Broadcast Music, Inc. et al v. B & D, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Broadcast Music, Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Welsh Witch Music, Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Unichappell Music Inc., John Farrar Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., Coral Reefer Music, Lindseyanne Music Co., Inc., The Music Force, EMI Virgin Songs, Inc., Only Hit Music, A Division of Ken Shepard Companies, Inc., Bro 'N' Sis Music, Inc., Estes Park Music and Choice Is Tragic Music
Defendant: B & D, LLC, Debra A. Dolph and Brent Campbell
Case Number: 1:2014cv01524
Filed: May 30, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Watanabe
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER OF DISMISSAL: The 40 Joint Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Settlement Agreement is granted. This action is dismissed with prejudice with the parties to pay their own attorney fees and costs. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 3/12/2015. (alowe)
September 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 36 TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER: Proposed Pretrial Order due by 5/8/2015. Final Pretrial Conference and Trial Preparation Conferences are set 5/15/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Three (3) day Jury Trial set 6/8/2015 08:30 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 9/5/14. (rebsec)
August 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MINUTE ORDER : Granting 30 Unopposed Motion for Continuance of Scheduling Conference. Scheduling Conference 8/27/2014 10:00 AM is vacated. Scheduling Conference reset for 9/5/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. Deadline to file proposed Scheduling Order 9/2/2014 05:00 PM. Denying as moot 17 Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike Defendant B&D, LLC's Answer and Entry of Judgment of Default Against Defendant B&D, LLC. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 8/26/2014.(emill)
June 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE AND SETTING DEADLINE FOR FILING OF PILOT PROGRAM CONSENT FORM. On or before 7/21/2014, parties shall complete and file the Pilot Program Consent Form 5 . Scheduling Conference set for 8/4/2014 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. Consent Form due by 7/21/2014. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 6/2/2014. (emill)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Broadcast Music, Inc. et al v. B & D, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Broadcast Music, Inc.
Represented By: Dana Patrice Jozefczyk
Represented By: George C. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Songs of Universal, Inc.
Represented By: Dana Patrice Jozefczyk
Represented By: George C. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Welsh Witch Music
Represented By: Dana Patrice Jozefczyk
Represented By: George C. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sony/ATV Songs LLC
Represented By: Dana Patrice Jozefczyk
Represented By: George C. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Unichappell Music Inc.
Represented By: Dana Patrice Jozefczyk
Represented By: George C. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Farrar Music
Represented By: Dana Patrice Jozefczyk
Represented By: George C. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stone Diamond Music Corp.
Represented By: Dana Patrice Jozefczyk
Represented By: George C. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Coral Reefer Music
Represented By: Dana Patrice Jozefczyk
Represented By: George C. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lindseyanne Music Co., Inc.
Represented By: Dana Patrice Jozefczyk
Represented By: George C. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Music Force
Represented By: Dana Patrice Jozefczyk
Represented By: George C. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EMI Virgin Songs, Inc.
Represented By: Dana Patrice Jozefczyk
Represented By: George C. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Only Hit Music, A Division of Ken Shepard Companies, Inc.
Represented By: Dana Patrice Jozefczyk
Represented By: George C. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bro 'N' Sis Music, Inc.
Represented By: Dana Patrice Jozefczyk
Represented By: George C. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estes Park Music
Represented By: Dana Patrice Jozefczyk
Represented By: George C. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Choice Is Tragic Music
Represented By: Dana Patrice Jozefczyk
Represented By: George C. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B & D, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debra A. Dolph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brent Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?