUTES for Telephonic Informal Discovery Conference held on 6/11/2015 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. ORDERED: Defendants' Unopposed Motion to Modify Scheduling Order 52 is GRANTED. The dispositive motions deadline i s extended to July 31, 2015. The Telephonic Final Pretrial Conference is VACATED and RESET to October 1, 2015 at 9:45 a.m. The parties shall initiate a conference call and contact chambers at 303-335-2780 at the time of the Final Pretrial Conference. A Final Pretrial Order shall be prepared by the parties and submitted to the court on or before September 24, 2015. FTR: KMT C201. (sgrim)
May 19, 2015 44 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 40 Motion to Amend/Correct/Modify. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 05/19/2015. (athom, )
December 11, 2014 33 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 12/11/14. (sgrim)
August 22, 2014 18 Opinion or Order of the Court SECOND AMENDED ORDER Resetting Scheduling Conference for 10/7/2014 at 10:15 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 8/22/14. (sgrim) Modified on 8/22/2014 to reflect actual name of document. (sgrim)
June 2, 2014 8 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER Resetting Scheduling Conference for 7/28/2014 at 10:15 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 6/2/14. (sgrim)
May 16, 2014 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 8/6/2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 5/16/14. (sgrim)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Radeker v. County of Elbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cherie Radeker
Represented By: Timothy L. Nemechek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Elbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?