USA v. $11,115.00 in United States Currency et al

Plaintiff: USA
Defendant: $11,115.00 in United States Currency and 1995 Mercedes S500 Sedan, VIN WDBGA51E4SA219610
Case Number: 1:2014cv01712
Filed: June 19, 2014
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Robert E. Blackburn
Referring Judge: Kristen L. Mix
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 8, 2015 48 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT by Clerk: in favor of USA against $11,115.00 in United States Currency, 1995 Mercedes S500 Sedan, VIN WDBGA51E4SA219610, Richard P. Fleenor re: 47 Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property. By Clerk on 9/8/15. (kfinn)
August 7, 2015 44 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 8/7/15. Motion to Compel # 39 is deemed WITHDRAWN. Plaintiff's Motion to Withdraw Motion to Compel # 42 is GRANTED.(lgale, )
February 17, 2015 27 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 25 Motion to Lift Stay. A Status Conference is set for 3/31/2015 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. The answer deadline is extended to 3/10/2015. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 2/17/2015.(alowe)
August 28, 2014 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 15 Motion to Stay. This matter is STAYED pending the outcome of Claimant Fleenor's related criminal cases. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 8/28/2014.(trlee, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. $11,115.00 in United States Currency et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $11,115.00 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1995 Mercedes S500 Sedan, VIN WDBGA51E4SA219610
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: James Sandy Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?