Marks v. Colorado Department of Corrections et al

Plaintiff: Nancy Marks
Defendant: Colorado Department of Corrections, Jefferson County Corrections Board, Intervention Community Corrections Services, Susan Keller, Kristin Heath, Rick Raemisch, Susan (I) Keller, Kristin (I) Heath and Rick (I) Raemisch
Case Number: 1:2014cv01577
Filed: June 4, 2014
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Richard P. Matsch
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 25, 2016 82 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: 78 Procedural Order Number One, it is ORDERED that a scheduling conference will be held on June 16, 2016, at 2:00 p.m. in the Conference Room, Second Floor, the Byron White United States Courthouse, 1823 Stout Street, Denver, Colorado. The proposed order (original only) on paper, shall be submitted directly to chambers by 4:00 p.m. on June 6, 2016, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 4/25/2016. (evana, )
March 11, 2016 78 Opinion or Order of the Court PROCEDURAL ORDER NUMBER ONE Counsel will meet and confer as required by Rule 26(f)(2) within 30 days from the date of this order. Lead counsel shall attend the conference in person. The disclosures required by Rule 26(a) (1)(A) shall be made wi thin 14 days after that conference. The proposed discovery plan will be in the form of the Scheduling Order which will be submitted to chambers in paper form 10 days before the date of the Scheduling Conference. Counsel for the plaintiff(s) will telephone chambers within 10 days after the disclosures to set a date and time for a Scheduling Conference pursuant to Rule 16. The instructions for preparation of the Scheduling Order and the form of that order are found at http://www.cod.uscourts.gov/judges/judges.aspx, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 3/11/16. (ktera)
February 24, 2016 72 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER FOR STATUS REPORT At the hearing held on July 24, 2015 71 , the Court ordered Plaintiff to amend the complaint. Nothing further has been filed. Counsel shall file a status report on or before March 2, 2016, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 2/24/16. (ktera)
June 25, 2015 69 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER Pursuant to the Order for Status Conference 67 , a status conference is set for July 24, 2015, at 10:30 a.m. in the Conference Room, Second Floor, the Byron White United States Courthouse, 1823 Stout Street, Denver, Colorado, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 6/25/15. (ktera)
June 19, 2015 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER FOR STATUS CONFERENCE A status conference will be convened at a time to be scheduled with counsel, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 6/19/15. (ktera)
March 13, 2015 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: 56 3/12/15 Order, the proceeding will be a scheduling conference Scheduling Conference set for 4/20/2015 02:00 PM in the Conference Room, Second Floor, the Byron White United States Courthouse, 1823 Stout Street, Denver, Colorado. The proposed order (original only) on paper, shall be submitted directly to chambers by 4:00 p.m. on April 16, 2015, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 3/13/2015. (ktera)
March 12, 2015 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/20/2015 02:00 PM, in the Conference Room, Second Floor, the Byron White United States Courthouse, 1823 Stout Street, Denver, Colorado. Proposed Pretrial Order original only due by 4/16/2015, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 3/12/2015. (ktera)
February 27, 2015 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER on Motion for Reconsideration re: 40 Order, on January 8, 2015. It is therefore ORDERED, that upon reconsideration of the order, that ruling as to Kristin Heath is affirmed. This civil action is dismissed as to her as an individual defendant, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 2/27/2015. (evana, )
January 22, 2015 45 Opinion or Order of the Court COURTROOM MINUTES for Motion Hearing held before Judge Richard P. Matsch on 1/22/2015. Mr. Lane's Oral Motion to Reconsider Ms. Godfrey's Confession on the Declaratory Relief Section of this Case is granted. Denying 19 CDOC Defendants&# 039; Motion to Dismiss. Mr. Stocker and Ms. Lockwood shall file answers to the first amended complaint on or before 2/5/2015. Granting 43 Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration of Order Dismissing Individual Claims Against Defendant Kristin Heath. A written order is forthcoming. FTR: K. Terasaki. (ebuch)
January 8, 2015 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER This Court having now dismissed the third claim for relief against Intervention, Inc., and having also dismissed the individual claims against Susan Keller, Kristin Heath, and Rick Raemisch, and although the newly named defendant Jefferson County Board of Commissioners has not yet appeared in this civil action, a hearing now on the CDOC defendants motions to dismiss may facilitate this matter, it is ORDERED that after consultation with counsel a hearing will be set on the CDOC defendants motion to dismiss. Doc. 19 , by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 1/8/2015. (evana, )
January 7, 2015 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 36 plaintiffs Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint and Jury Demand filed January 5, 2015, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 1/7/2015.(evana, )
November 6, 2014 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER FOR COMPLIANCE WITH FED.R.CIV. P. 7.1 BY DEFENDANT INTERVENTION COMMUNITY CORRECTIONS SERVICES re 13 / 14 : on or before November 14, 2014, Defendant Intervention Community Corrections Services must file its Disclosure Statement or state why it is not subject to Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 11/6/2014. (jsmit)
June 6, 2014 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Drawing Case. This case shall be drawn to a presiding judge, and when applicable to a magistrate judge, by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 6/06/2014. (slibi, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marks v. Colorado Department of Corrections et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Marks
Represented By: Nicole Brianne Godfrey
Represented By: David Arthur Lane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colorado Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jefferson County Corrections Board
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Intervention Community Corrections Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristin Heath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick Raemisch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan (I) Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristin (I) Heath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick (I) Raemisch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?