Davidson v. Bank of America N.A. et al
Plaintiff: Kenneth R. Davidson
Defendant: Bank of America N.A. and Green Tree Servicing LLC
Case Number: 1:2014cv01578
Filed: June 4, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Douglas
Presiding Judge: Christine M. Arguello
Presiding Judge: Kathleen M. Tafoya
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 134 FINAL JUDGMENT by Clerk in favor of Defendants and against Plaintiff, re: 133 Order on Report and Recommendations by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 3/11/2016. (vbarn)
September 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER; 94 Defendants Joint and Unopposed Motion to Stay Discovery Pending Ruling on Defendants Respective Motions to Dismiss is GRANTED. Allproceedings in this matter are STAYED pending ruling on the motions to dismiss. The parties shall file a joint status report within ten days of ruling on the motions to dismiss to advise if a further scheduling conference should be set, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 9/16/15.(morti, )
July 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER; 63 Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to file Plaintiffs Amended Complaint (Doc. No. 69) and the exhibits attached thereto. 48 Green Trees Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to F.R.C.P. Rule 12(b)(6) is DENIED as moot as it is now directed at an inoperative pleading, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 7/24/15.(morti, )
July 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER; 29 Plaintiff's "Request for Cease and Desist Order Against Greentree Servicing, LLC with Prejudice in Regards to Rule 120 Hearing 2013CV03922" and Ex Parte Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction with Asset Freeze and Permanent Injunction Against Green Tree Servicing LLC to Enjoin their Efforts to Profit from Foreclosure Sale and Dispose of Evidence with the Sale of 10067 Broome Way, Highlands Ranch CO [42 are DENIED without prejudice as moot, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 7/20/15.(morti, )
July 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 76 AMENDED ORDER Resetting Scheduling Conference for 8/10/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 7/6/15. (sgrim)
May 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER Setting Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference and Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. The court shall hold a Fed. R. Civ. P. (16)(b) scheduling and planning conference on 7/1/2015 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 05/14/2015. (athom, )
March 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 47 AMENDED ORDER re: 46 Order. Defendant Green Tree Servicing LLC shall respond to Plaintiff's Motion no later than March 30, 2015. Defendant Bank of America NA may also file a response to Plaintiff Motion no later than March 30, 2015, if it deems a response to be necessary. Plaintiff may file a reply no later than April 16, 2015. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 03/10/2015. (athom, )
March 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER re: 42 Motion. It is ORDERED that Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction with Asset Freeze and Permanent Injunction against Green Tree Servicing LLC to Enjoin their Efforts to Profit fr om Foreclosure Sale and Dispose of Evidence with the Sale of 10067 Broome Way, Highlands Ranch CO (Doc. No. 42 ) is DENIED in part to the extent it seeks an ex parte temporary restraining order, and TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT in part to the extent it s eeks a preliminary injunction preventing foreclosure on his home. Defendant Green Tree Servicing LLC shall respond to Plaintiff's Motion no later than May 30, 2015. Defendant Bank of America NA may also file a response to Plaintiff Motion no later than May 30, 2015, if it deems a response to be necessary. Plaintiff may file a reply no later than April 16, 2015. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 03/06/2015. (athom, )
February 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER. It is ORDERED that Green Tree's "Amended Motion to Set Aside Entry of Default and for an Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint" (Doc. No. 14 ) and the "Request to Set Aside Entry of Default" contained in Bank of America's Response to Plaintiff's Motions for Default Judgment are GRANTED. The default entered against Bank of America and Green Tree is VACATED. Bank of America's Answer to Complaint is ACCEPTED as filed. Green Tree shall answer or o therwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint no later than March 12, 2015. Plaintiff's First and Second Motions for Default Judgment (Doc. Nos. 11 & 16 ) and Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Defendant Bank of America's Answer (Doc. No. 28 ) are DENIED as moot. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 02/26/2015. (athom, )
November 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER denying 19 Defendant Bank of America, N.A.'s Motion to Quash Service of Process, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 11/18/14.(sgrim)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davidson v. Bank of America N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth R. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Green Tree Servicing LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?