Kelly v. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Plaintiff: Omar Kelly
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2014cv01692
Filed: June 17, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Christine M. Arguello
Presiding Judge: Kathleen M. Tafoya
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 26 FINAL JUDGMENT in favor of Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. against Omar Kelly re: Order 25 Granting Motion for Summary Judgment by Clerk on 7/31/2015. (vbarn)
March 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting 16 Motion to Amend/Correct/Modify. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 03/06/2015. (athom, )
September 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SECOND AMENDED ORDER Resetting Scheduling Conference for 10/27/2014 09:30 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 9/18/14. (sgrim)
July 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 7 AMENDED ORDER Resetting Scheduling Conference for 9/23/2014 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 7/29/14. (sgrim)
June 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 9/22/2014 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 6/24/14. (sgrim)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kelly v. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Omar Kelly
Represented By: Lonn M. Heymann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?