Kirkland et al v. WesternLaw Group LLC
Plaintiff: Robert Kirkland and Cheryl Kirkland
Defendant: WesternLaw Group LLC
Case Number: 1:2014cv01316
Filed: May 9, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Adams
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Presiding Judge: Raymond P. Moore
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting 26 Motion to Dismiss with prejudice, by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 9/15/2014.(trlee, )
August 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 8/4/14. Parties shall file a stipulation or motion to dismiss with prejudice on or before August 18, 2014, or a status report addressing why dismissal has not been accomplished. All future hearings set before Magistrate Judge Boland are vacated. The Motion to Strike Affirmative Defenses 17 is DENIED AS MOOT. (bsimm, )
May 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER setting scheduling/planning conference for 7/10/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland. by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 5/23/2014. (trlee, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kirkland et al v. WesternLaw Group LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WesternLaw Group LLC
Represented By: Katharine Anne Jensen
Represented By: Robert James Zavaglia, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Kirkland
Represented By: Daniel James Vedra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheryl Kirkland
Represented By: Daniel James Vedra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?