Auto-Owners Insurance Company v. Next Generation Energy, LLC et al
Plaintiff: |
Auto-Owners Insurance Company |
Defendant: |
Next Generation Energy, LLC, Kreutzman Construction, Inc., David Kreutzman, Stephen Mendez and Laura Mendez |
Case Number: |
1:2014cv01580 |
Filed: |
June 4, 2014 |
Court: |
U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado |
Office: |
Denver Office |
County: |
XX US, Outside State |
Presiding Judge: |
Robert E. Blackburn |
Presiding Judge: |
Kristen L. Mix |
Nature of Suit: |
Insurance |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
September 30, 2015 |
Filing
69
ORDER DISMISSING CASE Joint Stipulation for Dismissal with Prejudice is approved.The combined Trial preparation Conference and Final Pretrial Conference set October 16, 2015, is vacated. Joint Motion To Vacate and Reset the Trial Date and Motion To Vacate and Reset the Final Pretrial Hearing 61 is denied as moot. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 9/30/2015. (mlace, )
|
August 11, 2015 |
Filing
67
ORDER approving 64 Joint Stipulation for Partial Dismissal. That the claim of the plaintiff against defendants, Stephen Mendez and LauraMendez, is dismissed with prejudice. Laura Mendez (individuals) and Stephen Mendez (individuals) terminated. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 8/11/2015. (mlace, )
|
June 30, 2015 |
Filing
60
MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 6/30/15. Joint Motion to Amend Scheduling Order Per Minute Order Entered June 8, 2015 (Dkt. No. 56) # 57 is GRANTED in part. Discovery due by 2/5/2016. Dispositive Motions due by 3/7/2016. (lgale, )
|
April 22, 2015 |
Filing
49
MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 4/22/15. Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint # 47 is GRANTED. Plaintiff shall file a non-redlined version of the Third Amended Complaint on or before April 27, 2015.(lgale, )
|
December 19, 2014 |
Filing
41
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 25 Motion to Stay. The Motion is granted to the extent that discovery in this matter is stayed until the conclusion of the criminal action against Mr. Kreutzman. The Motion is denied without prejudice as to all other relief sought. The parties shall file a Joint Status Report within 10 days of final resolution of the criminal action against Mr. Kreutzman. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 12/19/2014.(alowe)
|
December 2, 2014 |
Filing
39
MINUTE ORDER granting 38 Unopposed Motion to File Amended Complaint. The plaintiff shall file a copy of its second amended complaint, as shown in Exhibit 1 to the motion on or before 12/5/2014. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 12/2/2014. (alowe)
|
October 14, 2014 |
Filing
31
TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER: Proposed Pretrial Order due by 10/9/2015. Final Pretrial Conference and Trial Preparation Conference are set 10/16/2015 10:30 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Five (5) day Jury Trial set 11/2/2015 08:30 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 10/14/14. (rebsec)
|
September 29, 2014 |
Filing
27
MINUTE ORDER denying as moot 17 Motion to Stay. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 9/29/2014. (alowe)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?