Snyder et al v. Acord Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Louise Creager, Mary Ann Geldreich, Dorothy Wood Hammer, Mary Harrow, Sueham Kay Hoffman, Sueham (I) Kay Hoffman, Janet Koch, Gary Lemert, Martha Lemert, Tommy Meyer, Jeffrey Ray, Jennifer Ray, Ian Siemplenski, Dale Snyder, Marilyn Snyder, Catherine Taylor, Laila Saeda Urban, Laila (I) Saeda Urban, Nicole Wright-Meyer, Kenneth Dale Yoder, Ken Yoder, Kate Taylor and Jeff Ray
Defendant: Acord Corporation, Acuity, A Mutual Insurance Company, Addison Insurance Company, All American Insurance Company, Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company, Allianz Life Insurance Co. of North America, Allianz of America, Inc., Allstate Insurance Company, American Association of Insurance Services, Inc., American Automobile Insurance Company, American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida, American Family Home Insurance Company, American Family Mutual Insurance Company, American Indemnity Financial Corporation, American International Group, Inc., American Modern Home Insurance Company, American Modern Insurance Group, Inc., American Modern Select Insurance Company, American Reliable Insurance Company, American Strategic Insurance Corp., Associated Indemnity Corporation, Auto-Owners Insurance Company, Automobile Insurance Company of Hartford Connecticut, Buckeye State Mutual Insurance Company, The, California Casualty Indemnity Exchange, The, Casualty Actuarial Society, Central Mutual Insurance Company, Chubb Corporation, The, Chubb National Insurance Company, Chubb Services Corporation, Cincinnati Insurance Company, Colorado Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Co., Country Mutual Insurance Company, Electric Insurance Company, Employers Mutual Casualty Company, Encompass Indemnity Company, Encompass Insurance Company of America, Farmers Alliance Mutual Insurance Company, Farmers Insurance Company, Federal Insurance Company, Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland, Fireman's Fund Insurance Company, First American Financial Corporation, First American Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Grange Insurance Association, Great Northern Insurance Company, Guideone Mutual Insurance Company, Hartford Accident and Indemnity Company, Hartford Financial Services Group, The, Hartford Fire Insurance Company, Insurance Services Office, Inc., Internation Insurance Society, Inc., Kemper Corporate Services, Inc., Kemper Corporation, LM Insurance Corporation, Lafayette Insurance Company, Liberty Insurance Corporation, Liberty Mutual Insurance, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Markel American Insurance Company, Markel Insurance Company, McKinsey & Company, Inc., MetLife Auto & Home Insurance Agency, Inc., Metropolitan Direct Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Metropolitan Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Milbank Insurance Company, Munich-American Holding Corporation, National Casualty Company, National Farmers Union Property and Casualty Company, National Surety Corporation, Nationwide Affinity Insurance Company of America, Nationwide Insurance Company of America, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Owners Insurance Company, Pacific Indemnity Company, Pharmacists Mutual Insurance Company, Praetorian Insurance Company, Property Casualty Insurers Association of America, QBE Holdings, Inc., QBE Insurance Company, QBE Insurance Group, Limited, Safeco Insurance Company of America, Secura Insurance Holdings, Inc., Sentry Insurance, A Mutual Company, Shelter Mutual Insurance Company, Standard Fire Insurance Company, State Automobile Insurance Company, State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, Stillwater Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Texas General Indemnity Company, Travelers Commercial Insurance Company, Travelers Companies Inc., The, Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, Travelers Indemnity Company of America, Travelers Insurance Company, The, Travelers Insurance Group Holdings, Inc., USAACasualty Insurance Company, United Fire & Casualty Company, United Fire Group, Inc., United Fire Insurance Company, United Fire Lloyds, United Fire and Indemnity Company, United Life Insurance Company, United Services Automobile Association, Unitrin Auto and Home Insurance Company, Unitrin Direct Property & Casualty Company, Verisk Analytics Inc, Vigilant Insurance Company, Zurich American Insurance Company, Zurich Insurance Group Ltd/FI, QBE Insurance Corporation, McKinsey, Farmers Casualty Insurance Company, Fireman and Fidelity National Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Consolidated Defendant: ABC Insurance Company, ABC Organization and United Fire & Indemnity Company
Case Number: 1:2014cv01736
Filed: June 20, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Larimer
Presiding Judge: John L Kane
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 14, 2020 Filing 649 MANDATE of USCA as to #632 Notice of Appeal, #648 USCA Order and Judgment, : (USCA Case No. 19-1112) (evana, )
April 22, 2020 Filing 648 USCA Order and Judgment as to #632 Notice of Appeal, filed by Gary Lemert, Ian Siemplenski, Sueham (I) Kay Hoffman, Jennifer Ray, Laila Saeda Urban, Laila (I) Saeda Urban, Catherine Taylor, Kenneth Dale Yoder, Tommy Meyer, Martha Lemert, Nicole Wright-Meyer, Mary Harrow, Sueham Kay Hoffman, Louise Creager, Jeffrey Ray, Mary Ann Geldreich, Janet Koch, Dale Snyder, Dorothy Wood Hammer, Marilyn Snyder : The district courts orders are affirmed. The motion to unseal Volume 43 of Appellants' Appendix is denied. (USCA Case No. 19-1112) (This document is not the Mandate) (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter to Order and Judgment)(evana, )
February 3, 2020 Filing 647 NOTICE of Firm Name Change and E-Mail Contact Change by Defendant American Family Mutual Insurance Company (McCarthy, Michael)
August 15, 2019 Filing 646 NOTICE of Change of Address/Contact Information by Jeffrey Clay Ruebel (Ruebel, Jeffrey)
June 26, 2019 Filing 645 NOTICE of Change of Address/Contact Information by Michael S. McCarthy (McCarthy, Michael)
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 644 ORDER granting #643 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Margaret Y. Cass is hereby withdrawn as counsel of record for the above-listed Defendant. ORDERED by Judge John L. Kane on 5/1/2019.(cthom, )
May 1, 2019 Filing 643 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Margaret Y. Cass by Defendant American Family Mutual Insurance Company. (Cass, Margaret)
April 29, 2019 Filing 642 NOTICE of Non-Participation in Appeal by Defendant Secura Insurance Holdings, Inc. (Khan, Muliha)
April 29, 2019 Filing 641 NOTICE of Non-Participation in Appeal by Defendant Farmers Alliance Mutual Insurance Company (Khan, Muliha)
April 18, 2019 Filing 640 NOTICE of Non-Participation in Appeal by Defendants Acuity, A Mutual Insurance Company, American Strategic Insurance Corp. (Jamison, Jamey)
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 639 ORDER denying Creditor Defendants' #637 Motion Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.58(D) for Entry of a Formal Judgment Order. ORDERED by Judge John L. Kane on 4/15/2019. (cthom, )
April 11, 2019 Filing 638 RESPONSE to #637 MOTION for Judgment re #621 Memorandum & Opinion, #623 Order JUDGMENT CREDITOR DEFENDANTS MOTION PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 58(D) FOR ENTRY OF A FORMAL JUDGMENT ORDER and Continued Objection filed by Plaintiffs Louise Creager, Mary Ann Geldreich, Dorothy Wood Hammer, Mary Harrow, Sueham Kay Hoffman, Sueham (I) Kay Hoffman, Janet Koch, Gary Lemert, Martha Lemert, Tommy Meyer, Jeffrey Ray, Jennifer Ray, Ian Siemplenski, Dale Snyder, Marilyn Snyder, Catherine Taylor, Laila (I) Saeda Urban, Laila Saeda Urban, Nicole Wright-Meyer, Kenneth Dale Yoder. (Hernandez, Josue)
April 11, 2019 Filing 637 MOTION for Judgment re #621 Memorandum & Opinion, #623 Order JUDGMENT CREDITOR DEFENDANTS MOTION PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 58(D) FOR ENTRY OF A FORMAL JUDGMENT ORDER by Defendants Chubb Corporation, The, Chubb National Insurance Company, Chubb Services Corporation, Federal Insurance Company, Great Northern Insurance Company, Pacific Indemnity Company, Vigilant Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A List of Joining Parties, #2 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Proposed Judgment Order)(Cohn, Jacob)
April 11, 2019 Filing 636 LETTER TO USCA and all counsel certifying the record is complete as to #632 Notice of Appeal,,, filed by Gary Lemert, Ian Siemplenski, Sueham (I) Kay Hoffman, Jennifer Ray, Laila Saeda Urban, Laila (I) Saeda Urban, Catherine Taylor, Kenneth Dale Yoder, Tommy Meyer, Martha Lemert, Nicole Wright-Meyer, Mary Harrow, Sueham Kay Hoffman, Louise Creager, Jeffrey Ray, Mary Ann Geldreich, Janet Koch, Dale Snyder, Dorothy Wood Hammer, Marilyn Snyder. A transcript order form was filed stating that the necessary transcript is already on file. ( Appeal No. 19-1112) Text Only Entry. (cthom, )
April 10, 2019 Filing 635 TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM re #632 Notice of Appeal,,, 19-1112 by Plaintiffs Louise Creager, Mary Ann Geldreich, Dorothy Wood Hammer, Mary Harrow, Sueham Kay Hoffman, Sueham (I) Kay Hoffman, Janet Koch, Gary Lemert, Martha Lemert, Tommy Meyer, Jeffrey Ray, Jennifer Ray, Ian Siemplenski, Dale Snyder, Marilyn Snyder, Catherine Taylor, Laila Saeda Urban, Nicole Wright-Meyer, Kenneth Dale Yoder (Hernandez, Josue)
March 28, 2019 Filing 634 USCA Case Number 19-1112 for #632 Notice of Appeal,,, filed by Gary Lemert, Ian Siemplenski, Sueham (I) Kay Hoffman, Jennifer Ray, Laila Saeda Urban, Laila (I) Saeda Urban, Catherine Taylor, Kenneth Dale Yoder, Tommy Meyer, Martha Lemert, Nicole Wright-Meyer, Mary Harrow, Sueham Kay Hoffman, Louise Creager, Jeffrey Ray, Mary Ann Geldreich, Janet Koch, Dale Snyder, Dorothy Wood Hammer, Marilyn Snyder. (cthom, )
March 27, 2019 Filing 633 LETTER Transmitting Notice of Appeal to all counsel advising of the transmittal of the #632 Notice of Appeal,,, filed by Gary Lemert, Ian Siemplenski, Sueham (I) Kay Hoffman, Jennifer Ray, Laila Saeda Urban, Laila (I) Saeda Urban, Catherine Taylor, Kenneth Dale Yoder, Tommy Meyer, Martha Lemert, Nicole Wright-Meyer, Mary Harrow, Sueham Kay Hoffman, Louise Creager, Jeffrey Ray, Mary Ann Geldreich, Janet Koch, Dale Snyder, Dorothy Wood Hammer, Marilyn Snyder to the U.S. Court of Appeals. ( Retained Counsel, Fee paid,) (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet, #2 Preliminary Record)(cthom, )
March 27, 2019 Filing 632 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #621 Memorandum & Opinion, #578 Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, Order on Motion to Compel, #526 Order on Motion for Attorney Fees,, Order on Motion for Hearing/Conference, #628 Order on Motion for Recusal, #631 Order on Motion for Leave to Restrict,, #625 Order on Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law,, #591 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct/Modify, #623 Order by Plaintiffs Louise Creager, Mary Ann Geldreich, Dorothy Wood Hammer, Mary Harrow, Sueham Kay Hoffman, Sueham (I) Kay Hoffman, Janet Koch, Gary Lemert, Martha Lemert, Tommy Meyer, Jeffrey Ray, Jennifer Ray, Ian Siemplenski, Dale Snyder, Marilyn Snyder, Catherine Taylor, Laila (I) Saeda Urban, Laila Saeda Urban, Nicole Wright-Meyer, Kenneth Dale Yoder (Filing fee $ 505, Receipt Number 1082-6605327) (Hernandez, Josue)
March 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 631 ORDER granting #627 Defendants Electric Insurances and USAAs Motion to Restrict ECF No. #626 and Exhibits as a Level 1 Document or to Seal Under the Courts Inherent Powers. Document Nos. #626 and Plaintiffs Response/Objection to Defendants Electric Insurances and USAAs Motion to Restrict ECF No. #626 and Exhibits as a Level 1 Document or to Seal Under the Courts Inherent Powers [Doc. No. #630 ] will be subject to restricted access, Level 1, until further Order of the Court. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 3/15/2019. (jgonz, )
March 7, 2019 Filing 630 RESPONSE to #627 MOTION for Leave to Restrict and Objection filed by Plaintiffs Louise Creager, Mary Ann Geldreich, Dorothy Wood Hammer, Mary Harrow, Sueham Kay Hoffman, Sueham (I) Kay Hoffman, Janet Koch, Gary Lemert, Martha Lemert, Tommy Meyer, Jeffrey Ray, Jennifer Ray, Ian Siemplenski, Dale Snyder, Marilyn Snyder, Catherine Taylor, Laila (I) Saeda Urban, Laila Saeda Urban, Nicole Wright-Meyer, Kenneth Dale Yoder. (Hernandez, Josue) Modified on 3/8/2019 to add a Level 1 Restriction pending the ruling #627 Motion for Leave to Restrict (athom, ).
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 629 MEMORANDUM regarding #627 MOTION for Leave to Restrict filed by United Services Automobile Association, Electric Insurance Company. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya pursuant to #628 Order. ORDERED by Judge John L. Kane on 3/7/2019. (cthom, )
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 628 ORDER denying #626 Relief from Judgment, Pursuant to Rules 60(b)(6), 28 U.S.C. 455 and 144. The pending Motion to Restrict ECF No. 626 and Exhibits (ECF No. 627) is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for determination. Pursuant to the local rules, the subject documents will remain restricted until the Motion to Restrict is ruled on. ORDERED by Judge John L. Kane on 3/7/2019. (cthom, )
March 1, 2019 Filing 627 MOTION for Order to Restrict ECF No. 626 and Exhibits as a Level 1 Document or to Seal Under the Court's Inherent Powers by Defendants Electric Insurance Company, United Services Automobile Association. (O'Donnell, Michael) Modified on 3/1/2019 to correct the event (agarc, ).
February 28, 2019 Filing 626 MOTION for Recusal and Relief from Judgment, Pursuant to Rules 60(b)(6), 28 U.S.C. 455 and 144 by Plaintiffs Louise Creager, Mary Ann Geldreich, Dorothy Wood Hammer, Mary Harrow, Sueham Kay Hoffman, Sueham (I) Kay Hoffman, Janet Koch, Gary Lemert, Martha Lemert, Tommy Meyer, Jeffrey Ray, Jennifer Ray, Ian Siemplenski, Dale Snyder, Marilyn Snyder, Catherine Taylor, Laila (I) Saeda Urban, Laila Saeda Urban, Nicole Wright-Meyer, Kenneth Dale Yoder. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 9)(Hernandez, Josue) Modified on 3/1/2019 to restrict pursuant to #627 pending ruling (agarc, ).
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 625 ORDER denying #624 Motion Questioning the Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law, Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 52(a)(5); Requesting, Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 52(a)(1), that the Findings and Conclusions be Stated Specially and Separately; Requesting Amended and Additional Findings Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 52(b); and Requesting Judgment as a Matter of Law, or, in the Alternative, Opening and Amendment of the Judgment Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 59(a)(1)(B), (a)(2) and (e). ORDERED by Judge John L. Kane on 2/25/2019. (cthom, )
February 21, 2019 Filing 624 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Pursuant to Rules 59 and 52 by Plaintiffs Louise Creager, Mary Ann Geldreich, Dorothy Wood Hammer, Mary Harrow, Sueham Kay Hoffman, Sueham (I) Kay Hoffman, Janet Koch, Gary Lemert, Martha Lemert, Tommy Meyer, Jeffrey Ray, Jennifer Ray, Ian Siemplenski, Dale Snyder, Marilyn Snyder, Catherine Taylor, Laila (I) Saeda Urban, Laila Saeda Urban, Nicole Wright-Meyer, Kenneth Dale Yoder. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Hernandez, Josue)
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 623 ORDER On Specific Amount of Attorney Fees Awarded Under 28 U.S.C. 1927. ORDERED by Judge John L. Kane on 2/7/2019. (cthom, )
February 6, 2019 Filing 622 NOTICE re #621 Memorandum & Opinion of Submission of Attorneys' Fees (filed on behalf of Joint Defendants) by Defendants First American Financial Corporation, First American Property & Casualty Insurance Company (Tatman, Erin)
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 621 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER AWARDING ATTORNEY FEES by Judge John L. Kane on 1/24/2019. (cthom, )
May 2, 2018 Filing 620 TRANSCRIPT of Motions Hearing held on March 5, 2018 before Judge Kane. Pages: 1-71. NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within seven calendar days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact, of the party's intent to redact personal identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. If a Notice of Intent to Redact is not filed within the allotted time, this transcript will be made electronically available after 90 days. Please see the Notice of Electronic Availability of Transcripts document at www.cod.uscourts.gov. Transcript may only be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber prior to the 90 day deadline for electronic posting on PACER. (smitc, )
April 5, 2018 Filing 619 REPLY to Response to #508 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Defendants Electric Insurance Company, First American Financial Corporation, First American Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (Frohardt, Erin)
April 5, 2018 Filing 618 RESPONSE to #508 MOTION for Attorney Fees [i.e., NOTICE OF FILING CONCERNING PLAINTIFFS' AMENDED SUMMARY OF ATTORNEYS' FEES BILLINGS PURSUANT TO FED.R.CIV.P. 15(a)(1)(A) AND D.C.COLO.LCivR 15.1(a)] filed by Plaintiffs Louise Creager, Mary Ann Geldreich, Dorothy Wood Hammer, Mary Harrow, Sueham Kay Hoffman, Sueham (I) Kay Hoffman, Janet Koch, Gary Lemert, Martha Lemert, Tommy Meyer, Jeffrey Ray, Jennifer Ray, Ian Siemplenski, Dale Snyder, Marilyn Snyder, Catherine Taylor, Laila (I) Saeda Urban, Laila Saeda Urban, Nicole Wright-Meyer, Kenneth Dale Yoder. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit Exhibit 23)(Hernandez, Josue)
March 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 617 MINUTE ORDER GRANTING 615 Motion for Withdrawal of James A. Pinderski. Given that representation of Defendant Farmers Alliance Mutual Insurance Company will continue through Attorneys Muliha A. Khan and Michael J. DiSantis, Mr. Pinderski is authorized to WITHDRAW as counsel. Mr. Pinderski SHALL be REMOVED from future electronic notifications in this case. ORDERED by Judge John L. Kane on 3/27/2018. (cthom, )
March 27, 2018 Filing 616 Administrative Notice re #615 MOTION to Withdraw James A. Pinderski by Defendant Farmers Alliance Mutual Insurance Company. Pursuant to D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(b), any attorney wanting to withdraw from a case who has already made an appearance must do so by filing a Motion to Withdraw as Counsel, electronically ("s/") signed, using his/her own ecf account. (Text Only Entry) (cthom, )
March 27, 2018 Filing 615 MOTION to Withdraw James A. Pinderski by Defendant Farmers Alliance Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Khan, Muliha)
March 26, 2018 Filing 614 RESPONSE to #508 MOTION for Attorney Fees i.e., Summary of Attorneys' Fees Billings filed by Plaintiffs Louise Creager, Mary Ann Geldreich, Mary Harrow, Sueham Kay Hoffman, Sueham (I) Kay Hoffman, Janet Koch, Gary Lemert, Martha Lemert, Tommy Meyer, Jeffrey Ray, Jennifer Ray, Ian Siemplenski, Dale Snyder, Marilyn Snyder, Catherine Taylor, Laila (I) Saeda Urban, Laila Saeda Urban, Nicole Wright-Meyer, Kenneth Dale Yoder. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit Exhibit 19)(Hernandez, Josue)
March 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 613 ORDER granting #612 Unopposed Motion to Withdraw from #508 Motion for Award of Attorneys' Fees. Defendants Insurance Services Office, Inc. and Verisk Analytics, Inc. are withdrawn, without prejudice, as Moving Defendants from the #508 Motion for Award of Attorneys' Fees. ORDERED by Judge John L. Kane on 3/21/2018. (cthom, )
March 16, 2018 Filing 612 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw from Motion for Award of Attorneys' Fees by Defendants Insurance Services Office, Inc., Verisk Analytics Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Bayer, Mark)
March 5, 2018 Filing 611 MINUTE ENTRY for In Court Hearing proceedings held before Judge John L. Kane: held on 3/5/2018. ORDERED: Plaintiff counsel, Mr. Hernandez, has to and including March 26, 2018 to submit summaries. Defendants counsel shall have to and including April 5, 2018 to reply. Court Reporter: Sarah Mitchell. (babia)
March 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 610 MINUTE ORDER GRANTING the #609 Motion for Withdrawal of Ellis J. Mayer and William A. Waddell, Jr. Given the representations in the motion, Mr. Waddell and Mr. Mayer are authorized to WITHDRAW as counsel. Mr. Waddell and Mr. Mayer SHALL be REMOVED from future electronic notifications in this case. ORDERED by Judge John L. Kane on 3/5/2018. (cthom, )
March 5, 2018 Filing 609 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Ellis J. Mayer and William A. Wadell, Jr by Defendant Colorado Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Co.. (Mayer, Ellis)
March 5, 2018 Filing 608 AFFIDAVIT Amended of Kevin Shea by Defendants First American Financial Corporation, First American Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Frohardt, Erin)
March 1, 2018 Filing 607 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES: re: #606 Stipulation, filed by attorney Josue Hernandez. The document was not filed electronically. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - future documents must be filed pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 4.1(a) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases). (Text Only Entry) (cthom, )
March 1, 2018 Filing 606 STIPULATION BETWEEN PLAINTIFFS AND CERTAIN DEFENDANTS by Plaintiffs Louise Creager, Mary Ann Geldreich, Dorothy Wood Hammer, Mary Harrow, Sueham Kay Hoffman, Sueham (I) Kay Hoffman, Janet Koch, Gary Lemert, Martha Lemert, Tommy Meyer, Jeffrey Ray, Jennifer Ray, Ian Siemplenski, Dale Snyder, Marilyn Snyder, Catherine Taylor, Laila (I) Saeda Urban, Laila Saeda Urban, Nicole Wright-Meyer, Kenneth Dale Yoder. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Supplemental Declaration, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Hernandez, Josue)
February 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 605 MINUTE ORDER GRANTING the #604 Amended Motion to Withdraw as Counsel. Given that representation of Defendant McKinsey & Company, Inc. will continue through Christopher C. Ash, Attorney Stephen Clawson Robertson is authorized to WITHDRAW as counsel. Mr. Robertson SHALL be REMOVED from future electronic notifications in this case. ORDERED by Judge John L. Kane on 2/8/2018. (cthom, )
February 8, 2018 Filing 604 Proposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Defendants McKinsey & Company, Inc., McKinsey & Company, Inc.. (Robertson, Stephen)
February 8, 2018 Filing 603 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Stephen C. Robertson by Defendants McKinsey & Company, Inc., McKinsey & Company, Inc.. (Ash, Christopher)
February 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 602 MINUTE ORDER. An In Court Hearing is set for March 5, 2018, at 1:30 PM in the Alfred A. Arraj United States District Courthouse, 901 19th Street, Courtroom A802, Denver, Colorado, before Judge John L. Kane. Ordered by Judge John L. Kane on 2/2/2018. Text Only Entry (jlksec)
January 29, 2018 Filing 601 BRIEF in Opposition to #508 MOTION for Attorney Fees (i.e., Sur-Reply Brief in Opposition to ECF Nos. 508, 523, 581, 598) filed by Plaintiffs Louise Creager, Mary Ann Geldreich, Dorothy Wood Hammer, Mary Harrow, Sueham Kay Hoffman, Sueham (I) Kay Hoffman, Janet Koch, Gary Lemert, Martha Lemert, Tommy Meyer, Jeffrey Ray, Jennifer Ray, Ian Siemplenski, Dale Snyder, Marilyn Snyder, Catherine Taylor, Laila (I) Saeda Urban, Laila Saeda Urban, Nicole Wright-Meyer, Kenneth Dale Yoder. (Hernandez, Josue)
January 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 600 ORDER granting #599 Motion for Leave to File a Sur-reply Brief Pursuant to #565 Scheduling Order. ORDERED by Judge John L. Kane on 1/29/2018. (cthom, )
January 24, 2018 Filing 599 MOTION for Leave to to File a Sur-reply Brief, or, in the alternative, for judgment on partial findings pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 52(c) by Plaintiffs Louise Creager, Mary Ann Geldreich, Dorothy Wood Hammer, Mary Harrow, Sueham Kay Hoffman, Sueham (I) Kay Hoffman, Janet Koch, Gary Lemert, Martha Lemert, Tommy Meyer, Jeffrey Ray, Jennifer Ray, Ian Siemplenski, Dale Snyder, Marilyn Snyder, Catherine Taylor, Laila (I) Saeda Urban, Laila Saeda Urban, Nicole Wright-Meyer, Kenneth Dale Yoder. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2)(Hernandez, Josue)
January 11, 2018 Filing 598 REPLY to #581 Brief,,,, for Determination of Amount of Attorneys' Fees to be Awarded (filed on behalf of all Defendants identified in Exhibit A to Opening Brief) by Defendants First American Financial Corporation, First American Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (Frohardt, Erin)
January 8, 2018 Filing 597 Letter from U.S. Supreme Court regarding Petition for Writ of Certiorari re #500 Notice of Appeal and #514 Notice of Appeal; assigned Supreme Court No. 17-309 ( Appeal No. 16-1111 and 16-1215) "The petition for rehearing is denied." (cthom, )
December 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 596 ORDER granting #595 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Matthew D. Spohn is hereby withdrawn as counsel of record for Markel Insurance Company and Markel American Insurance Company. ORDERED by Judge John L. Kane on 12/22/2017. (cthom, )
December 22, 2017 Filing 595 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Matthew Spohn by Defendants Markel American Insurance Company, Markel Insurance Company. (Spohn, Matthew)
December 22, 2017 Filing 594 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jason K. Fagelman on behalf of Markel American Insurance Company, Markel Insurance CompanyAttorney Jason K. Fagelman added to party Markel American Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Jason K. Fagelman added to party Markel American Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Jason K. Fagelman added to party Markel Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Jason K. Fagelman added to party Markel Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Fagelman, Jason)
December 22, 2017 Filing 593 Exhibits in Support Exhibit 21, Response to Opening Brief: Attorneys' Fees,ECF No.Brief 581 by Plaintiffs Louise Creager, Mary Ann Geldreich, Dorothy Wood Hammer, Mary Harrow, Sueham Kay Hoffman, Sueham (I) Kay Hoffman, Janet Koch, Gary Lemert, Martha Lemert, Tommy Meyer, Jeffrey Ray, Jennifer Ray, Ian Siemplenski, Dale Snyder, Marilyn Snyder, Catherine Taylor, Laila (I) Saeda Urban, Laila Saeda Urban, Nicole Wright-Meyer, Kenneth Dale Yoder. (Hernandez, Josue)
December 21, 2017 Filing 592 RESPONSE to #581 BRIEF for Determination of Amount of Attorneys' Fees to be Awarded, filed on behalf of the Defendants identified in Exhibit A filed by Plaintiffs Louise Creager, Mary Ann Geldreich, Dorothy Wood Hammer, Mary Harrow, Sueham Kay Hoffman, Sueham (I) Kay Hoffman, Janet Koch, Gary Lemert, Martha Lemert, Tommy Meyer, Jeffrey Ray, Jennifer Ray, Ian Siemplenski, Dale Snyder, Marilyn Snyder, Catherine Taylor, Laila (I) Saeda Urban, Laila Saeda Urban, Nicole Wright-Meyer, Kenneth Dale Yoder. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit Exhibit 20)(Hernandez, Josue) Modified to correct docket entry link on 12/22/2017 (cthom, ).
December 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 591 ORDER denying Plaintiffs' #590 Motion to Schedule Adversarial Submissions, Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.54(d)(2)(C), and to Address Evident Double Billing and Witnesses Creditability Issues. ORDERED by Judge John L. Kane on 12/20/2017. (cthom, )
December 19, 2017 Filing 590 MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify SCHEDULING ORDER (Doc. 565) by Plaintiffs Louise Creager, Mary Ann Geldreich, Dorothy Wood Hammer, Mary Harrow, Sueham Kay Hoffman, Sueham (I) Kay Hoffman, Janet Koch, Gary Lemert, Martha Lemert, Tommy Meyer, Jeffrey Ray, Jennifer Ray, Ian Siemplenski, Dale Snyder, Marilyn Snyder, Catherine Taylor, Laila (I) Saeda Urban, Laila Saeda Urban, Nicole Wright-Meyer, Kenneth Dale Yoder. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit Exhibit 21)(Hernandez, Josue)
December 14, 2017 Filing 589 NOTICE of Reduction of Fees Requested by Defendants Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company, Allianz of America, Inc., American Automobile Insurance Company, Associated Indemnity Corporation, Fireman's Fund Insurance Company, National Surety Corporation (Mickley, Lisa)
December 14, 2017 Filing 588 NOTICE of Reduction of Fees Requested by Defendant Sentry Insurance, A Mutual Company (Mickley, Lisa)
December 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 587 ORDER granting #585 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Mr. Zupkus of Aupkus & Angell, P.C. is WITHDRAWN as counsel of record for Defendant Farmers Alliance Mutual Insurance Company. ORDERED by Judge John L. Kane on 12/6/2017. (cthom, )
December 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 586 ORDER of USCA as to #514 Notice of Appeal,, filed by Gary Lemert, Ian Siemplenski, Sueham (I) Kay Hoffman, Jennifer Ray, Laila Saeda Urban, Laila (I) Saeda Urban, Catherine Taylor, Kenneth Dale Yoder, Tommy Meyer, Martha Lemert, Nicole Wright-Meyer, Mary Harrow, Sueham Kay Hoffman, Louise Creager, Jeffrey Ray, Mary Ann Geldreich, Janet Koch, Dale Snyder, Dorothy Wood Hammer, Marilyn Snyder. (USCA Case No. 16-1215) (cthom, )
December 5, 2017 Filing 585 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Defendant Farmers Alliance Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Proposed Order)(Khan, Muliha)
October 30, 2017 Filing 584 Letter from U.S. Supreme Court regarding Petition for Writ of Certiorari re #500 Notice of Appeal, #514 Notice of Appeal, ; assigned Supreme Court No. 17-309. The petition for a writ of certiorari is denied. ( Appeal No. 16-111, 16-1215) (athom, )
October 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 583 ORDER granting #582 Plaintiffs' Motion to Extend the Time to Respond to the Moving Defendants' Opening Brief on Attorneys' Fees. ORDERED by Judge John L. Kane on 10/25/2017. (cthom, )
October 24, 2017 Filing 582 MOTION to Continue / PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO EXTEND THE TIME TO RESPOND TO THE MOVING DEFENDANTS' OPENING BRIEF ON ATTORNEYS' FEES by Plaintiffs Louise Creager, Mary Ann Geldreich, Dorothy Wood Hammer, Mary Harrow, Sueham Kay Hoffman, Sueham (I) Kay Hoffman, Janet Koch, Gary Lemert, Martha Lemert, Tommy Meyer, Jeffrey Ray, Jennifer Ray, Ian Siemplenski, Dale Snyder, Marilyn Snyder, Catherine Taylor, Laila (I) Saeda Urban, Laila Saeda Urban, Nicole Wright-Meyer, Kenneth Dale Yoder. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5)(Hernandez, Josue)
October 16, 2017 Filing 581 BRIEF for Determination of Amount of Attorneys' Fees to be Awarded, filed on behalf of the Defendants identified in Exhibit A by Defendants First American Financial Corporation, First American Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - List of Moving Defendants and Fees Sought, #2 Exhibit B, Part 1 - Affidavit of Kevin Shea, #3 Exhibit B, Part 2 - Affidavit of Kevin Shea, #4 Exhibit B, Part 3 - Affidavit of Kevin Shea, #5 Exhibit B, Part 4 - Affidavit of Kevin Shea, #6 Exhibit B, Part 5 - Affidavit of Kevin Shea, #7 Exhibit B, Part 6 - Affidavit of Kevin Shea, #8 Exhibit B, Part 7 - Affidavit of Kevin Shea, #9 Exhibit B, Part 8 - Affidavit of Kevin Shea, #10 Exhibit B, Part 9 - Affidavit of Kevin Shea, #11 Exhibit B, Part 10 - Affidavit of Kevin Shea, #12 Exhibit B, Part 11 - Affidavit of Kevin Shea, #13 Exhibit B, Part 12 - Affidavit of Kevin Shea, #14 Exhibit B, Part 13 - Affidavit of Kevin Shea, #15 Exhibit B, Part 14 - Affidavit of Kevin Shea, #16 Exhibit C - Index to Exhibit B)(Frohardt, Erin)
October 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 580 ORDER granting #579 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; Attorney Ty Cheung Gee and Saskia A. Jordan terminated. ORDERED by Judge John L. Kane on 10/16/2017. (cthom, )
October 13, 2017 Filing 579 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Defendant Zurich Insurance Group Ltd/FI. (Gee, Ty)
October 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 578 ORDER Striking Plaintiffs' Attorney Fee Motions #573 and #574 . Both Plaintiffs' Motions on the award of attorney fees to Moving Defendants are STRICKEN and otherwise DENIED. ORDERED by Judge John L. Kane on 10/11/2017. (cthom, )
October 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 577 ORDER granting #576 Motion for Leave to Make Delayed Production of Invoices. American Family is ORDERED to produce the invoices supporting its fee request to Plaintiffs on or before October 12, 2017. ORDERED by Judge John L. Kane on 10/10/2017 (cthom, )
October 9, 2017 Filing 576 MOTION for Leave to Make Delayed Production of Invoices #565 Scheduling Order by Defendant American Family Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(McCarthy, Michael)
October 5, 2017 Filing 575 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Margaret Young Cass on behalf of American Family Mutual Insurance CompanyAttorney Margaret Young Cass added to party American Family Mutual Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Margaret Young Cass added to party American Family Mutual Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Cass, Margaret)
October 3, 2017 Filing 574 MOTION to Compel (1) Basic Mandatory Discovery; (2) IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR REFERRAL OF THE PARTIES' DISCOVERY DISPUTES TO A MAGISTRATE JUDGE; (3) TO MODIFY THE SCHEDULING ORDER, AND; (4) FOR A HEARING OF CERTAIN FACTUAL ISSUES BY AN ADVISORY JURY IF PLAINTIFFS' FED.R.CIV.P. 12(B)(6) MOTION IS NOT GRANTED by Plaintiffs Louise Creager, Mary Ann Geldreich, Dorothy Wood Hammer, Mary Harrow, Sueham Kay Hoffman, Sueham (I) Kay Hoffman, Janet Koch, Gary Lemert, Martha Lemert, Tommy Meyer, Jeffrey Ray, Jennifer Ray, Ian Siemplenski, Dale Snyder, Marilyn Snyder, Catherine Taylor, Laila (I) Saeda Urban, Laila Saeda Urban, Kenneth Dale Yoder. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Hernandez, Josue)
October 2, 2017 Filing 573 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim The Moving Defendants' Claims for Attorneys' Fees (Doc. 508) by Plaintiffs Louise Creager, Mary Ann Geldreich, Dorothy Wood Hammer, Mary Harrow, Sueham Kay Hoffman, Sueham (I) Kay Hoffman, Janet Koch, Gary Lemert, Martha Lemert, Tommy Meyer, Jeffrey Ray, Jennifer Ray, Ian Siemplenski, Dale Snyder, Marilyn Snyder, Catherine Taylor, Laila (I) Saeda Urban, Laila Saeda Urban, Nicole Wright-Meyer, Kenneth Dale Yoder. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Hernandez, Josue)
September 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 572 ORDER granting #571 Motion to Withdraw as Counsel of Record by Judge John L. Kane on 9/11/17. Attorney Jacqueline K. Matthews terminated. (dkals, )
September 11, 2017 Filing 571 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Defendants LM Insurance Corporation, Liberty Insurance Corporation, Liberty Mutual Insurance, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Safeco Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Matthews, Jacqueline)
August 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 570 ORDER granting #569 Motion to Withdraw as Counsel of Record; attorney R. Livingston Keithley terminated. ORDERED by Judge John L. Kane on 8/31/2017. (cthom, )
August 31, 2017 Filing 569 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney from R. Livingston Keithley by Defendant Country Mutual Insurance Company. (Keithley, R.)
August 30, 2017 Filing 568 Letter from U.S. Supreme Court regarding Petition for Writ of Certiorari re #500 Notice of Appeal, #514 Notice of Appeal; assigned Supreme Court No. 17-309 ( Appeal No. 16-1111) (cthom, )
July 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 567 ORDER denying #566 Unopposed MOTION for Order to Waive Requirement of an Expert for Fee Determination by Judge John L. Kane on 7/28/2017. (cthom, )
July 26, 2017 Filing 566 Unopposed MOTION for Order to Waive Requirement of an Expert for Fee Determination by Defendants Electric Insurance Company, First American Financial Corporation, First American Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (Moseley, Jeremy)
July 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 565 SCHEDULING ORDER for Resolution of Award of Attorney Fees by Judge John L. Kane on 7/25/2017. (cthom, )
July 17, 2017 Filing 564 Joint STATUS REPORT on Attorney Fee Conferral by Defendant Electric Insurance Company. (Moseley, Jeremy)
July 3, 2017 Filing 563 Sanctions ORDER & Admonishment of USCA as to #500 Notice of Appeal,,, filed by Gary Lemert, Ian Siemplenski, Sueham (I) Kay Hoffman, Jennifer Ray, Laila Saeda Urban, Laila (I) Saeda Urban, Catherine Taylor, Kenneth Dale Yoder, Tommy Meyer, Martha Lemert, Nicole Wright-Meyer, Mary Harrow, Sueham Kay Hoffman, Louise Creager, Jeffrey Ray, Mary Ann Geldreich, Janet Koch, Dale Snyder, Dorothy Wood Hammer, Marilyn Snyder, #514 Notice of Appeal,, filed by Gary Lemert, Ian Siemplenski, Sueham (I) Kay Hoffman, Jennifer Ray, Laila Saeda Urban, Laila (I) Saeda Urban, Catherine Taylor, Kenneth Dale Yoder, Tommy Meyer, Martha Lemert, Nicole Wright-Meyer, Mary Harrow, Sueham Kay Hoffman, Louise Creager, Jeffrey Ray, Janet Koch, Mary Ann Geldreich, Dale Snyder, Marilyn Snyder, Dorothy Wood Hammer. (USCA Case No. 16-1111 and 16-1215) (cthom, )
June 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 562 MINUTE ORDER. The parties are directed to file a joint status report on or before July 17, 2017. Ordered by Judge John L. Kane on 6/26/2017. Text Only Entry (jlksec)
June 26, 2017 Filing 561 Joint STATUS REPORT on Attorney Fee Conferral by Defendant Electric Insurance Company. (Moseley, Jeremy)
June 14, 2017 Filing 560 USCA Order as to #500 Notice of Appeal,,, filed by Gary Lemert, Ian Siemplenski, Sueham (I) Kay Hoffman, Jennifer Ray, Laila Saeda Urban, Laila (I) Saeda Urban, Catherine Taylor, Kenneth Dale Yoder, Tommy Meyer, Martha Lemert, Nicole Wright-Meyer, Mary Harrow, Sueham Kay Hoffman, Louise Creager, Jeffrey Ray, Mary Ann Geldreich, Janet Koch, Dale Snyder, Dorothy Wood Hammer, Marilyn Snyder, #514 Notice of Appeal,, filed by Gary Lemert, Ian Siemplenski, Sueham (I) Kay Hoffman, Jennifer Ray, Laila Saeda Urban, Laila (I) Saeda Urban, Catherine Taylor, Kenneth Dale Yoder, Tommy Meyer, Martha Lemert, Nicole Wright-Meyer, Mary Harrow, Sueham Kay Hoffman, Louise Creager, Jeffrey Ray, Janet Koch, Mary Ann Geldreich, Dale Snyder, Marilyn Snyder, Dorothy Wood Hammer : This order supplements the mandate issued May 26, 2017. (USCA Case No. 16-1111 and 16-1215) (jhawk, )
May 26, 2017 Filing 559 MANDATE of USCA as to #500 Notice of Appeal, filed by Gary Lemert, Ian Siemplenski, Sueham (I) Kay Hoffman, Jennifer Ray, Laila Saeda Urban, Laila (I) Saeda Urban, Catherine Taylor, Kenneth Dale Yoder, Tommy Meyer, Martha Lemert, Nicole Wright-Meyer, Mary Harrow, Sueham Kay Hoffman, Louise Creager, Jeffrey Ray, Mary Ann Geldreich, Janet Koch, Dale Snyder, Dorothy Wood Hammer, Marilyn Snyder, #514 Notice of Appeal, filed by Gary Lemert, Ian Siemplenski, Sueham (I) Kay Hoffman, Jennifer Ray, Laila Saeda Urban, Laila (I) Saeda Urban, Catherine Taylor, Kenneth Dale Yoder, Tommy Meyer, Martha Lemert, Nicole Wright-Meyer, Mary Harrow, Sueham Kay Hoffman, Louise Creager, Jeffrey Ray, Mary Ann Geldreich, Janet Koch, Dale Snyder, Dorothy Wood Hammer, Marilyn Snyder : (USCA Case No. 16-1111, 161215) (jhawk, ) Modified on 10/30/2017 to create linkage (athom, ).
May 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 558 USCA Order as to #500 Notice of Appeal,,, filed by Gary Lemert, Ian Siemplenski, Sueham (I) Kay Hoffman, Jennifer Ray, Laila Saeda Urban, Laila (I) Saeda Urban, Catherine Taylor, Kenneth Dale Yoder, Tommy Meyer, Martha Lemert, Nicole Wright-Meyer, Mary Harrow, Sueham Kay Hoffman, Louise Creager, Jeffrey Ray, Mary Ann Geldreich, Janet Koch, Dale Snyder, Dorothy Wood Hammer, Marilyn Snyder, #514 Notice of Appeal,, filed by Gary Lemert, Ian Siemplenski, Sueham (I) Kay Hoffman, Jennifer Ray, Laila Saeda Urban, Laila (I) Saeda Urban, Catherine Taylor, Kenneth Dale Yoder, Tommy Meyer, Martha Lemert, Nicole Wright-Meyer, Mary Harrow, Sueham Kay Hoffman, Louise Creager, Jeffrey Ray, Janet Koch, Mary Ann Geldreich, Dale Snyder, Marilyn Snyder, Dorothy Wood Hammer : Order filed by Judges Kelly, Baldock and Hartz (CW) As an initial matter, we sua sponte STRIKE the Errata which shall be removed from the docket by the Clerk's Office. Further we note that Appellants' Petition includes nearly 400 pages of attachments that were not part of the district court record. Accordingly, with the exception of our 4/6/17 order and judgment, and our orders of 4/24/17 and 5/4/17, we sua sponte STRIKE the attachments to the petition which shall be removed from the docket by the Clerk's Office. Order denying Appellants' petition for rehearing and rehearing en banc. The mandate shall issue forthwith. (USCA Case No. Order) (This document is not the Mandate) (jhawk, )
May 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 557 USCA Order as to #500 Notice of Appeal, filed by Gary Lemert, Ian Siemplenski, Sueham (I) Kay Hoffman, Jennifer Ray, Laila Saeda Urban, Laila (I) Saeda Urban, Catherine Taylor, Kenneth Dale Yoder, Tommy Meyer, Martha Lemert, Nicole Wright-Meyer, Mary Harrow, Sueham Kay Hoffman, Louise Creager, Jeffrey Ray, Mary Ann Geldreich, Janet Koch, Dale Snyder, Dorothy Wood Hammer, Marilyn Snyder, #514 Notice of Appeal, filed by Gary Lemert, Ian Siemplenski, Sueham (I) Kay Hoffman, Jennifer Ray, Laila Saeda Urban, Laila (I) Saeda Urban, Catherine Taylor, Kenneth Dale Yoder, Tommy Meyer, Martha Lemert, Nicole Wright-Meyer, Mary Harrow, Sueham Kay Hoffman, Louise Creager, Jeffrey Ray, Mary Ann Geldreich, Janet Koch, Dale Snyder, Dorothy Wood Hammer, Marilyn Snyder : Order filed by Judges Tymkovich, Kelly, Hartz and Phillips (CW) granting Appellees' Motion for Award of Appellate Attorney Fees. This matter is remanded to the United States District Court for the District of Colorado for a determination of the amount of appellate attorneys' fees. (USCA Case No. 16-1111, 16-1215) (This document is not the Mandate) (jhawk, ) Modified on 10/30/2017 to create linkage (athom, ).
April 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 556 ORDER granting Motions to Withdraw as Attorney #554 and #555 . Attorney Gary Lyn Fleming terminated. Defendants American Strategic Insurance Corp. and Acuity, A Mutual Insurance Company will continue to be represented by Jamey W. Jamison and Thomas H. Falivene of the law firm of Harris Karstaedt Jamison & Powers, PC. Signed by Judge John L. Kane on 04/13/17. (jhawk, )
April 13, 2017 Filing 555 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Defendant Acuity, A Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Counsel)(Fleming, Gary)
April 13, 2017 Filing 554 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Defendant American Strategic Insurance Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Counsel)(Fleming, Gary)
April 6, 2017 Filing 553 USCA Order and Judgment as to #500 Notice of Appeal, filed by Gary Lemert, Ian Siemplenski, Sueham (I) Kay Hoffman, Jennifer Ray, Laila Saeda Urban, Laila (I) Saeda Urban, Catherine Taylor, Kenneth Dale Yoder, Tommy Meyer, Martha Lemert, Nicole Wright-Meyer, Mary Harrow, Sueham Kay Hoffman, Louise Creager, Jeffrey Ray, Mary Ann Geldreich, Janet Koch, Dale Snyder, Dorothy Wood Hammer, Marilyn Snyder, #514 Notice of Appeal, filed by Gary Lemert, Ian Siemplenski, Sueham (I) Kay Hoffman, Jennifer Ray, Laila Saeda Urban, Laila (I) Saeda Urban, Catherine Taylor, Kenneth Dale Yoder, Tommy Meyer, Martha Lemert, Nicole Wright-Meyer, Mary Harrow, Sueham Kay Hoffman, Louise Creager, Jeffrey Ray, Mary Ann Geldreich, Janet Koch, Dale Snyder, Dorothy Wood Hammer, Marilyn Snyder : AFFIRMED (USCA Case No. 16-1111, 16-1215) (This document is not the Mandate) (jhawk, ) Modified on 10/30/2017 to create linkage (athom, ).
March 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 552 ORDER granting #551 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Robert D. Helfand is hereby withdrawn as counsel of record for American Reliable Insurance Company. Signed by Judge John L. Kane on 03/30/17. (jhawk, )
March 30, 2017 Filing 551 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Robert D. Helfand by Defendant American Reliable Insurance Company. (Helfand, Robert)
March 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 550 ORDER granting #549 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Robert D. Helfand is hereby withdrawn as counsel of record for American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida. Defendant American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida will continue to be represented by Terence Ridley, Evan Stephenson and Erin Frohardt of Wheeler Trigg O'Donnell LLP, and John Pitblado of Carlton Fields Jorden Burt P.A.. Signed by Judge John L. Kane on 03/30/17. (jhawk, )
March 30, 2017 Filing 549 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Robert D. Helfand by Defendant American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida. (Helfand, Robert)
March 29, 2017 Filing 548 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES:re: #547 Notice of Entry of Appearance,, filed by attorneyThomas H. Falivene.Attorney or pro se has used an incorrect signature format in violation of D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 4.3(a) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases). DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. In the future, the filer must affix an electronic s/signature and s/followed by a typed, not an inked, signature to all future documents.(Text Only Entry) (jhawk, )
March 29, 2017 Filing 547 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Thomas Howard Falivene on behalf of Acuity, A Mutual Insurance Company, American Strategic Insurance Corp.Attorney Thomas Howard Falivene added to party Acuity, A Mutual Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Thomas Howard Falivene added to party Acuity, A Mutual Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Thomas Howard Falivene added to party American Strategic Insurance Corp.(pty:dft), Attorney Thomas Howard Falivene added to party American Strategic Insurance Corp.(pty:dft) (Falivene, Thomas)
March 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 546 ORDER granting #545 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Mark A. Sares is hereby withdrawn as counsel of record for American Strategic Insurance Corp. and Acuity. Defendants American Strategic Insurance Corp. and Acuity, a Mutual Insurance Company will continue to be represented by Gary Lyn Fleming and Jamey William Jamison of the firm Harris, Karstaedt, Jamison & Powers, PC. Signed by Judge John L. Kane on 03/28/17. (jhawk, )
March 28, 2017 Filing 545 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Defendants Acuity, A Mutual Insurance Company, American Strategic Insurance Corp.. (Sares, Mark)
March 24, 2017 Filing 544 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Attorney by Defendants Acuity, A Mutual Insurance Company, American Strategic Insurance Corp. (Sares, Mark) Modified on 3/24/2017 attorney notified to refile as a motion to withdraw (jhawk, ).
February 14, 2017 Filing 543 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Mark Andrew Sares on behalf of American Strategic Insurance Corp.Attorney Mark Andrew Sares added to party American Strategic Insurance Corp.(pty:dft), Attorney Mark Andrew Sares added to party American Strategic Insurance Corp.(pty:dft) (Sares, Mark)
February 14, 2017 Filing 542 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Mark Andrew Sares on behalf of Acuity, A Mutual Insurance CompanyAttorney Mark Andrew Sares added to party Acuity, A Mutual Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Mark Andrew Sares added to party Acuity, A Mutual Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Sares, Mark)
February 13, 2017 Filing 541 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES: re: #539 Notice of Entry of Appearance, #540 Notice of Entry of Appearance, filed by attorney Jamey Jamison. The document was scanned and not converted directly to portable document format (PDF). DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - future documents must be filed pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 1.3(f) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil Cases). (Text Only Entry) (cthom, )
February 13, 2017 Filing 540 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jamey William Jamison on behalf of Acuity, A Mutual Insurance CompanyAttorney Jamey William Jamison added to party Acuity, A Mutual Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Jamey William Jamison added to party Acuity, A Mutual Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Jamison, Jamey)
February 13, 2017 Filing 539 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jamey William Jamison on behalf of American Strategic Insurance Corp.Attorney Jamey William Jamison added to party American Strategic Insurance Corp.(pty:dft), Attorney Jamey William Jamison added to party American Strategic Insurance Corp.(pty:dft) (Jamison, Jamey)
February 10, 2017 Filing 538 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES: re: #536 and #537 Notice (Other) filed by attorney Gary Fleming. The document was scanned and not converted directly to portable document format (PDF) and the format for the attorneys signature block is not correct and file as motions to withdraw as attorney. REFILE THE DOCUMENT AS A MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS ATTORNEY. Action to take - future documents must be filed pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 1.3(f) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 4.3(d) (Civil Cases). (Text Only Entry) (jhawk, )
February 10, 2017 Filing 537 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Attorney by Defendant Acuity, A Mutual Insurance Company (Fleming, Gary)
February 10, 2017 Filing 536 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Attorney by Defendant American Strategic Insurance Corp. (Fleming, Gary)
January 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 535 ORDER granting #534 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Rachel Ollar Entrican terminated. Defendant Pharmacists Mutual Insurance Company will continue to be represented by Larry S. McClung of the firm Wells, Anderson & Race, LLC. Signed by Judge John L. Kane on 01/26/17. (jhawk, )
January 26, 2017 Filing 534 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Defendant Pharmacists Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Entrican, Rachel)
August 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 533 ORDER granting #532 Motion for Withdrawal of Counsel by Judge John L. Kane on 8/12/16. Attorney Laurie Jo Wiedenhoff terminated.(dkals, )
August 12, 2016 Filing 532 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Laurie J. Wiedenhoff by Defendant Guideone Mutual Insurance Company. (Wiedenhoff, Laurie)
July 12, 2016 Filing 531 MANDATE of USCA as to #527 Notice of Appeal,, filed by Gary Lemert, Ian Siemplenski, Sueham (I) Kay Hoffman, Jennifer Ray, Laila Saeda Urban, Laila (I) Saeda Urban, Catherine Taylor, Kenneth Dale Yoder, Tommy Meyer, Martha Lemert, Nicole Wright-Meyer, Mary Harrow, Sueham Kay Hoffman, Louise Creager, Jeffrey Ray, Mary Ann Geldreich, Janet Koch, Dale Snyder, Dorothy Wood Hammer, Marilyn Snyder : Dismissed (USCA Case No. 16-1277) (jhawk, )
July 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 530 ORDER of USCA as to #527 Notice of Appeal,, filed by Gary Lemert, Ian Siemplenski, Sueham (I) Kay Hoffman, Jennifer Ray, Laila Saeda Urban, Laila (I) Saeda Urban, Catherine Taylor, Kenneth Dale Yoder, Tommy Meyer, Martha Lemert, Nicole Wright-Meyer, Mary Harrow, Sueham Kay Hoffman, Louise Creager, Jeffrey Ray, Mary Ann Geldreich, Janet Koch, Dale Snyder, Dorothy Wood Hammer, Marilyn Snyder. This matter is before the court on Plaintiffs-Appellants Unopposed Motion to Dismiss Appeal Number 16-1277 for Lack of Appellate Jurisdiction, which is construed as a motion to voluntarily dismiss this appeal pursuant to Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 42(b).Upon consideration and so construed, the motion is granted. 10th Cir. R. 27.4(A)(9). (USCA Case No. 16-1277) (jhawk, )
July 7, 2016 Filing 529 USCA Case Number 16-1277 for #527 Notice of Appeal,, filed by Gary Lemert, Ian Siemplenski, Sueham (I) Kay Hoffman, Jennifer Ray, Laila Saeda Urban, Laila (I) Saeda Urban, Catherine Taylor, Kenneth Dale Yoder, Tommy Meyer, Martha Lemert, Nicole Wright-Meyer, Mary Harrow, Sueham Kay Hoffman, Louise Creager, Jeffrey Ray, Mary Ann Geldreich, Janet Koch, Dale Snyder, Dorothy Wood Hammer, Marilyn Snyder. (jhawk, )
July 7, 2016 Filing 528 LETTER Transmitting Notice of Appeal to all counsel advising of the transmittal of the #527 Notice of Appeal,, filed by Gary Lemert, Ian Siemplenski, Sueham (I) Kay Hoffman, Jennifer Ray, Laila Saeda Urban, Laila (I) Saeda Urban, Catherine Taylor, Kenneth Dale Yoder, Tommy Meyer, Martha Lemert, Nicole Wright-Meyer, Mary Harrow, Sueham Kay Hoffman, Louise Creager, Jeffrey Ray, Mary Ann Geldreich, Janet Koch, Dale Snyder, Dorothy Wood Hammer, Marilyn Snyder to the U.S. Court of Appeals. ( Retained Counsel, Fee paid,) (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet, #2 Preliminary Record)(jhawk, )
July 7, 2016 Filing 527 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #526 Order on Motion for Attorney Fees,, Order on Motion for Hearing/Conference, by Plaintiffs Louise Creager, Mary Ann Geldreich, Dorothy Wood Hammer, Mary Harrow, Sueham Kay Hoffman, Sueham (I) Kay Hoffman, Janet Koch, Gary Lemert, Martha Lemert, Tommy Meyer, Jeffrey Ray, Jennifer Ray, Ian Siemplenski, Dale Snyder, Marilyn Snyder, Catherine Taylor, Laila (I) Saeda Urban, Laila Saeda Urban, Nicole Wright-Meyer, Kenneth Dale Yoder (Filing fee $ 505, Receipt Number 1082-5054598) (Hernandez, Josue)
July 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 526 Order on Motion for Attorney Fees. Defendants' Motion for Fees #508 is GRANTED and Plaintiffs Motion for a Hearing #525 is DENIED. The parties are ORDERED to meet and confer regarding the amount of fees to be awarded pursuant to my Civil Pretrial and Trial Procedures (see p. 4), and to submit a joint status report regarding their discussions within 30 days of the issuance of the mandate in Plaintiffs' pending appeal. Signed by Judge John L. Kane on 07/06/16.(jhawk, )
June 23, 2016 Filing 525 MOTION for Hearing/Conference , or in the alternative, for Sur-Reply by Plaintiffs Louise Creager, Mary Ann Geldreich, Dorothy Wood Hammer, Mary Harrow, Sueham Kay Hoffman, Sueham (I) Kay Hoffman, Janet Koch, Gary Lemert, Martha Lemert, Tommy Meyer, Jeffrey Ray, Jennifer Ray, Ian Siemplenski, Dale Snyder, Marilyn Snyder, Catherine Taylor, Laila (I) Saeda Urban, Laila Saeda Urban, Nicole Wright-Meyer, Kenneth Dale Yoder. (Hernandez, Josue)
June 21, 2016 Filing 524 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance and Certificate of Interested Parties by Ellis Jay Mayer on behalf of Colorado Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Co. (Mayer, Ellis)
June 17, 2016 Filing 523 REPLY to Response to #508 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Defendants Addison Insurance Company, All American Insurance Company, Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company, Allianz Life Insurance Co. of North America, Allianz of America, Inc., American Association of Insurance Services, Inc., American Automobile Insurance Company, American Family Mutual Insurance Company, American Indemnity Financial Corporation, American International Group, Inc., Associated Indemnity Corporation, Auto-Owners Insurance Company, Casualty Actuarial Society, Central Mutual Insurance Company, Chubb Corporation, The, Chubb National Insurance Company, Chubb Services Corporation, Cincinnati Insurance Company, Colorado Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Co., Country Mutual Insurance Company, Electric Insurance Company, Employers Mutual Casualty Company, Encompass Indemnity Company, Encompass Insurance Company of America, Federal Insurance Company, Fireman's Fund Insurance Company, First American Financial Corporation, First American Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Grange Insurance Association, Great Northern Insurance Company, Guideone Mutual Insurance Company, Insurance Services Office, Inc., Kemper Corporate Services, Inc., Kemper Corporation, LM Insurance Corporation, Lafayette Insurance Company, Liberty Insurance Corporation, Liberty Mutual Insurance, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, McKinsey & Company, Inc., McKinsey & Company, Inc., MetLife Auto & Home Insurance Agency, Inc., Metropolitan Direct Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Metropolitan Property and Casualty Insurance Company, National Casualty Company, National Surety Corporation, Nationwide Affinity Insurance Company of America, Nationwide Insurance Company of America, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Owners Insurance Company, Pacific Indemnity Company, Safeco Insurance Company of America, Secura Insurance Holdings, Inc., Sentry Insurance, A Mutual Company, Shelter Mutual Insurance Company, Texas General Indemnity Company, USAACasualty Insurance Company, United Fire Group, Inc., United Fire Insurance Company, United Fire Lloyds, United Life Insurance Company, United Services Automobile Association, Unitrin Auto and Home Insurance Company, Unitrin Direct Property & Casualty Company, Verisk Analytics Inc, Vigilant Insurance Company, Consol Defendant United Fire & Indemnity Company. (Ridley, Terence)
June 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 522 ORDER granting #521 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. The clerk is directed to remove Ann Tuxbury Lebeck from CM/ECF filing notification system in connection with this action. Defendant Farmers Insurance Company will continue to be represented by Thomas P. Johnson of Davis Graham & Stubbs LLP. Signed by Judge John L. Kane on 06/15/2016. (athom, )
June 15, 2016 Filing 521 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Ann Tuxberry Lebeck by Defendant Farmers Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Johnson, Thomas)
June 10, 2016 Filing 520 LETTER TO USCA and all counsel certifying the record is complete as to #514 Notice of Appeal,, filed by Gary Lemert, Ian Siemplenski, Sueham (I) Kay Hoffman, Jennifer Ray, Laila Saeda Urban, Laila (I) Saeda Urban, Catherine Taylor, Kenneth Dale Yoder, Tommy Meyer, Martha Lemert, Nicole Wright-Meyer, Mary Harrow, Sueham Kay Hoffman, Louise Creager, Jeffrey Ray, Mary Ann Geldreich, Janet Koch, Dale Snyder, Dorothy Wood Hammer, Marilyn Snyder. A transcript order form was filed stating that the necessary transcript is already on file. ( Appeal No. 16-1215) Text Only Entry (jhawk, )
June 9, 2016 Filing 519 TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM re #514 Notice of Appeal,, by Plaintiffs Louise Creager, Mary Ann Geldreich, Dorothy Wood Hammer, Mary Harrow, Sueham Kay Hoffman, Sueham (I) Kay Hoffman, Janet Koch, Gary Lemert, Martha Lemert, Tommy Meyer, Jeffrey Ray, Jennifer Ray, Ian Siemplenski, Dale Snyder, Marilyn Snyder, Catherine Taylor, Laila (I) Saeda Urban, Laila Saeda Urban, Nicole Wright-Meyer, Kenneth Dale Yoder (Hernandez, Josue)
June 3, 2016 Filing 518 RESPONSE to #508 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Plaintiffs Louise Creager, Mary Ann Geldreich, Dorothy Wood Hammer, Mary Harrow, Sueham Kay Hoffman, Sueham (I) Kay Hoffman, Janet Koch, Gary Lemert, Martha Lemert, Tommy Meyer, Jeffrey Ray, Jennifer Ray, Ian Siemplenski, Dale Snyder, Marilyn Snyder, Catherine Taylor, Laila (I) Saeda Urban, Laila Saeda Urban, Nicole Wright-Meyer, Kenneth Dale Yoder. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3)(Hernandez, Josue)
June 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 517 MINUTE ORDER. Despite Plaintiffs' filing of Notices of Appeal, this Court retains jurisdiction over Defendants' Motion for Attorney Fees #508 . See Hutchinson v. Beckworth, 474 F. App'x 736, 739 (10th Cir. 2012). Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 7.1(d), Plaintiffs' response to Defendants' Motion for Attorney Fees was due on or before Monday, May 30, 2016. Plaintiffs are ORDERED to file their response on or before Friday, June 3, 2016 or the motion may be granted without further notice. Entered by Judge John L. Kane on 06/01/16. Text Only Entry (jhawk, )
May 26, 2016 Filing 516 USCA Case Number 16-1215 for #514 Notice of Appeal,, filed by Gary Lemert, Ian Siemplenski, Sueham (I) Kay Hoffman, Jennifer Ray, Laila Saeda Urban, Laila (I) Saeda Urban, Catherine Taylor, Kenneth Dale Yoder, Tommy Meyer, Martha Lemert, Nicole Wright-Meyer, Mary Harrow, Sueham Kay Hoffman, Louise Creager, Jeffrey Ray, Mary Ann Geldreich, Janet Koch, Dale Snyder, Dorothy Wood Hammer, Marilyn Snyder. (jhawk, )
May 26, 2016 Filing 515 LETTER Transmitting Notice of Appeal to all counsel advising of the transmittal of the #514 Notice of Appeal,, filed by Gary Lemert, Ian Siemplenski, Sueham (I) Kay Hoffman, Jennifer Ray, Laila Saeda Urban, Laila (I) Saeda Urban, Catherine Taylor, Kenneth Dale Yoder, Tommy Meyer, Martha Lemert, Nicole Wright-Meyer, Mary Harrow, Sueham Kay Hoffman, Louise Creager, Jeffrey Ray, Mary Ann Geldreich, Janet Koch, Dale Snyder, Dorothy Wood Hammer, Marilyn Snyder to the U.S. Court of Appeals. ( Retained Counsel, Fee paid,) (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet, #2 Preliminary Record)(jhawk, )
May 25, 2016 Filing 514 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #507 Order on Motion to Alter Judgment, Order on Motion to Amend/Correct/Modify by Plaintiffs Louise Creager, Mary Ann Geldreich, Dorothy Wood Hammer, Mary Harrow, Sueham Kay Hoffman, Sueham (I) Kay Hoffman, Janet Koch, Gary Lemert, Martha Lemert, Tommy Meyer, Jeffrey Ray, Jennifer Ray, Ian Siemplenski, Dale Snyder, Marilyn Snyder, Catherine Taylor, Laila (I) Saeda Urban, Laila Saeda Urban, Nicole Wright-Meyer, Kenneth Dale Yoder (Filing fee $ 505, Receipt Number 1082-4992991) (Hernandez, Josue)
May 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 513 ORDER granting #512 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. The clerk is directed to remove Daniel D. Williams from the CM/ECF filing notification system in connection with this action. The Defendant American Family Mutual Insurance Company will continue to be represented by Michael S. McCarthy of Faegre Baker Daniels LLP. Signed by Judge John L. Kane on 05/24/2016. (athom, )
May 24, 2016 Filing 512 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Defendant American Family Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Unopposed Motion to Withdraw as Counsel for Defendant American Family Mutual Insurance Company)(Williams, Daniel)
May 23, 2016 Filing 511 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Douglas Dunham on behalf of State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance CompanyAttorney Douglas Dunham added to party State Farm Fire and Casualty Company(pty:dft), Attorney Douglas Dunham added to party State Farm Fire and Casualty Company(pty:dft), Attorney Douglas Dunham added to party State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Douglas Dunham added to party State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Dunham, Douglas)
May 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 510 ORDER granting #509 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. The clerk is directed to remove Janette L. Ferguson from the CM/ECF filing notification system in connection with this action. The Defendant Farmers Insurance Company will continue to be represented by Thomas P. Johnson of Davis Graham & Stubbs LLP. Signed by Judge John L. Kane on 05/19/16.(jhawk, )
May 19, 2016 Filing 509 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Defendant Farmers Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Ferguson, Janette)
May 9, 2016 Filing 508 MOTION for Attorney Fees by Defendants Addison Insurance Company, All American Insurance Company, Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company, Allianz Life Insurance Co. of North America, Allianz of America, Inc., American Association of Insurance Services, Inc., American Automobile Insurance Company, American Family Mutual Insurance Company, American Indemnity Financial Corporation, American International Group, Inc., Associated Indemnity Corporation, Auto-Owners Insurance Company, Casualty Actuarial Society, Central Mutual Insurance Company, Chubb Corporation, The, Chubb National Insurance Company, Chubb Services Corporation, Cincinnati Insurance Company, Colorado Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Co., Country Mutual Insurance Company, Electric Insurance Company, Employers Mutual Casualty Company, Encompass Indemnity Company, Encompass Insurance Company of America, Federal Insurance Company, Fireman's Fund Insurance Company, First American Financial Corporation, First American Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Grange Insurance Association, Great Northern Insurance Company, Guideone Mutual Insurance Company, Insurance Services Office, Inc., Kemper Corporate Services, Inc., Kemper Corporation, LM Insurance Corporation, Lafayette Insurance Company, Liberty Insurance Corporation, Liberty Mutual Insurance, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, McKinsey & Company, Inc., McKinsey & Company, Inc., MetLife Auto & Home Insurance Agency, Inc., Metropolitan Direct Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Metropolitan Property and Casualty Insurance Company, National Casualty Company, National Surety Corporation, Nationwide Affinity Insurance Company of America, Nationwide Insurance Company of America, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Owners Insurance Company, Pacific Indemnity Company, Safeco Insurance Company of America, Secura Insurance Holdings, Inc., Sentry Insurance, A Mutual Company, Shelter Mutual Insurance Company, Texas General Indemnity Company, USAACasualty Insurance Company, United Fire Group, Inc., United Fire Insurance Company, United Fire Lloyds, United Fire and Indemnity Company, United Life Insurance Company, United Services Automobile Association, Unitrin Auto and Home Insurance Company, Unitrin Direct Property & Casualty Company, Verisk Analytics Inc, Vigilant Insurance Company, Consol Defendant United Fire & Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - List of Moving Defendants, #2 Exhibit B - 02/02/16 email from Hack to Holloway and Dougherty, #3 Exhibit C - 02/02/16 email from Ridley to Holloway, #4 Exhibit D - 02/10/16 email from Hack to Holloway and Dougherty, #5 Exhibit E - Response to Appellees' Motion to Strike)(Ridley, Terence)
April 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 507 ORDER. Plaintiffs' Motion for Relief from Final Judgment #497 is DENIED. Signed by Judge John L. Kane on 04/25/16.(jhawk, )
April 18, 2016 Filing 506 LETTER TO USCA and all counsel certifying the record is complete as to #500 Notice of Appeal, filed by Gary Lemert, Ian Siemplenski, Sueham (I) Kay Hoffman, Jennifer Ray, Laila Saeda Urban, Laila (I) Saeda Urban, Catherine Taylor, Kenneth Dale Yoder, Tommy Meyer, Martha Lemert, Nicole Wright-Meyer, Mary Harrow, Sueham Kay Hoffman, Louise Creager, Jeffrey Ray, Mary Ann Geldreich, Janet Koch, Dale Snyder, Dorothy Wood Hammer, Marilyn Snyder. A transcript order form was filed stating that the necessary transcript is already on file. ( Appeal No. 16-1111) Text Only Entry (jhawk, )
April 15, 2016 Filing 505 TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM re #500 Notice of Appeal,,, by Plaintiffs Louise Creager, Mary Ann Geldreich, Dorothy Wood Hammer, Mary Harrow, Sueham Kay Hoffman, Sueham (I) Kay Hoffman, Janet Koch, Gary Lemert, Martha Lemert, Tommy Meyer, Jeffrey Ray, Jennifer Ray, Ian Siemplenski, Dale Snyder, Marilyn Snyder, Catherine Taylor, Laila (I) Saeda Urban, Laila Saeda Urban, Nicole Wright-Meyer, Kenneth Dale Yoder (Hernandez, Josue)
April 14, 2016 Filing 504 REPLY to Response to #497 Amended MOTION to Alter Judgment and Opinion, Docs. 478 and 479Amended MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify Memoranum Opinion, Doc.478, filed by Plaintiffs Louise Creager, Mary Ann Geldreich, Dorothy Wood Hammer, Mary Harrow, Sueham Kay Hoffman, Sueham (I) Kay Hoffman, Janet Koch, Gary Lemert, Martha Lemert, Tommy Meyer, Jeffrey Ray, Jennifer Ray, Ian Siemplenski, Dale Snyder, Marilyn Snyder, Catherine Taylor, Laila (I) Saeda Urban, Laila Saeda Urban, Nicole Wright-Meyer, Kenneth Dale Yoder. (Hernandez, Josue)
April 5, 2016 Filing 503 USCA Case Number 16-1111 for #500 Notice of Appeal,,, filed by Gary Lemert, Ian Siemplenski, Sueham (I) Kay Hoffman, Jennifer Ray, Laila Saeda Urban, Laila (I) Saeda Urban, Catherine Taylor, Kenneth Dale Yoder, Tommy Meyer, Martha Lemert, Nicole Wright-Meyer, Mary Harrow, Sueham Kay Hoffman, Louise Creager, Jeffrey Ray, Mary Ann Geldreich, Janet Koch, Dale Snyder, Dorothy Wood Hammer, Marilyn Snyder. (jhawk, )
April 4, 2016 Filing 502 BRIEF in Opposition to #497 Amended MOTION to Alter Judgment and Opinion, Docs. 478 and 479Amended MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify Memoranum Opinion, Doc.478, Defendants' Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Relief from Final Judgment (DOCS. 478 & 479), Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 60(b)(2), 60(b)(3) and 60(b)(1), and to Alter or Amend Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 59(e) filed by Defendants Acord Corporation, Acuity, A Mutual Insurance Company, Addison Insurance Company, All American Insurance Company, Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company, Allianz Life Insurance Co. of North America, Allianz of America, Inc., Allstate Insurance Company, American Association of Insurance Services, Inc., American Automobile Insurance Company, American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida, American Family Home Insurance Company, American Family Mutual Insurance Company, American Indemnity Financial Corporation, American International Group, Inc., American Modern Home Insurance Company, American Modern Insurance Group, Inc., American Modern Select Insurance Company, American Reliable Insurance Company, American Strategic Insurance Corp., Associated Indemnity Corporation, Auto-Owners Insurance Company, Automobile Insurance Company of Hartford Connecticut, Buckeye State Mutual Insurance Company, The, California Casualty Indemnity Exchange, The, Casualty Actuarial Society, Central Mutual Insurance Company, Chubb Corporation, The, Chubb National Insurance Company, Chubb Services Corporation, Cincinnati Insurance Company, Colorado Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Co., Country Mutual Insurance Company, Electric Insurance Company, Employers Mutual Casualty Company, Encompass Indemnity Company, Encompass Insurance Company of America, Farmers Alliance Mutual Insurance Company, Farmers Insurance Company, Federal Insurance Company, Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland, Fireman's Fund Insurance Company, First American Financial Corporation, First American Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Grange Insurance Association, Great Northern Insurance Company, Guideone Mutual Insurance Company, Hartford Accident and Indemnity Company, Hartford Financial Services Group, The, Hartford Fire Insurance Company, Insurance Services Office, Inc., Internation Insurance Society, Inc., Kemper Corporate Services, Inc., Kemper Corporation, LM Insurance Corporation, Lafayette Insurance Company, Liberty Insurance Corporation, Liberty Mutual Insurance, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Markel American Insurance Company, Markel Insurance Company, McKinsey & Company, Inc., McKinsey & Company, Inc., MetLife Auto & Home Insurance Agency, Inc., Metropolitan Direct Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Metropolitan Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Milbank Insurance Company, Munich-American Holding Corporation, National Casualty Company, National Farmers Union Property and Casualty Company, National Surety Corporation, Nationwide Affinity Insurance Company of America, Nationwide Insurance Company of America, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Owners Insurance Company, Pacific Indemnity Company, Pharmacists Mutual Insurance Company, Praetorian Insurance Company, Property Casualty Insurers Association of America, QBE Holdings, Inc., QBE Insurance Company, QBE Insurance Group, Limited, Safeco Insurance Company of America, Secura Insurance Holdings, Inc., Sentry Insurance, A Mutual Company, Shelter Mutual Insurance Company, Standard Fire Insurance Company, State Automobile Insurance Company, State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, Stillwater Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Texas General Indemnity Company, Travelers Commercial Insurance Company, Travelers Companies Inc., The, Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, Travelers Indemnity Company of America, Travelers Insurance Company, The, Travelers Insurance Group Holdings, Inc., USAACasualty Insurance Company, United Fire & Casualty Company, United Fire Group, Inc., United Fire Insurance Company, United Fire Lloyds, United Fire and Indemnity Company, United Life Insurance Company, United Services Automobile Association, Unitrin Auto and Home Insurance Company, Unitrin Direct Property & Casualty Company, Verisk Analytics Inc, Vigilant Insurance Company, Zurich American Insurance Company, Zurich Insurance Group Ltd/FI. (Sands, Jon)
April 4, 2016 Filing 501 LETTER Transmitting Notice of Appeal to all counsel advising of the transmittal of the #500 Notice of Appeal, filed by Gary Lemert, Ian Siemplenski, Sueham (I) Kay Hoffman, Jennifer Ray, Laila Saeda Urban, Laila (I) Saeda Urban, Catherine Taylor, Kenneth Dale Yoder, Tommy Meyer, Martha Lemert, Nicole Wright-Meyer, Mary Harrow, Sueham Kay Hoffman, Louise Creager, Jeffrey Ray, Mary Ann Geldreich, Janet Koch, Dale Snyder, Dorothy Wood Hammer, Marilyn Snyder to the U.S. Court of Appeals. ( Retained Counsel, Fee paid,) (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet, #2 Preliminary Record)(jhawk, )
April 1, 2016 Filing 500 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #494 Order on Motion to Alter Judgment,, Order on Motion to Amend/Correct/Modify,, Order on Motion to Vacate,, Order on Motion to Strike,, Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File, #478 Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction,,,,,,,, Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, Order on Motion for Joinder,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #479 Judgment,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, Teminated Case,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, by Plaintiffs Louise Creager, Mary Ann Geldreich, Dorothy Wood Hammer, Mary Harrow, Sueham Kay Hoffman, Sueham (I) Kay Hoffman, Janet Koch, Gary Lemert, Martha Lemert, Tommy Meyer, Jeffrey Ray, Jennifer Ray, Ian Siemplenski, Dale Snyder, Marilyn Snyder, Catherine Taylor, Laila (I) Saeda Urban, Laila Saeda Urban, Nicole Wright-Meyer, Kenneth Dale Yoder (Filing fee $ 505, Receipt Number 1082-4909313) (Attachments: #1 Appendix Appendix 1)(Hernandez, Josue)
March 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 499 ORDER granting #498 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. The Clerk is directed to remove Alan Peter Gregory from the CM/ECF filing notification system in connection with this action. Signed by Judge John L. Kane on 03/17/16.(jhawk, )
March 17, 2016 Filing 498 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Defendants Acuity, A Mutual Insurance Company, American Strategic Insurance Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Gregory, Alan)
March 11, 2016 Filing 497 Amended MOTION to Alter Judgment and Opinion, Docs. #478 and 479, Amended MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify Memoranum Opinion, Doc. #478 , by Plaintiffs Louise Creager, Mary Ann Geldreich, Dorothy Wood Hammer, Mary Harrow, Sueham Kay Hoffman, Sueham (I) Kay Hoffman, Janet Koch, Gary Lemert, Martha Lemert, Tommy Meyer, Jeffrey Ray, Jennifer Ray, Ian Siemplenski, Dale Snyder, Marilyn Snyder, Catherine Taylor, Laila (I) Saeda Urban, Laila Saeda Urban, Nicole Wright-Meyer, Kenneth Dale Yoder. (Hernandez, Josue) Modified on 3/14/2016 to add linkage (jhawk, ).
March 3, 2016 Filing 496 NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES: re: #495 Notice of Change of Address/Contact Information :James P. Gaugham has failed to comply with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(c) and 3.5 of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil Cases), which requires an attorney to notify the court of a change in contact information within five days of the change. Counsel must file a notice of change of contact information in all active cases and submit a change of contact information form through the Attorney Services Portal Account. Failure in the future to follow these procedures may lead to mandatory CM/ECF training, or action by the court. (Text Only Entry) (jhawk, )
March 3, 2016 Filing 495 NOTICE of Change of Address/Contact Information by James Patrick Gaughan (Gaughan, James)
March 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 494 ORDER ON MOTION TO STRIKE. Defendant's #491 Motion to Strike is GRANTED; Defendant's #492 Motion for Extension of Time is DENIED AS MOOT. Plaintiff's Motion to Strike and its accompanying documents (Docs. #481 , 485-488) are STRICKEN, by Judge John L. Kane on 3/2/2016.(agarc, )
March 2, 2016 Filing 493 RESPONSE to #491 MOTION to Strike #478 Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction,,,,,,,, Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, Order on Motion for Joinder,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #479 Judgment,,,,,,,,,,,, filed by Plaintiffs Louise Creager, Mary Ann Geldreich, Dorothy Wood Hammer, Mary Harrow, Sueham Kay Hoffman, Sueham (I) Kay Hoffman, Janet Koch, Gary Lemert, Martha Lemert, Tommy Meyer, Jeffrey Ray, Jennifer Ray, Ian Siemplenski, Dale Snyder, Marilyn Snyder, Catherine Taylor, Laila (I) Saeda Urban, Laila Saeda Urban, Nicole Wright-Meyer, Kenneth Dale Yoder. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1-1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1-2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2)(Hernandez, Josue)
March 1, 2016 Filing 492 MOTION for Extension of Time to (Alternative Motion) Respond to Motion for Relief from Final Judgment, or in the Alternative, to Alter Said Judgment which is filed on behalf of all Defendants with the exception of one by Defendant Farmers Insurance Company. (Johnson, Thomas)
March 1, 2016 Filing 491 MOTION to Strike #478 Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction,,,,,,,, Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, Order on Motion for Joinder,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #479 Judgment,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, Teminated Case,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, and Request for Expedited Briefing which is Filed on Behalf of All Defendants with the exception of one by Defendant Farmers Insurance Company. (Johnson, Thomas)
February 22, 2016 Filing 490 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Gary Lyn Fleming on behalf of Acuity, A Mutual Insurance CompanyAttorney Gary Lyn Fleming added to party Acuity, A Mutual Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Gary Lyn Fleming added to party Acuity, A Mutual Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Fleming, Gary)
February 22, 2016 Filing 489 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Gary Lyn Fleming on behalf of American Strategic Insurance Corp.Attorney Gary Lyn Fleming added to party American Strategic Insurance Corp.(pty:dft), Attorney Gary Lyn Fleming added to party American Strategic Insurance Corp.(pty:dft) (Fleming, Gary)
February 18, 2016 Filing 488 STRICKEN - NOTICE of Errata (Sebsequent Exibits Third) by Plaintiffs Louise Creager, Mary Ann Geldreich, Dorothy Wood Hammer, Mary Harrow, Sueham Kay Hoffman, Sueham (I) Kay Hoffman, Janet Koch, Gary Lemert, Martha Lemert, Tommy Meyer, Jeffrey Ray, Jennifer Ray, Ian Siemplenski, Dale Snyder, Marilyn Snyder, Catherine Taylor, Laila (I) Saeda Urban, Laila Saeda Urban, Nicole Wright-Meyer, Kenneth Dale Yoder (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 11-1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 11-2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 11-3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 11-4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 11-5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 11-6, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 11-7, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 11-8, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 11-9, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 12-1, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 12-2, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 12-3, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 12-4, #14 Exhibit Exhibit 12-5, #15 Exhibit Exhibit 12-6, #16 Exhibit Exhibit 12-7, #17 Exhibit Exhibit 12-8, #18 Exhibit Exhibit 12-9, #19 Exhibit Exhibit 12-10, #20 Exhibit Exhibit 12-11, #21 Exhibit Exhibit 12-12, #22 Exhibit Exhibit 12-13)(Hernandez, Josue) Modified on 3/2/2016 to Strike pursuant to #494 Order (agarc, ).
February 18, 2016 Filing 487 STRICKEN - NOTICE of Errata (Sebsequent Ex 2) by Plaintiffs Louise Creager, Mary Ann Geldreich, Dorothy Wood Hammer, Mary Harrow, Sueham Kay Hoffman, Sueham (I) Kay Hoffman, Janet Koch, Gary Lemert, Martha Lemert, Tommy Meyer, Jeffrey Ray, Jennifer Ray, Ian Siemplenski, Dale Snyder, Marilyn Snyder, Catherine Taylor, Laila (I) Saeda Urban, Laila Saeda Urban, Nicole Wright-Meyer, Kenneth Dale Yoder (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 6-1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 6-2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 7-1, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 7-2, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 7-3, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 7-4, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7-5, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 7-6, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 8-1, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 8-2, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 8-3, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 8-4, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 8-5, #14 Exhibit Exhibit 8-6, #15 Exhibit Exhibit 9-1, #16 Exhibit Exhibit 9-2, #17 Exhibit Exhibit 10-1, #18 Exhibit Exhibit 10-2)(Hernandez, Josue) Modified on 3/2/2016 to Strike pursuant to #494 Order (agarc, ).
February 18, 2016 Filing 486 STRICKEN - NOTICE of Errata (Subsequent Exhibits) by Plaintiffs Louise Creager, Mary Ann Geldreich, Dorothy Wood Hammer, Mary Harrow, Sueham Kay Hoffman, Sueham (I) Kay Hoffman, Janet Koch, Gary Lemert, Martha Lemert, Tommy Meyer, Jeffrey Ray, Jennifer Ray, Ian Siemplenski, Dale Snyder, Marilyn Snyder, Catherine Taylor, Laila (I) Saeda Urban, Laila Saeda Urban, Nicole Wright-Meyer, Kenneth Dale Yoder (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1-1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1-2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2-1, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3-1, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 4-1, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 4-2, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 5-1, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 5-2, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 5-3, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 5-4, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 5-5, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 5-6, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 5-7, #14 Exhibit Exhibit 5-8, #15 Exhibit Exhibit 5-9, #16 Exhibit Exhibit 5-10, #17 Exhibit Exhibit 5-11, #18 Exhibit Exhibit 5-12, #19 Exhibit Exhibit 5-13, #20 Exhibit Exhibit 5-14, #21 Exhibit Exhibit 5-15, #22 Exhibit Exhibit 5-16)(Hernandez, Josue) Modified on 3/2/2016 to Strike pursuant to #494 Order (agarc, ).
February 18, 2016 Filing 485 STRICKEN - NOTICE of Errata by Plaintiffs Louise Creager, Mary Ann Geldreich, Dorothy Wood Hammer, Mary Harrow, Sueham Kay Hoffman, Sueham (I) Kay Hoffman, Janet Koch, Gary Lemert, Martha Lemert, Tommy Meyer, Jeffrey Ray, Jennifer Ray, Ian Siemplenski, Dale Snyder, Marilyn Snyder, Catherine Taylor, Laila (I) Saeda Urban, Laila Saeda Urban, Nicole Wright-Meyer, Kenneth Dale Yoder (Attachments: #1 Appendix Appendix 1, #2 Appendix Appendix 2, #3 Appendix Appendix 3, #4 Appendix Appendix 4, #5 Appendix Appendix 5, #6 Appendix Appendix 6, #7 Appendix Appendix 7, #8 Appendix Appendix 8, #9 Appendix Appendix 9, #10 Appendix Appendix 10, #11 Appendix Appendix 11, #12 Appendix Appendix 12, #13 Appendix Appendix 13, #14 Appendix Appendix 14, #15 Appendix Appendix 15, #16 Appendix Appendix 16, #17 Appendix Appendix 17, #18 Appendix Appendix 18, #19 Appendix Appendix 19, #20 Appendix Appendix 20, #21 Appendix Appendix 21, #22 Appendix Appendix 22, #23 Appendix Appendix 23, #24 Appendix Appendix 24, #25 Appendix Appendix 25, #26 Appendix Appendix 26, #27 Appendix Appendix 27, #28 Appendix Appendix 28, #29 Appendix Appendix 29, #30 Appendix Appendix 30, #31 Appendix Appendix 31)(Hernandez, Josue) Modified on 3/2/2016 to Strike pursuant to #494 Order (agarc, ).
February 17, 2016 Filing 484 NOTICE of Change of Address/Contact Information by Josue David Hernandez (Hernandez, Josue)
February 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 483 ORDER granting #480 and #482 Motions to Withdraw. Eddie Gene Dougherty and the law firm Dougherty & Holloway, L.L.C. are hereby withdrawn as counsel of record for plaintiffs in this matter. The clerk is directed to remove Eddie Gene Dougherty from the CM/ECF filing notification system in connection with this action. Attorney Josue David Hernandez, Attorney at Law, shall continue as counsel of record for the plaintiffs. Signed by Judge John L. Kane on 02/17/16.(jhawk, )
February 17, 2016 Filing 482 Amended MOTION to Withdraw as Counsel for Plaintiffs by Plaintiffs Louise Creager, Mary Ann Geldreich, Dorothy Wood Hammer, Mary Harrow, Sueham Kay Hoffman, Sueham (I) Kay Hoffman, Janet Koch, Gary Lemert, Martha Lemert, Tommy Meyer, Jeffrey Ray, Jennifer Ray, Ian Siemplenski, Dale Snyder, Marilyn Snyder, Catherine Taylor, Laila (I) Saeda Urban, Laila Saeda Urban, Nicole Wright-Meyer, Kenneth Dale Yoder. (Dougherty, Eddie)
February 16, 2016 Filing 481 STRICKEN- MOTION to Alter Judgment Final Judgement, MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify Final Judgment, MOTION to Vacate Final Judgment by Plaintiffs Louise Creager, Mary Ann Geldreich, Dorothy Wood Hammer, Mary Harrow, Sueham Kay Hoffman, Sueham (I) Kay Hoffman, Janet Koch, Gary Lemert, Martha Lemert, Tommy Meyer, Jeffrey Ray, Jennifer Ray, Ian Siemplenski, Dale Snyder, Marilyn Snyder, Catherine Taylor, Laila (I) Saeda Urban, Laila Saeda Urban, Nicole Wright-Meyer, Kenneth Dale Yoder. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 11)(Hernandez, Josue) Modified on 3/2/2016 to Strike pursuant to #494 Order (agarc, ).
February 16, 2016 Filing 480 MOTION to Withdraw as Counsel for Plaintiffs by Plaintiffs Louise Creager, Mary Ann Geldreich, Dorothy Wood Hammer, Mary Harrow, Sueham Kay Hoffman, Sueham (I) Kay Hoffman, Janet Koch, Gary Lemert, Martha Lemert, Tommy Meyer, Jeffrey Ray, Jennifer Ray, Ian Siemplenski, Dale Snyder, Marilyn Snyder, Catherine Taylor, Laila (I) Saeda Urban, Laila Saeda Urban, Nicole Wright-Meyer, Kenneth Dale Yoder. (Dougherty, Eddie)
January 19, 2016 Filing 479 FINAL JUDGMENT in favor of Defendants ABC Insurance Company, ABC Organization, Acord Corporation, Acuity, A Mutual Insurance Company, Addison Insurance Company, All American Insurance Company, Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company, Allianz Life Insurance Co. of North America, Allianz of America, Inc., Allstate Insurance Company, American Association of Insurance Services, Inc., American Automobile Insurance Company, American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida, American Family Home Insurance Company, American Family Mutual Insurance Company, American Indemnity Financial Corporation, American International Group, Inc., American Modern Home Insurance Company, American Modern Insurance Group, Inc., American Modern Select Insurance Company, American Reliable Insurance Company, American Strategic Insurance Corp., Associated Indemnity Corporation, Auto-Owners Insurance Company, Automobile Insurance Company of Hartford Connecticut, Buckeye State Mutual Insurance Company, The, California Casualty Indemnity Exchange, The, Casualty Actuarial Society, Central Mutual Insurance Company, Chubb Corporation, The, Chubb National Insurance Company, Chubb Services Corporation, Cincinnati Insurance Company, Colorado Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Co., Country Mutual Insurance Company, Electric Insurance Company, Employers Mutual Casualty Company, Encompass Indemnity Company, Encompass Insurance Company of America, Farmers Alliance Mutual Insurance Company, Farmers Insurance Company, Federal Insurance Company, Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland, Fireman's Fund Insurance Company, First American Financial Corporation, First American Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Grange Insurance Association, Great Northern Insurance Company, Guideone Mutual Insurance Company, Hartford Accident and Indemnity Company, Hartford Financial Services Group, The, Hartford Fire Insurance Company, Insurance Services Office, Inc., Internation Insurance Society, Inc., Kemper Corporate Services, Inc., Kemper Corporation, LM Insurance Corporation, Lafayette Insurance Company, Liberty Insurance Corporation, Liberty Mutual Insurance, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Markel American Insurance Company, Markel Insurance Company, McKinsey & Company, Inc., MetLife Auto & Home Insurance Agency, Inc., Metropolitan Direct Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Metropolitan Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Milbank Insurance Company, Munich-American Holding Corporation, National Casualty Company, National Farmers Union Property and Casualty Company, National Surety Corporation, Nationwide Affinity Insurance Company of America, Nationwide Insurance Company of America, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Owners Insurance Company, Pacific Indemnity Company, Pharmacists Mutual Insurance Company, Praetorian Insurance Company, Property Casualty Insurers Association of America, QBE Holdings, Inc., QBE Insurance Company, QBE Insurance Group, Limited, Safeco Insurance Company of America, Secura Insurance Holdings, Inc., Sentry Insurance, A Mutual Company, Shelter Mutual Insurance Company, Standard Fire Insurance Company, State Automobile Insurance Company, State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, Stillwater Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Texas General Indemnity Company, Travelers Commercial Insurance Company, Travelers Companies Inc., The, Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, Travelers Indemnity Company of America, Travelers Insurance Company, The, Travelers Insurance Group Holdings, Inc., USAACasualty Insurance Company, United Fire & Casualty Company, United Fire & Indemnity Company, United Fire Group, Inc., United Fire Insurance Company, United Fire Lloyds, United Fire and Indemnity Company, United Life Insurance Company, United Services Automobile Association, Unitrin Auto and Home Insurance Company, Unitrin Direct Property & Casualty Company, Verisk Analytics Inc, Vigilant Insurance Company, Zurich American Insurance Company, Zurich Insurance Group Ltd/FI and against Plaintiffs Catherine Taylor, Dale Snyder, Dorothy Wood Hammer, Gary Lemert, Ian Siemplenski, Janet Koch, Jeffrey Ray, Jennifer Ray, Kenneth Dale Yoder, Laila Saeda Urban, Laila (I) Saeda Urban, Louise Creager, Marilyn Snyder, Martha Lemert, Mary Harrow, Mary Ann Geldreich, Nicole Wright-Meyer, Sueham Kay Hoffman, Sueham (I) Kay Hoffman, Tommy Meyer. Civil Case Terminated by Clerk on 1/19/2016. (babia) (Main Document 479 replaced on 1/19/2016) (babia, ).
January 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 478 ORDER Finding as Moot #389 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; Granting #390 Motion to Dismiss; Finding as Moot #391 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; Finding as Moot #392 Motion to Dismiss; Finding as Moot #394 Motion to Dismiss; Finding as Moot #395 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; Finding as Moot #396 Motion to Dismiss; Finding as Moot #397 Motion to Dismiss; Finding as Moot #398 Motion to Dismiss; Finding as Moot #400 Motion to Dismiss; Finding as Moot #402 Motion to Dismiss; Finding as Foot #406 Motion to Dismiss; Finding as Moot #408 Motion for Joinder; Finding as Foot #410 Motion to Dismiss; Finding as Foot #411 Motion to Dismiss; Finding as Foot #412 Motion to Dismiss; Finding as Moot #413 Motion to Dismiss by Judge John L. Kane on 1/15/2016.(babia)
January 6, 2016 Filing 477 NOTICE OF FIRM NAME CHANGE by Defendant American Association of Insurance Services, Inc. (Fuller, Jessica)
January 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 476 ORDER granting #475 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Marilyn Chappell's Motion to Withdraw for Defendants Allstate Insurance Company, Encompass Indemnity Company and Encompass Insurance Company of American. Signed by Judge John L. Kane on 01/04/16.(jhawk, )
December 30, 2015 Filing 475 MOTION to Withdraw Marilyn S. Chappell as Counsel for Defendants Allstate Insurance Company, Encompass Indemnity Company and Encompass Insurance Company of America by Defendants Allstate Insurance Company, Encompass Indemnity Company, Encompass Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Chappell, Marilyn)
December 8, 2015 Filing 474 NOTICE OF WAIVER OF POTENTIAL CONFLICTS OF INTEREST OR POSSIBLE GROUNDS FOR DISQUALIFICATION by Plaintiffs Louise Creager, Mary Ann Geldreich, Dorothy Wood Hammer, Mary Harrow, Sueham Kay Hoffman, Sueham (I) Kay Hoffman, Janet Koch, Gary Lemert, Martha Lemert, Tommy Meyer, Jeffrey Ray, Jennifer Ray, Ian Siemplenski, Dale Snyder, Marilyn Snyder, Catherine Taylor, Laila (I) Saeda Urban, Laila Saeda Urban, Nicole Wright-Meyer, Kenneth Dale Yoder (Hernandez, Josue)
December 7, 2015 Filing 473 NOTICE re 472 Minute Order,,, by Defendants Acord Corporation, Acuity, A Mutual Insurance Company, Addison Insurance Company, All American Insurance Company, Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company, Allianz Life Insurance Co. of North America, Allianz of America, Inc., Allstate Insurance Company, American Association of Insurance Services, Inc., American Automobile Insurance Company, American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida, American Family Home Insurance Company, American Family Mutual Insurance Company, American Indemnity Financial Corporation, American International Group, Inc., American Modern Home Insurance Company, American Modern Insurance Group, Inc., American Modern Select Insurance Company, American Reliable Insurance Company, American Strategic Insurance Corp., Associated Indemnity Corporation, Auto-Owners Insurance Company, Automobile Insurance Company of Hartford Connecticut, Buckeye State Mutual Insurance Company, The, California Casualty Indemnity Exchange, The, Casualty Actuarial Society, Central Mutual Insurance Company, Chubb Corporation, The, Chubb National Insurance Company, Chubb Services Corporation, Cincinnati Insurance Company, Colorado Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Co., Country Mutual Insurance Company, Electric Insurance Company, Employers Mutual Casualty Company, Encompass Indemnity Company, Encompass Insurance Company of America, Farmers Alliance Mutual Insurance Company, Farmers Insurance Company, Federal Insurance Company, Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland, Fireman's Fund Insurance Company, First American Financial Corporation, First American Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Grange Insurance Association, Great Northern Insurance Company, Guideone Mutual Insurance Company, Hartford Accident and Indemnity Company, Hartford Financial Services Group, The, Hartford Fire Insurance Company, Insurance Services Office, Inc., Internation Insurance Society, Inc., Kemper Corporate Services, Inc., Kemper Corporation, LM Insurance Corporation, Lafayette Insurance Company, Liberty Insurance Corporation, Liberty Mutual Insurance, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Markel American Insurance Company, Markel Insurance Company, McKinsey & Company, Inc., McKinsey & Company, Inc., MetLife Auto & Home Insurance Agency, Inc., Metropolitan Direct Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Metropolitan Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Milbank Insurance Company, Munich-American Holding Corporation, National Casualty Company, National Farmers Union Property and Casualty Company, National Surety Corporation, Nationwide Affinity Insurance Company of America, Nationwide Insurance Company of America, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Owners Insurance Company, Pacific Indemnity Company, Pharmacists Mutual Insurance Company, Praetorian Insurance Company, Property Casualty Insurers Association of America, QBE Holdings, Inc., QBE Insurance Company, QBE Insurance Group, Limited, Safeco Insurance Company of America, Secura Insurance Holdings, Inc., Sentry Insurance, A Mutual Company, Shelter Mutual Insurance Company, Standard Fire Insurance Company, State Automobile Insurance Company, State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, Stillwater Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Texas General Indemnity Company, Travelers Commercial Insurance Company, Travelers Companies Inc., The, Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, Travelers Indemnity Company of America, Travelers Insurance Company, The, Travelers Insurance Group Holdings, Inc., USAACasualty Insurance Company, United Fire & Casualty Company, United Fire Group, Inc., United Fire Insurance Company, United Fire Lloyds, United Fire and Indemnity Company, United Life Insurance Company, United Services Automobile Association, Unitrin Auto and Home Insurance Company, Unitrin Direct Property & Casualty Company, Verisk Analytics Inc, Vigilant Insurance Company, Zurich American Insurance Company, Zurich Insurance Group Ltd/FI (Johnson, Thomas)
November 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 472 MINUTE ORDER. In accordance with the Judicial Code of Conduct and 28 U.S.C. ss 455(b) and (e) regarding the disqualification of judges for potential conflicts of interest, I disclose to all parties that I am being represented in a private, non-litigation matter by Hal Haddon of Haddon, Morgan & Foreman, P.C., who is the senior partner of counsel representing a party in this case. I represent that the matter in which Mr. Haddon is representing me has nothing whatever to do with this case, nor have I had any communication about the case with Mr. Haddon. While I see no basis for my recusal in this case, I provide this disclosure under ss 455(e) and ask the parties to submit a statement in the form of a formal Notice indicating whether they agree to waive any ground for disqualification that may exist on the basis of this disclosure. Please file the Notice on or before December 8, 2015. Ordered by Judge John L. Kane on 11/23/2015. Text Only Entry (jlksec)
October 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 471 MINUTE ORDER GRANTING Motion to Withdraw as Counsel #470 . Given that representation of Defendants Insurance Services Office, Inc., and Verisk Analytics, Inc., will continue through Mr. Daniel M. Reily of Reilly Pozner LLP and Mark W. Bayer of Barnes & Thornburg, Attorney Jason M. Lynch is authorized to WITHDRAW as counsel. Mr. Lynch SHALL be REMOVED from future electronic notifications in this case. Entered by Judge John L. Kane on 10/08/15. Text Only Entry(jhawk, )
October 8, 2015 Filing 470 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Jason M. Lynch by Defendants Insurance Services Office, Inc., Verisk Analytics Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Reilly, Daniel)
September 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 469 ORDER granting #468 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Mr. Graham shall be removed from future electronic notifications in this case. Entered by Judge John L. Kane on 09/18/15.(jhawk, )
September 18, 2015 Filing 468 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Daniel A. Graham by Defendant American Family Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Proposed Order)(Graham, Daniel)
June 30, 2015 Filing 467 STATEMENT SPECIFYING SUGGESTED TOPICS FOR ORAL ARGUMENT by Plaintiffs Louise Creager, Mary Ann Geldreich, Dorothy Wood Hammer, Mary Harrow, Sueham Kay Hoffman, Sueham (I) Kay Hoffman, Janet Koch, Gary Lemert, Martha Lemert, Tommy Meyer, Jeffrey Ray, Jennifer Ray, Ian Siemplenski, Dale Snyder, Marilyn Snyder, Catherine Taylor, Laila (I) Saeda Urban, Laila Saeda Urban, Nicole Wright-Meyer, Kenneth Dale Yoder. (Hernandez, Josue)
June 19, 2015 Filing 466 STATEMENT Defendants' Summary of Filed Replies in Support of Motions to Dismiss the Third Amended Class Action Complaint by Defendant Farmers Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Johnson, Thomas)
June 15, 2015 Filing 465 BRIEF in Support of #402 MOTION to Dismiss the Third Amended Complaint Reply in Further Support filed by Defendant Zurich Insurance Group Ltd/FI. (Gee, Ty)
June 15, 2015 Filing 464 REPLY to Response to #400 MOTION to Dismiss the Third Amended Complaint and Memorandum in Support Thereof, #412 MOTION to Dismiss Third Amended Class Action Complaint and Joinder in Briefs Filed by Other Defendants, #395 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Joinder in Motions to Dismiss by Other Defendants, #411 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Third Amended Class Action Complaint, Memorandum in Support Thereof, and Joinder in Motions to Dismiss by Other Defendants filed by Defendants American Association of Insurance Services, Inc., Casualty Actuarial Society, Insurance Services Office, Inc., Property Casualty Insurers Association of America, Verisk Analytics Inc. (Glover, Joel)
June 15, 2015 Filing 463 NOTICE of Filing Amended Pleading re #458 Reply to Response to Motion,,, Amended Exhibit A by Defendants Addison Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Employers Mutual Casualty Company, Lafayette Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Insurance, State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, Texas General Indemnity Company, USAACasualty Insurance Company, United Fire Group, Inc., United Fire Insurance Company, United Fire Lloyds, United Life Insurance Company, United Services Automobile Association, Consol Defendant United Fire & Indemnity Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Sands, Jon)
June 15, 2015 Filing 462 REPLY to Response to #394 MOTION to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint and Joinder in Briefs Filed by State Farm and Non-Selling Defendants filed by Defendant American Family Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2)(Williams, Daniel)
June 15, 2015 Filing 461 REPLY to Response to #400 MOTION to Dismiss the Third Amended Complaint and Memorandum in Support Thereof, #389 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction By Holding Company Defendants and Certain Other Defendants Attorney Evan Bennett Stephenson added to party First American Financial Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Evan Bennett Stephenson added to party First American Financial Corporation(pty:dft) filed by Defendants American Indemnity Financial Corporation, American International Group, Inc., Chubb Corporation, The, First American Financial Corporation, Hartford Financial Services Group, The, Kemper Corporation, Lafayette Insurance Company, QBE Holdings, Inc., QBE Insurance Group, Limited, Secura Insurance Holdings, Inc., Travelers Insurance Group Holdings, Inc., United Fire Group, Inc., United Fire Insurance Company, United Fire Lloyds, Verisk Analytics Inc. (Stephenson, Evan)
June 15, 2015 Filing 460 REPLY to Response to #398 MOTION to Dismiss the Third Amended Complaint and Memorandum in Support, #392 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint, #396 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Third Amended Class Action Complaint and Joinder in Briefs Filed by State Farm and Non-Selling Defendants filed by Defendants American Family Home Insurance Company, American Modern Home Insurance Company, American Modern Insurance Group, Inc., American Modern Select Insurance Company, California Casualty Indemnity Exchange, The, Cincinnati Insurance Company, Kemper Corporate Services, Inc., Kemper Corporation, LM Insurance Corporation, Liberty Insurance Corporation, Liberty Mutual Insurance, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Munich-American Holding Corporation, Safeco Insurance Company of America, Unitrin Auto and Home Insurance Company, Unitrin Direct Property & Casualty Company. (Collignon, Casie)
June 15, 2015 Filing 459 REPLY to Response to #391 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendants Acord Corporation, McKinsey & Company, Inc., McKinsey & Company, Inc.. (Robertson, Stephen)
June 15, 2015 Filing 458 REPLY to Response to #390 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint - Authorities Incorporated filed by Defendants Addison Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, American Indemnity Financial Corporation, Employers Mutual Casualty Company, Encompass Indemnity Company, Encompass Insurance Company of America, Lafayette Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Insurance, State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, Texas General Indemnity Company, USAACasualty Insurance Company, United Fire Group, Inc., United Fire Insurance Company, United Fire Lloyds, United Life Insurance Company, United Services Automobile Association, Consol Defendant United Fire & Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Sands, Jon)
June 12, 2015 Filing 457 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Julia C. Webb on behalf of American Association of Insurance Services, Inc.Attorney Julia C. Webb added to party American Association of Insurance Services, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Julia C. Webb added to party American Association of Insurance Services, Inc.(pty:dft) (Webb, Julia)
June 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 456 MINUTE ORDER GRANTING Motion for Withdrawal of Counsel #455 . Given that representation of Defendants Liberty Insurance Corporation, Liberty Mutual Insurance, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, LM Insurance Corporation, and Safeco Insurance Company of America will continue through Casie D. Collignon, and other attorneys from the law firm of Baker & Hostetler, LLP, Attorney Matthew C. Baisley is WITHDRAWN as counsel. Mr. Baisley SHALL be REMOVED from future electronic notifications in this case. Entered by Judge John L. Kane on 06/11/15. Text Only Entry(jhawk, )
June 11, 2015 Filing 455 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney of Record Matthew C. Baisley by Defendants LM Insurance Corporation, Liberty Insurance Corporation, Liberty Mutual Insurance, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Safeco Insurance Company of America. (Collignon, Casie)
June 3, 2015 Filing 454 NOTICE of Change of Address/Contact Information by Mark William Bayer (Bayer, Mark)
June 3, 2015 Filing 453 ERRATA re #445 Response to Motion,,,,,,,,,,,,, by Plaintiffs Louise Creager, Mary Ann Geldreich, Dorothy Wood Hammer, Mary Harrow, Sueham Kay Hoffman, Sueham (I) Kay Hoffman, Janet Koch, Gary Lemert, Martha Lemert, Tommy Meyer, Jeffrey Ray, Jennifer Ray, Ian Siemplenski, Dale Snyder, Marilyn Snyder, Catherine Taylor, Laila (I) Saeda Urban, Laila Saeda Urban, Nicole Wright-Meyer, Kenneth Dale Yoder. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Corrected Consolidated Response))(Hernandez, Josue)
June 3, 2015 Filing 452 NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES: Jason D. Krueger has failed to comply with D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and one or more of the following Electronic Case Filing Procedures(Civil Cases): 1.1, 1.3(f), 4.1(a), and/or 4.3, which mandate, with exceptions inapplicable here, that all documents filed in civil cases must be filed electronically, shall be converted directly to portable document format (PDF) from software applications in which they were created (i.e., No scanned documents), shall include a signature block with the filer's typed name, typed signature and must match the filers login and password (i.e. a filer may not use non-signatory's login and password to file a document). See ECF Procedure 4.3. Failure in the future to follow these procedures may lead to mandatory CM/ECF training. (Text Only Entry) (jhawk, )
June 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 451 MINUTE ORDER GRANTING Motion to Withdraw as Counsel #431 .Given that representation of Defendant Pharmacists Mutual Insurance Company will continue through Larry S. McClung and Rachel O. Entrican, Attorney Kristin A. George is authorized to WITHDRAW as counsel. Ms. George SHALL be REMOVED from future electronic notifications in this case. Entered by Judge John L. Kane on 06/03/15. Text Only Entry(jhawk, )
June 3, 2015 Filing 450 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Jason D. Krueger by Stuart Douglas Morse on behalf of Central Mutual Insurance Company (Morse, Stuart)
June 3, 2015 Filing 449 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Jason D. Krueger by Stuart Douglas Morse on behalf of Grange Insurance Association (Morse, Stuart)
June 3, 2015 Filing 448 APPENDIX re #445 Response to Motion,,,,,,,,,,,,, Table of Contents by Plaintiffs Louise Creager, Mary Ann Geldreich, Dorothy Wood Hammer, Mary Harrow, Sueham Kay Hoffman, Sueham (I) Kay Hoffman, Janet Koch, Gary Lemert, Martha Lemert, Tommy Meyer, Jeffrey Ray, Jennifer Ray, Ian Siemplenski, Dale Snyder, Marilyn Snyder, Catherine Taylor, Laila (I) Saeda Urban, Laila Saeda Urban, Nicole Wright-Meyer, Kenneth Dale Yoder. (Hernandez, Josue)
June 3, 2015 Filing 447 NOTICE re #445 Response to Motion,,,,,,,,,,,,, Notice of Errata by Plaintiffs Louise Creager, Mary Ann Geldreich, Dorothy Wood Hammer, Mary Harrow, Sueham Kay Hoffman, Sueham (I) Kay Hoffman, Janet Koch, Gary Lemert, Martha Lemert, Tommy Meyer, Jeffrey Ray, Jennifer Ray, Ian Siemplenski, Dale Snyder, Marilyn Snyder, Catherine Taylor, Laila (I) Saeda Urban, Laila Saeda Urban, Nicole Wright-Meyer, Kenneth Dale Yoder (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Corrected Appendix 12, ECF No. 445-3))(Hernandez, Josue)
June 2, 2015 Filing 446 Exhibits in Support of #445 Response to Motion,,,,,,,,,,,,, Exhibits 1-4 by Plaintiffs Louise Creager, Mary Ann Geldreich, Dorothy Wood Hammer, Mary Harrow, Sueham Kay Hoffman, Sueham (I) Kay Hoffman, Janet Koch, Gary Lemert, Martha Lemert, Tommy Meyer, Jeffrey Ray, Jennifer Ray, Ian Siemplenski, Dale Snyder, Marilyn Snyder, Catherine Taylor, Laila (I) Saeda Urban, Laila Saeda Urban, Nicole Wright-Meyer, Kenneth Dale Yoder. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2, #2 Exhibit 3, #3 Exhibit 4)(Dougherty, Eddie)
June 2, 2015 Filing 445 RESPONSE to #414 Amended MOTION for Joinder , #394 MOTION to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint and Joinder in Briefs Filed by State Farm and Non-Selling Defendants, #410 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint, Memorandum in Support, and Joinder in Motions to Dismiss by Other Defendants, #419 MOTION for Order to accept Defendants' Summary of Filed Motions to Dismiss, #406 MOTION to Dismiss Third Amended Class Action Complaint, #389 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction By Holding Company Defendants and Certain Other Defendants, #397 MOTION to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint and Joinder in Briefs Filed by Defendants State Farm Fire and Casualty Company and State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company and American Family Mutual Insurance Company, #399 MOTION for Joinder re #390 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint - Authorities Incorporated , #391 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , #395 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Joinder in Motions to Dismiss by Other Defendants, #411 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Third Amended Class Action Complaint, Memorandum in Support Thereof, and Joinder in Motions to Dismiss by Other Defendants, #390 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint - Authorities Incorporated, #413 MOTION to Dismiss The Complaint [Doc. 8] in Consolidated Case No. 14-cv-01884 and Request for Attorney Fees and Costs, #400 MOTION to Dismiss the Third Amended Complaint and Memorandum in Support Thereof, #398 MOTION to Dismiss the Third Amended Complaint and Memorandum in Support, #392 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint, #412 MOTION to Dismiss Third Amended Class Action Complaint and Joinder in Briefs Filed by Other Defendants, #421 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #394 MOTION to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint and Joinder in Briefs Filed by State Farm and Non-Selling Defendants, #410 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Third Amende, #408 MOTION for Joinder re #390 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint - Authorities Incorporated , #396 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Third Amended Class Action Complaint and Joinder in Briefs Filed by State Farm and Non-Selling Defendants, #402 MOTION to Dismiss the Third Amended Complaint and Jury Demand filed by Plaintiffs Louise Creager, Mary Ann Geldreich, Dorothy Wood Hammer, Mary Harrow, Sueham Kay Hoffman, Sueham (I) Kay Hoffman, Janet Koch, Gary Lemert, Martha Lemert, Tommy Meyer, Jeffrey Ray, Jennifer Ray, Ian Siemplenski, Dale Snyder, Marilyn Snyder, Catherine Taylor, Laila (I) Saeda Urban, Laila Saeda Urban, Nicole Wright-Meyer, Kenneth Dale Yoder. (Attachments: #1 Appendix 1, #2 Appendix 2, #3 Appendix 3, #4 Appendix 4, #5 Appendix 5, #6 Appendix 6, #7 Appendix 7, #8 Appendix 8, #9 Appendix 9, #10 Appendix 10, #11 Appendix 11, #12 Appendix 12)(Dougherty, Eddie)
June 1, 2015 Filing 444 NOTICE OF FIRM NAME CHANGE by Defendant Colorado Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Co. (Mayer, Ellis)
May 22, 2015 Filing 443 NOTICE of Change of Address/Contact Information by Lisa M. Lilly (Lilly, Lisa)
May 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 442 MINUTE ORDER GRANTING Motion to Withdraw as Counsel (Doc. #441 ). Given that representation of Defendant Hartford Accident and Indemnity Company, Hartford Fire Insurance Company, and The Hartford Financial Services Group will continue through Ms. Mitchell of the same law firm, Attorney Alice Warren-Gregory of Shoemaker Ghiselli + Schwartz LLC is authorized to WITHDRAW as counsel. Ms. Warren-Gregory SHALL be REMOVED from future electronic notifications in this case, by Judge John L. Kane on 05/18/2015. Text Only Entry (athom, )
May 18, 2015 Filing 441 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Defendants Hartford Accident and Indemnity Company, Hartford Financial Services Group, The, Hartford Fire Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Warren-Gregory, Alice)
May 18, 2015 Filing 440 NOTICE of Change of Address/Contact Information by William James Kelly, III (Kelly, William)
May 18, 2015 Filing 439 NOTICE of Change of Address/Contact Information by Shannon Marie Bell (Bell, Shannon)
May 18, 2015 Filing 438 NOTICE of Change of Address/Contact Information by R. Livingston Keithley (Keithley, R.)
May 18, 2015 Filing 437 NOTICE of Change of Address/Contact Information by Chanda Marie Feldkamp (Feldkamp, Chanda)
March 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 436 MINUTE ORDER. The Motion to Withdraw filed by attorney Ben Barnes (Doc. 435) is GRANTED. Mr. Barnes is WITHDRAWN as an attorney of record in this case and electronic notification for this individual may be turned off. Entered by Judge John L. Kane on 03/03/15. Text Only Entry(jhawk, )
March 3, 2015 Filing 435 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Ben Barnes by Defendants Insurance Services Office, Inc., Verisk Analytics Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) PROPOSED ORDER OF BEN BARNES TO WITHDRAW)(Barnes, Ben)
February 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 434 MINUTE ORDER. The Motion for Withdrawal of Stephanie N. Gaddy, Esq. (Doc.433) is GRANTED. Stephanie N. Gaddy, Esq. is hereby WITHDRAWN as an attorney of record in this case and electronic notification for her may be turned off. Entered by Judge John L. Kane on 02/23/15. Text Only Entry(jhawk, )
February 20, 2015 Filing 433 MOTION to Withdraw Stephanie N. Gaddy, Esq. by Defendants Addison Insurance Company, American Indemnity Financial Corporation, Employers Mutual Casualty Company, Lafayette Insurance Company, Texas General Indemnity Company, United Fire & Casualty Company, United Fire Group, Inc., United Fire Insurance Company, United Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Chaney, Lelia)
February 6, 2015 Filing 432 TRANSCRIPT of Hearing on Motion for Extension and Status Conference held on January 29, 2015 before Judge Kane. Pages: 1-8.
< NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within seven calendar days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact, of the party's intent to redact personal identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. If a Notice of Intent to Redact is not filed within the allotted time, this transcript will be made electronically available after 90 days. Please see the Notice of Electronic Availability of Transcripts document at www.cod.uscourts.gov.

< Transcript may only be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber prior to the 90 day deadline for electronic posting on PACER. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/11/2015. (mgeor, )
January 30, 2015 Filing 431 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney and Notice of Same by Defendant Pharmacists Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(George, Kristin)
January 29, 2015 Filing 430 MINUTE ENTRY for Motion Hearing and Status Conference proceedings held before Judge John L. Kane on 1/29/2015. Granting # 421 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Responses due June 1, 2015. Replies due June 15, 2015. ORDERED: The parties shall submit detailed disclosures as to the anticipated costs of litigation and the time necessary, in advance of a scheduling conference. Court Reporter: Mary George. (babia)
January 29, 2015 Filing 429 REPLY to Response to # 421 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to # 394 MOTION to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint and Joinder in Briefs Filed by State Farm and Non-Selling Defendants , # 410 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Third Amende filed by Plaintiffs Louise Creager, Mary Ann Geldreich, Dorothy Wood Hammer, Mary Harrow, Sueham Kay Hoffman, Sueham (I) Kay Hoffman, Janet Koch, Gary Lemert, Martha Lemert, Tommy Meyer, Jeffrey Ray, Jennifer Ray, Ian Siemplenski, Dale Snyder, Marilyn Snyder, Catherine Taylor, Laila (I) Saeda Urban, Laila Saeda Urban, Nicole Wright-Meyer, Kenneth Dale Yoder. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit 7)(Dougherty, Eddie)
January 26, 2015 Filing 428 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Stephen James Jorden on behalf of Allianz Life Insurance Co. of North AmericaAttorney Stephen James Jorden added to party Allianz Life Insurance Co. of North America(pty:dft), Attorney Stephen James Jorden added to party Allianz Life Insurance Co. of North America(pty:dft) (Jorden, Stephen)
January 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 427 MINUTE ORDER. Due to the number of attorneys appearing in this case, while permission to listen in via phone is o.k., only those physically present in court will be permitted to address the court. Counsel may select for the purposes of this hearing only, the attorneys who will be present and authorized to speak on behalf of those absent, or, those not appearing may advise that such delegation is not approved for them and their particular clients. This latter proviso will not mean, however, that non-appearing lawyers may address the court. Written, post-hearing, statements will be accepted if filed within ten days. by Judge John L. Kane on 1/22/15. Text Only Entry (jlksec)
January 22, 2015 Filing 426 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by James A. Pinderski on behalf of Farmers Alliance Mutual Insurance CompanyAttorney James A. Pinderski added to party Farmers Alliance Mutual Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney James A. Pinderski added to party Farmers Alliance Mutual Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Pinderski, James)
January 22, 2015 Filing 425 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Michael Joseph DiSantis on behalf of Farmers Alliance Mutual Insurance CompanyAttorney Michael Joseph DiSantis added to party Farmers Alliance Mutual Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Michael Joseph DiSantis added to party Farmers Alliance Mutual Insurance Company(pty:dft) (DiSantis, Michael)
January 21, 2015 Filing 424 BRIEF in Opposition to # 421 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to # 394 MOTION to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint and Joinder in Briefs Filed by State Farm and Non-Selling Defendants , # 410 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Third Amende filed by Defendant Farmers Insurance Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Johnson, Thomas)
January 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 423 MINUTE ORDER re: # 421 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to MOTIONS to Dismiss. A Hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion for Extension of Time and Status Conference is set for 1/29/2015 at 11:00 AM before Judge John L. Kane. Out of state counsel may appear by phone. The hearing may be vacated upon submission of a stipulated amended briefing schedule on or before 9 a.m. Tuesday, 1/27/15. by Judge John L. Kane on 1/14/15. Text Only Entry (jlksec)
January 14, 2015 Filing 422 Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiffs Louise Creager, Mary Ann Geldreich, Dorothy Wood Hammer, Mary Harrow, Sueham Kay Hoffman, Sueham (I) Kay Hoffman, Janet Koch, Gary Lemert, Martha Lemert, Tommy Meyer, Jeffrey Ray, Jennifer Ray, Ian Siemplenski, Dale Snyder, Marilyn Snyder, Catherine Taylor, Laila (I) Saeda Urban, Laila Saeda Urban, Nicole Wright-Meyer, Kenneth Dale Yoder. (Dougherty, Eddie)
January 14, 2015 Filing 421 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to # 394 MOTION to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint and Joinder in Briefs Filed by State Farm and Non-Selling Defendants , # 410 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint, Memorandum in Support, and Joinder in Motions to Dismiss by Other Defendants , # 406 MOTION to Dismiss Third Amended Class Action Complaint , # 389 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction By Holding Company Defendants and Certain Other Defendants , # 397 MOTION to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint and Joinder in Briefs Filed by Defendants State Farm Fire and Casualty Company and State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company and American Family Mutual Insurance Company , # 391 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , # 395 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Joinder in Motions to Dismiss by Other Defendants , # 411 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Third Amended Class Action Complaint, Memorandum in Support Thereof, and Joinder in Motions to Dismiss by Other Defendants , # 390 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint - Authorities Incorporated , # 413 MOTION to Dismiss The Complaint [Doc. 8] in Consolidated Case No. 14-cv-01884 and Request for Attorney Fees and Costs , # 400 MOTION to Dismiss the Third Amended Complaint and Memorandum in Support Thereof , # 398 MOTION to Dismiss the Third Amended Complaint and Memorandum in Support , # 392 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint , # 412 MOTION to Dismiss Third Amended Class Action Complaint and Joinder in Briefs Filed by Other Defendants , # 408 MOTION for Joinder re # 390 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint - Authorities Incorporated , # 396 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Third Amended Class Action Complaint and Joinder in Briefs Filed by State Farm and Non-Selling Defendants , # 402 MOTION to Dismiss the Third Amended Complaint by Plaintiffs Louise Creager, Mary Ann Geldreich, Dorothy Wood Hammer, Mary Harrow, Sueham Kay Hoffman, Sueham (I) Kay Hoffman, Janet Koch, Gary Lemert, Martha Lemert, Tommy Meyer, Jeffrey Ray, Jennifer Ray, Ian Siemplenski, Dale Snyder, Marilyn Snyder, Catherine Taylor, Laila (I) Saeda Urban, Laila Saeda Urban, Nicole Wright-Meyer, Kenneth Dale Yoder. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 5)(Dougherty, Eddie)
December 18, 2014 Filing 420 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent SECURA Insurance, A Mutual Company for Secura Insurance Holdings, Inc.. (Baldwin, Shaun)
December 12, 2014 Filing 419 Defendants' Summary of Filed Motions to Dismiss by Defendant Farmers Insurance Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Summary of Filed Motions to Dismiss and Joinders, # 2 Exhibit Defendants and Pleadings Filed or Joined)(Johnson, Thomas) Modified on 12/18/2014 to correct title of document (athom, ).
December 9, 2014 Filing 418 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Counsel by Randall Allan Hack on behalf of Farmers Insurance CompanyAttorney Randall Allan Hack added to party Farmers Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Randall Allan Hack added to party Farmers Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Hack, Randall)
December 9, 2014 Filing 417 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Kevin Christopher McAdam on behalf of Casualty Actuarial SocietyAttorney Kevin Christopher McAdam added to party Casualty Actuarial Society(pty:dft), Attorney Kevin Christopher McAdam added to party Casualty Actuarial Society(pty:dft) (McAdam, Kevin)
December 8, 2014 Filing 416 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Frohardt, Erin)
December 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 415 MINUTE ORDER re Joinders (Docs. 414, 399). Joinders in the various Motions to Dismiss are authorized under the applicable briefing plan and leave for filing them need not be sought. The "motions" status of Docs. 414 and 399 are therefore TERMED and any additional filings of this kind should simply be filed as a JOINDER, and not a "Motion for Joinder." Entered by Judge John L. Kane on 12/08/14. Text Only Entry(jhawk, )
December 8, 2014 Filing 414 Amended MOTION for Joinder by Defendant Colorado Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Co.. (Mayer, Ellis)
December 5, 2014 Filing 413 MOTION to Dismiss The Complaint [Doc. 8] in Consolidated Case No. 14-cv-01884 and Request for Attorney Fees and Costs by Defendants Addison Insurance Company, Lafayette Insurance Company, Texas General Indemnity Company, United Fire & Casualty Company, United Fire Group, Inc., United Fire Insurance Company, United Fire Lloyds, United Fire and Indemnity Company, Consol Defendant United Fire & Indemnity Company. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Affidavit of Neal Scharmer Regarding Lafayette Insurance and United Fire Lloyds)(West, Jerad)
December 5, 2014 Filing 412 MOTION to Dismiss Third Amended Class Action Complaint and Joinder in Briefs Filed by Other Defendants by Defendant American Association of Insurance Services, Inc.. (Fuller, Jessica)
December 5, 2014 Filing 411 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Third Amended Class Action Complaint, Memorandum in Support Thereof, and Joinder in Motions to Dismiss by Other Defendants by Defendant Property Casualty Insurers Association of America. (Ingebretsen, Stephen)
December 5, 2014 Filing 410 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint, Memorandum in Support, and Joinder in Motions to Dismiss by Other Defendants by Defendants National Casualty Company, Nationwide Affinity Insurance Company of America, Nationwide Insurance Company of America, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company. (Ingebretsen, Stephen)
December 5, 2014 Filing 409 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Gee, Ty)
December 5, 2014 Filing 408 MOTION for Joinder re # 390 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint - Authorities Incorporated by Defendant USAACasualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Scott, Jessica)
December 5, 2014 Filing 407 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Frank M. Scaduto on behalf of Zurich Insurance Group Ltd/FIAttorney Frank M. Scaduto added to party Zurich Insurance Group Ltd/FI(pty:dft), Attorney Frank M. Scaduto added to party Zurich Insurance Group Ltd/FI(pty:dft) (Scaduto, Frank)
December 5, 2014 Filing 406 MOTION to Dismiss Third Amended Class Action Complaint by Defendant Shelter Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 Part 1 of 2, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 Part 2 of 2, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, # 4 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Proposed Order)(Bledsoe, Philip)
December 5, 2014 Filing 405 STATEMENT (Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement) by Defendant Zurich Insurance Group Ltd/FI. (Gee, Ty) Modified on 12/5/2014 Attorney notified to rifile under correct event (jhawk, ).
December 5, 2014 Filing 404 DECLARATION of Frank Scaduto regarding MOTION to Dismiss the Third Amended Complaint # 402 by Defendant Zurich Insurance Group Ltd/FI. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Gee, Ty)
December 5, 2014 Filing 403 DECLARATION of Adrian Peyer regarding MOTION to Dismiss the Third Amended Complaint # 402 by Defendant Zurich Insurance Group Ltd/FI. (Gee, Ty)
December 5, 2014 Filing 402 MOTION to Dismiss the Third Amended Complaint by Defendant Zurich Insurance Group Ltd/FI. (Gee, Ty)
December 5, 2014 Filing 401 JOINDER re # 398 MOTION to Dismiss the Third Amended Complaint and Memorandum in Support by Defendant United Life Insurance Company. (West, Jerad)
December 5, 2014 Filing 400 MOTION to Dismiss the Third Amended Complaint and Memorandum in Support Thereof by Defendants Insurance Services Office, Inc., Verisk Analytics Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Bayer, Mark)
December 5, 2014 Filing 399 MOTION for Joinder re # 390 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint - Authorities Incorporated by Defendant Colorado Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Co.. (Mayer, Ellis)
December 5, 2014 Filing 398 MOTION to Dismiss the Third Amended Complaint and Memorandum in Support by Defendant Allianz Life Insurance Co. of North America. (Cuervo, Raul)
December 5, 2014 Filing 397 MOTION to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint and Joinder in Briefs Filed by Defendants State Farm Fire and Casualty Company and State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company and American Family Mutual Insurance Company by Defendant Country Mutual Insurance Company. (Kelly, William)
December 5, 2014 Filing 396 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Third Amended Class Action Complaint and Joinder in Briefs Filed by State Farm and Non-Selling Defendants by Defendants Automobile Insurance Company of Hartford Connecticut, Standard Fire Insurance Company, Travelers Commercial Insurance Company, Travelers Companies Inc., The, Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, Travelers Indemnity Company of America, Travelers Insurance Company, The, Travelers Insurance Group Holdings, Inc.. (Blume, Robert)
December 5, 2014 Filing 395 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Joinder in Motions to Dismiss by Other Defendants by Defendant Casualty Actuarial Society. (Sollod, Holly)
December 5, 2014 Filing 394 MOTION to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint and Joinder in Briefs Filed by State Farm and Non-Selling Defendants by Defendant American Family Mutual Insurance Company. (Williams, Daniel)
December 5, 2014 Filing 393 JOINDER re # 390 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint - Authorities Incorporated by Defendants Allstate Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Insurance, United Fire & Casualty Company. (Anderson, Sheryl)
December 5, 2014 Filing 392 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint by Defendants American Family Home Insurance Company, American Modern Home Insurance Company, American Modern Insurance Group, Inc., American Modern Select Insurance Company, California Casualty Indemnity Exchange, The, Cincinnati Insurance Company, Kemper Corporate Services, Inc., Kemper Corporation, LM Insurance Corporation, Liberty Insurance Corporation, Liberty Mutual Insurance, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Munich-American Holding Corporation, Safeco Insurance Company of America, Unitrin Auto and Home Insurance Company, Unitrin Direct Property & Casualty Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Collignon, Casie)
December 5, 2014 Filing 391 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Defendants Acord Corporation, McKinsey & Company, Inc., McKinsey & Company, Inc.. (Theodore, Jeffrey)
December 5, 2014 Filing 390 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint - Authorities Incorporated by Defendants State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)(Sands, Jon)
December 4, 2014 Filing 389 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction By Holding Company Defendants and Certain Other Defendants by Defendants American Indemnity Financial Corporation, American International Group, Inc., Chubb Corporation, The, First American Financial Corporation, Hartford Financial Services Group, The, Kemper Corporation, Lafayette Insurance Company, QBE Holdings, Inc., QBE Insurance Group, Limited, Secura Insurance Holdings, Inc., Travelers Insurance Group Holdings, Inc., United Fire Group, Inc., United Fire Insurance Company, United Fire Lloyds. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Neal Scharmer - American Indemnity Financial Corporation, # 2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Patrick Burke - American International Group, Inc., # 3 Exhibit C - Declaration of Jeffrey Robinson - First American Financial Corporation, # 4 Exhibit D - Declaration of Dennis Sandelski - Kemper Corporation, # 5 Exhibit E - Declaration of Neal Scharmer - Lafayette Insurance Company, # 6 Exhibit F - Declaration of Brendan Malley - QBE Holdings, Inc. and QBE Insurance Group, # 7 Exhibit G - Declaration of Daniel Ferris - SECURA Insurance Holdings, Inc., # 8 Exhibit H - Declaration of Douglas Nordstrom - The Chubb Corporation, # 9 Exhibit I - Declaration of Donald Hunt - The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc., # 10 Exhibit J - Declaration of Ann Mulcahy - Travelers Insurance Group Holdings, Inc., # 11 Exhibit K - Declaration of Neal Scharmer - United Fire Group, Inc., # 12 Exhibit L - Declaration of Neal Scharmer - United Fire Insurance Company, # 13 Exhibit M - Declaration of Neal Scharmer - United Fire Lloyds)(Ridley, Terence)
December 4, 2014 Filing 388 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Andrew T. Hanrahan on behalf of Zurich Insurance Group Ltd/FIAttorney Andrew T. Hanrahan added to party Zurich Insurance Group Ltd/FI(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew T. Hanrahan added to party Zurich Insurance Group Ltd/FI(pty:dft) (Hanrahan, Andrew)
December 4, 2014 Filing 387 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Richard William Mancino on behalf of Zurich Insurance Group Ltd/FIAttorney Richard William Mancino added to party Zurich Insurance Group Ltd/FI(pty:dft), Attorney Richard William Mancino added to party Zurich Insurance Group Ltd/FI(pty:dft) (Mancino, Richard)
December 4, 2014 Filing 386 NOTICE of Filing of Motions to Dismiss and Joinders by Defendant Farmers Insurance Company (Johnson, Thomas)
December 3, 2014 Filing 385 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Shaun McParland Baldwin on behalf of Secura Insurance Holdings, Inc.Attorney Shaun McParland Baldwin added to party Secura Insurance Holdings, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Shaun McParland Baldwin added to party Secura Insurance Holdings, Inc.(pty:dft) (Baldwin, Shaun)
December 3, 2014 Filing 384 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Saskia A. Jordan on behalf of Zurich Insurance Group Ltd/FIAttorney Saskia A. Jordan added to party Zurich Insurance Group Ltd/FI(pty:dft), Attorney Saskia A. Jordan added to party Zurich Insurance Group Ltd/FI(pty:dft) (Jordan, Saskia)
December 3, 2014 Filing 383 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Ty Cheung Gee on behalf of Zurich Insurance Group Ltd/FIAttorney Ty Cheung Gee added to party Zurich Insurance Group Ltd/FI(pty:dft), Attorney Ty Cheung Gee added to party Zurich Insurance Group Ltd/FI(pty:dft) (Gee, Ty)
November 26, 2014 Filing 382 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Allianz SE, Corporate Parent Allianz Europe B.V. for Allianz of America, Inc.. (Mickley, Lisa)
November 25, 2014 Filing 381 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Robert A. Zupkus on behalf of Farmers Alliance Mutual Insurance CompanyAttorney Robert A. Zupkus added to party Farmers Alliance Mutual Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Robert A. Zupkus added to party Farmers Alliance Mutual Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Zupkus, Robert)
November 25, 2014 Filing 380 THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT CLASS ACTION and JURY DEMAND against All Defendants, filed by All Plaintiffs.(jhawk, )
November 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 379 ORDER granting # 377 Agreed Motion to Adopt Third Amended Complaint by Judge John L. Kane on 11/25/14.(jhawk, )
November 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 378 MINUTE ORDER re Doc. 375, "Motion to Amend Scheduling Order." The Motion, which refers to the master briefing schedule previously entered in this class action litigation (and not a Rule 16-style Scheduling Order, which has yet to be entered), is CONSTRUED as a Motion to Amend Briefing Schedule (Doc. 335) and is GRANTED. The Briefing Schedule at Doc. 335 is AMENDED to reflect the following extensions of time: Motions to Dismiss related to Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint are due December 5, 2014; Plaintiffs shall have to January 16, 2015, in which to respond; and Replies are due on or before February 27, 2015. Entered by Judge John L. Kane on 11/24/14. Text Only Entry(jhawk, )
November 24, 2014 Filing 377 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify Adopt Third Amended Complaint by Plaintiffs Louise Creager, Mary Ann Geldreich, Dorothy Wood Hammer, Mary Harrow, Sueham Kay Hoffman, Sueham (I) Kay Hoffman, Janet Koch, Gary Lemert, Martha Lemert, Tommy Meyer, Jeffrey Ray, Jennifer Ray, Ian Siemplenski, Dale Snyder, Marilyn Snyder, Catherine Taylor, Laila (I) Saeda Urban, Laila Saeda Urban, Nicole Wright-Meyer, Kenneth Dale Yoder. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Dougherty, Eddie)
November 24, 2014 Filing 376 NOTICE re # 339 Amended Complaint, of Errata by Plaintiffs Louise Creager, Mary Ann Geldreich, Dorothy Wood Hammer, Mary Harrow, Sueham Kay Hoffman, Sueham (I) Kay Hoffman, Janet Koch, Gary Lemert, Martha Lemert, Tommy Meyer, Jeffrey Ray, Jennifer Ray, Ian Siemplenski, Dale Snyder, Marilyn Snyder, Catherine Taylor, Laila (I) Saeda Urban, Laila Saeda Urban, Nicole Wright-Meyer, Kenneth Dale Yoder (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 1-A, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 2-A, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 3-A, # 7 Exhibit 4, # 8 Exhibit 4-A, # 9 Exhibit 5, # 10 Exhibit 5-A, # 11 Exhibit 6, # 12 Exhibit 6-A, # 13 Exhibit 7, # 14 Exhibit 7-A, # 15 Exhibit 8, # 16 Exhibit 8-A, # 17 Exhibit 9, # 18 Exhibit 9-A, # 19 Exhibit 10, # 20 Exhibit 10-A, # 21 Exhibit 11, # 22 Exhibit 11-A, # 23 Exhibit 12, # 24 Exhibit 12-A, # 25 Exhibit 13, # 26 Exhibit 13-A, # 27 Exhibit 14, # 28 Exhibit 14-A, # 29 Exhibit 15, # 30 Exhibit 15-A, # 31 Exhibit 16, # 32 Exhibit 16-A, # 33 Exhibit 17, # 34 Exhibit 17-A, # 35 Exhibit 18, # 36 Exhibit 18-A, # 37 Exhibit 19, # 38 Exhibit 19-A, # 39 Exhibit 20, # 40 Exhibit 20-A, # 41 Exhibit 21, # 42 Exhibit 21-A, # 43 Exhibit 22, # 44 Exhibit 22-A, # 45 Exhibit 23, # 46 Exhibit 23-A, # 47 Exhibit 24, # 48 Exhibit 24-A, # 49 Exhibit 25, # 50 Exhibit 25-A, # 51 Exhibit 26, # 52 Exhibit 26-A, # 53 Exhibit 27, # 54 Exhibit 27-A, # 55 Exhibit 28, # 56 Exhibit 28-A, # 57 Exhibit 29, # 58 Exhibit 29-A, # 59 Exhibit 30, # 60 Exhibit 30-A, # 61 Exhibit 31, # 62 Exhibit 31-A, # 63 Exhibit 32, # 64 Exhibit 32-A, # 65 Exhibit 33, # 66 Exhibit 33-A, # 67 Exhibit 34, # 68 Exhibit 34-A, # 69 Exhibit 35, # 70 Exhibit 35-A, # 71 Exhibit 36, # 72 Exhibit 36-A, # 73 Exhibit 37, # 74 Exhibit 37-A, # 75 Exhibit 38, # 76 Exhibit 38-A, # 77 Exhibit 39, # 78 Exhibit 39-A, # 79 Exhibit 40, # 80 Exhibit 40-A, # 81 Exhibit 41, # 82 Exhibit 41-A, # 83 Exhibit 42, # 84 Exhibit 42-A, # 85 Exhibit 43, # 86 Exhibit 43-A, # 87 Exhibit 44, # 88 Exhibit 44-A, # 89 Exhibit 45, # 90 Exhibit 45-A, # 91 Exhibit 46, # 92 Exhibit 46-A, # 93 Exhibit 47, # 94 Exhibit 47-A, # 95 Exhibit 48, # 96 Exhibit 48-A, # 97 Exhibit 49, # 98 Exhibit 49-A, # 99 Exhibit 50, # 100 Exhibit 50-A, # 101 Exhibit 51, # 102 Exhibit 51-A, # 103 Exhibit 52, # 104 Exhibit 52-A, # 105 Exhibit 53, # 106 Exhibit 53-A, # 107 Exhibit 54, # 108 Exhibit 54-A, # 109 Exhibit 55, # 110 Exhibit 55-A, # 111 Exhibit 56)(Dougherty, Eddie)
November 24, 2014 Filing 375 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond Agreed by Defendant Farmers Insurance Company. (Hays, Brian)
November 24, 2014 Filing 374 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Jessica L. Fuller by Jessica Lynn Fuller on behalf of American Association of Insurance Services, Inc.Attorney Jessica Lynn Fuller added to party American Association of Insurance Services, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Jessica Lynn Fuller added to party American Association of Insurance Services, Inc.(pty:dft) (Fuller, Jessica)
November 24, 2014 Filing 373 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Joel A. Glover by Joel Alan Glover on behalf of American Association of Insurance Services, Inc.Attorney Joel Alan Glover added to party American Association of Insurance Services, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Joel Alan Glover added to party American Association of Insurance Services, Inc.(pty:dft) (Glover, Joel)
November 24, 2014 Filing 372 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Brian Ignatius Hays on behalf of Farmers Insurance CompanyAttorney Brian Ignatius Hays added to party Farmers Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Brian Ignatius Hays added to party Farmers Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Hays, Brian)
November 21, 2014 Filing 371 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Muliha Alia Khan on behalf of Secura Insurance Holdings, Inc.Attorney Muliha Alia Khan added to party Secura Insurance Holdings, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Muliha Alia Khan added to party Secura Insurance Holdings, Inc.(pty:dft) (Khan, Muliha)
November 21, 2014 Filing 370 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Other Affiliate Dairyland Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Middlesex Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Sentry Select Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Sentry Casualty Company, Other Affiliate Peak Property and Casualty Insurance Corporation, Other Affiliate Viking Insurance Company of Wisconsin for Sentry Insurance, A Mutual Company. (Mickley, Lisa)
November 21, 2014 Filing 369 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Allianz SE, Corporate Parent Allianz Europe B.V., Corporate Parent Fireman's Fund Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Allianz of America, Inc. for National Surety Corporation. (Mickley, Lisa)
November 21, 2014 Filing 368 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Allianz SE, Corporate Parent Allianz Europe B.V., Corporate Parent Allianz of America, Inc. for Fireman's Fund Insurance Company. (Mickley, Lisa)
November 21, 2014 Filing 367 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Allianz SE, Corporate Parent Allianz Europe B.V., Corporate Parent Fireman's Fund Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Allianz of America, Inc. for Associated Indemnity Corporation. (Mickley, Lisa)
November 21, 2014 Filing 366 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Allianz SE, Corporate Parent Allianz Europe B.V., Corporate Parent Fireman's Fund Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Allianz of America, Inc. for American Automobile Insurance Company. (Mickley, Lisa)
November 21, 2014 Filing 365 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Allianz SE, Corporate Parent Allianz Europe B.V., Other Affiliate Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company for Allianz of America, Inc.. (Mickley, Lisa)
November 21, 2014 Filing 364 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Allianz SE, Corporate Parent Allianz Europe B.V., Corporate Parent Allianz of America, Inc. for Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company. (Mickley, Lisa)
November 21, 2014 Filing 363 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Lance E. Shurtleff on behalf of Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company, Allianz of America, Inc., American Automobile Insurance Company, Associated Indemnity Corporation, Fireman's Fund Insurance Company, National Surety Corporation, Sentry Insurance, A Mutual CompanyAttorney Lance E. Shurtleff added to party Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Lance E. Shurtleff added to party Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Lance E. Shurtleff added to party Allianz of America, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Lance E. Shurtleff added to party Allianz of America, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Lance E. Shurtleff added to party American Automobile Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Lance E. Shurtleff added to party American Automobile Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Lance E. Shurtleff added to party Associated Indemnity Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Lance E. Shurtleff added to party Associated Indemnity Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Lance E. Shurtleff added to party Fireman's Fund Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Lance E. Shurtleff added to party Fireman's Fund Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Lance E. Shurtleff added to party National Surety Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Lance E. Shurtleff added to party National Surety Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Lance E. Shurtleff added to party Sentry Insurance, A Mutual Company(pty:dft), Attorney Lance E. Shurtleff added to party Sentry Insurance, A Mutual Company(pty:dft) (Shurtleff, Lance)
November 21, 2014 Filing 362 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Thomas John Lyons on behalf of Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company, Allianz of America, Inc., American Automobile Insurance Company, Associated Indemnity Corporation, Fireman's Fund Insurance Company, National Surety Corporation, Sentry Insurance, A Mutual CompanyAttorney Thomas John Lyons added to party Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Thomas John Lyons added to party Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Thomas John Lyons added to party Allianz of America, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Thomas John Lyons added to party Allianz of America, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Thomas John Lyons added to party American Automobile Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Thomas John Lyons added to party American Automobile Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Thomas John Lyons added to party Associated Indemnity Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Thomas John Lyons added to party Associated Indemnity Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Thomas John Lyons added to party Fireman's Fund Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Thomas John Lyons added to party Fireman's Fund Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Thomas John Lyons added to party National Surety Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Thomas John Lyons added to party National Surety Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Thomas John Lyons added to party Sentry Insurance, A Mutual Company(pty:dft), Attorney Thomas John Lyons added to party Sentry Insurance, A Mutual Company(pty:dft) (Lyons, Thomas)
November 21, 2014 Filing 361 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Lisa F. Mickley on behalf of Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company, Allianz of America, Inc., American Automobile Insurance Company, Associated Indemnity Corporation, Fireman's Fund Insurance Company, National Surety Corporation, Sentry Insurance, A Mutual CompanyAttorney Lisa F. Mickley added to party Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Lisa F. Mickley added to party Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Lisa F. Mickley added to party Allianz of America, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Lisa F. Mickley added to party Allianz of America, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Lisa F. Mickley added to party American Automobile Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Lisa F. Mickley added to party American Automobile Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Lisa F. Mickley added to party Associated Indemnity Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Lisa F. Mickley added to party Associated Indemnity Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Lisa F. Mickley added to party Fireman's Fund Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Lisa F. Mickley added to party Fireman's Fund Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Lisa F. Mickley added to party National Surety Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Lisa F. Mickley added to party National Surety Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Lisa F. Mickley added to party Sentry Insurance, A Mutual Company(pty:dft), Attorney Lisa F. Mickley added to party Sentry Insurance, A Mutual Company(pty:dft) (Mickley, Lisa)
November 20, 2014 Filing 360 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance on behalf of Defendants (1) Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland and Zurich American Insurance Company by Michael Ritchie McCurdy on behalf of Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland, Zurich American Insurance CompanyAttorney Michael Ritchie McCurdy added to party Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland(pty:dft), Attorney Michael Ritchie McCurdy added to party Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland(pty:dft), Attorney Michael Ritchie McCurdy added to party Zurich American Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Michael Ritchie McCurdy added to party Zurich American Insurance Company(pty:dft) (McCurdy, Michael)
November 19, 2014 Filing 359 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Party Stillwater Property and Casualty Insurance Company f/k/a Fidelity National Property and Casualty Insurance Company, d/b/a Stillwater Insurance Group by Plaintiffs Louise Creager, Mary Ann Geldreich, Dorothy Wood Hammer, Mary Harrow, Sueham Kay Hoffman, Sueham (I) Kay Hoffman, Janet Koch, Gary Lemert, Martha Lemert, Tommy Meyer, Jeffrey Ray, Jennifer Ray, Ian Siemplenski, Dale Snyder, Marilyn Snyder, Catherine Taylor, Laila (I) Saeda Urban, Laila Saeda Urban, Nicole Wright-Meyer, Kenneth Dale Yoder (Dougherty, Eddie)
November 19, 2014 Filing 358 NOTICE OF MANDATORY FEE: Attorney Guy Brian Humphries has failed to pay the 2013 renewal fee of $50. Failure to pay this fee within 15 days of the date of this docket entry may lead to action by the court.(Text only entry)(mfred) Modified on 11/19/2014 To correct docket entry(mfred, ). This entry was docketed in this case in error.
November 3, 2014 Filing 357 NOTICE OF CASE ASSOCIATION by Defendants USAACasualty Insurance Company, United Services Automobile Association (Vaught, John)
October 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 356 ORDER granting # 354 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Hetal Janak Doshi terminated, by Judge John L. Kane on 10/21/14. Text Only Entry(jlksec)
October 20, 2014 Filing 355 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. QBE Insurance Group, Limited served on 8/1/2014, answer due 8/22/2014. (Dougherty, Eddie)
October 20, 2014 Filing 354 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Hetal J. Doshi by Defendant American Family Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Doshi, Hetal)
October 20, 2014 Filing 353 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Texas General Indemnity Company served on 7/16/2014, answer due 8/6/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Additional Proof of Service)(Dougherty, Eddie)
October 20, 2014 Filing 352 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Liberty Mutual Insurance Company served on 7/16/2014, answer due 8/6/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Additional Proof of Service)(Dougherty, Eddie)
October 20, 2014 Filing 351 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Liberty Mutual Insurance served on 7/16/2014, answer due 8/6/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proof of Additional Service)(Dougherty, Eddie)
October 20, 2014 Filing 350 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Kemper Corporate Services, Inc. served on 7/30/2014, answer due 8/20/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Receipt Certified Mail Receipt)(Dougherty, Eddie)
October 20, 2014 Filing 349 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. American Family Mutual Insurance Company served on 7/18/2014, answer due 8/8/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Additional Proof of Service)(Dougherty, Eddie)
October 20, 2014 Filing 348 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Zurich Insurance Group Ltd/FI served on 9/24/2014, answer due 10/15/2014. (Dougherty, Eddie)
October 20, 2014 Filing 347 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Travelers Companies Inc., The served on 9/4/2014, answer due 9/25/2014. (Dougherty, Eddie)
October 20, 2014 Filing 346 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. QBE Holdings, Inc. served on 8/26/2014, answer due 9/16/2014. (Dougherty, Eddie)
October 20, 2014 Filing 345 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Internation Insurance Society, Inc. served on 8/27/2014, answer due 9/17/2014. (Dougherty, Eddie)
October 20, 2014 Filing 344 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. First American Financial Corporation served on 8/29/2014, answer due 9/19/2014. (Dougherty, Eddie)
October 20, 2014 Filing 343 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Encompass Insurance Company of America served on 8/29/2014, answer due 9/19/2014. (Dougherty, Eddie)
October 20, 2014 Filing 342 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. American International Group, Inc. served on 8/21/2014, answer due 9/11/2014. (Dougherty, Eddie)
October 20, 2014 Filing 341 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Allianz of America, Inc. served on 8/25/2014, answer due 9/15/2014. (Dougherty, Eddie)
October 17, 2014 Filing 340 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Josue David Hernandez by Josue David Hernandez on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Josue David Hernandez added to party Louise Creager(pty:pla), Attorney Josue David Hernandez added to party Louise Creager(pty:pla), Attorney Josue David Hernandez added to party Mary Ann Geldreich(pty:pla), Attorney Josue David Hernandez added to party Mary Ann Geldreich(pty:pla), Attorney Josue David Hernandez added to party Dorothy Wood Hammer(pty:pla), Attorney Josue David Hernandez added to party Dorothy Wood Hammer(pty:pla), Attorney Josue David Hernandez added to party Mary Harrow(pty:pla), Attorney Josue David Hernandez added to party Mary Harrow(pty:pla), Attorney Josue David Hernandez added to party Sueham Kay Hoffman(pty:pla), Attorney Josue David Hernandez added to party Sueham Kay Hoffman(pty:pla), Attorney Josue David Hernandez added to party Sueham (I) Kay Hoffman(pty:pla), Attorney Josue David Hernandez added to party Sueham (I) Kay Hoffman(pty:pla), Attorney Josue David Hernandez added to party Janet Koch(pty:pla), Attorney Josue David Hernandez added to party Janet Koch(pty:pla), Attorney Josue David Hernandez added to party Gary Lemert(pty:pla), Attorney Josue David Hernandez added to party Gary Lemert(pty:pla), Attorney Josue David Hernandez added to party Martha Lemert(pty:pla), Attorney Josue David Hernandez added to party Martha Lemert(pty:pla), Attorney Josue David Hernandez added to party Tommy Meyer(pty:pla), Attorney Josue David Hernandez added to party Tommy Meyer(pty:pla), Attorney Josue David Hernandez added to party Jeffrey Ray(pty:pla), Attorney Josue David Hernandez added to party Jeffrey Ray(pty:pla), Attorney Josue David Hernandez added to party Jennifer Ray(pty:pla), Attorney Josue David Hernandez added to party Jennifer Ray(pty:pla), Attorney Josue David Hernandez added to party Ian Siemplenski(pty:pla), Attorney Josue David Hernandez added to party Ian Siemplenski(pty:pla), Attorney Josue David Hernandez added to party Dale Snyder(pty:pla), Attorney Josue David Hernandez added to party Dale Snyder(pty:pla), Attorney Josue David Hernandez added to party Marilyn Snyder(pty:pla), Attorney Josue David Hernandez added to party Marilyn Snyder(pty:pla), Attorney Josue David Hernandez added to party Catherine Taylor(pty:pla), Attorney Josue David Hernandez added to party Catherine Taylor(pty:pla), Attorney Josue David Hernandez added to party Laila (I) Saeda Urban(pty:pla), Attorney Josue David Hernandez added to party Laila (I) Saeda Urban(pty:pla), Attorney Josue David Hernandez added to party Laila Saeda Urban (pty:pla), Attorney Josue David Hernandez added to party Laila Saeda Urban (pty:pla), Attorney Josue David Hernandez added to party Nicole Wright-Meyer(pty:pla), Attorney Josue David Hernandez added to party Nicole Wright-Meyer(pty:pla), Attorney Josue David Hernandez added to party Kenneth Dale Yoder(pty:pla), Attorney Josue David Hernandez added to party Kenneth Dale Yoder(pty:pla) (Hernandez, Josue)
October 14, 2014 Filing 339 AMENDED COMPLAINT (Second) Class Action and Jury Demand [Adobe Version Footnotes Fortmatted Properly] against All Defendants, filed by Louise Creager, Mary Ann Geldreich, Mary Harrow, Sueham Kay Hoffman, Sueham (I) Kay Hoffman, Janet Koch, Gary Lemert, Martha Lemert, Tommy Meyer, Jeffrey Ray, Jennifer Ray, Ian Siemplenski, Dale Snyder, Marilyn Snyder, Catherine Taylor, Laila (I) Saeda Urban, Laila Saeda Urban, Nicole Wright-Meyer, Kenneth Dale Yoder.(Dougherty, Eddie)
October 13, 2014 Filing 338 WRONG PDF ATTACHED - REFILED CORRECTLY AT DOC. #339 - AMENDED COMPLAINT (Second Amended) against All Defendants, filed by Louise Creager, Mary Ann Geldreich, Dorothy Wood Hammer, Mary Harrow, Sueham Kay Hoffman, Sueham (I) Kay Hoffman, Janet Koch, Gary Lemert, Martha Lemert, Tommy Meyer, Jeffrey Ray, Jennifer Ray, Ian Siemplenski, Dale Snyder, Marilyn Snyder, Catherine Taylor, Laila (I) Saeda Urban, Nicole Wright-Meyer, Kenneth Dale Yoder.(Dougherty, Eddie) Modified on 10/14/2014 to add text that wrong pdf was attached and doc has been filed correctly (athom, ).
October 13, 2014 Filing 337 WRONG PDF ATTACHED - REFILED CORRECTLY AT DOC. #339 - AMENDED COMPLAINT Class Action and Jury Demand (Second) against All Defendants, filed by Louise Creager, Mary Ann Geldreich, Dorothy Wood Hammer, Mary Harrow, Sueham Kay Hoffman, Sueham (I) Kay Hoffman, Janet Koch, Gary Lemert, Martha Lemert, Tommy Meyer, Jeffrey Ray, Jennifer Ray, Ian Siemplenski, Dale Snyder, Marilyn Snyder, Catherine Taylor, Laila (I) Saeda Urban, Laila Saeda Urban, Nicole Wright-Meyer, Kenneth Dale Yoder.(Dougherty, Eddie) Modified on 10/14/2014 to add text that wrong pdf was attached and doc has been filed correctly (athom, ).
October 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 336 ORDER granting # 335 Agreed Motion to Enter Briefing Schedule by Judge John L. Kane on 10/02/14.(jhawk, )
October 1, 2014 Filing 335 Stipulated MOTION for Order to Enter Agreed Briefing Schedule by Plaintiffs Louise Creager, Mary Ann Geldreich, Dorothy Wood Hammer, Mary Harrow, Sueham Kay Hoffman, Sueham (I) Kay Hoffman, Janet Koch, Gary Lemert, Martha Lemert, Tommy Meyer, Jeffrey Ray, Jennifer Ray, Ian Siemplenski, Dale Snyder, Marilyn Snyder, Catherine Taylor, Laila (I) Saeda Urban, Laila Saeda Urban, Nicole Wright-Meyer, Kenneth Dale Yoder. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Dougherty, Eddie)
September 24, 2014 Filing 334 STATUS REPORT by Plaintiffs Louise Creager, Mary Ann Geldreich, Dorothy Wood Hammer, Mary Harrow, Sueham Kay Hoffman, Sueham (I) Kay Hoffman, Janet Koch, Gary Lemert, Martha Lemert, Tommy Meyer, Jeffrey Ray, Jennifer Ray, Ian Siemplenski, Dale Snyder, Marilyn Snyder, Catherine Taylor, Laila (I) Saeda Urban, Laila Saeda Urban, Nicole Wright-Meyer, Kenneth Dale Yoder. (Dougherty, Eddie)
September 19, 2014 Filing 333 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Knuckey, Ashlee)
September 17, 2014 Filing 332 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Michael Scott Campbell on behalf of Automobile Insurance Company of Hartford Connecticut, Standard Fire Insurance Company, Travelers Commercial Insurance Company, Travelers Companies Inc., The, Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, Travelers Indemnity Company of America, Travelers Insurance Company, TheAttorney Michael Scott Campbell added to party Automobile Insurance Company of Hartford Connecticut(pty:dft), Attorney Michael Scott Campbell added to party Automobile Insurance Company of Hartford Connecticut(pty:dft), Attorney Michael Scott Campbell added to party Standard Fire Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Michael Scott Campbell added to party Standard Fire Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Michael Scott Campbell added to party Travelers Commercial Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Michael Scott Campbell added to party Travelers Commercial Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Michael Scott Campbell added to party Travelers Companies Inc., The(pty:dft), Attorney Michael Scott Campbell added to party Travelers Companies Inc., The(pty:dft), Attorney Michael Scott Campbell added to party Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Michael Scott Campbell added to party Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Michael Scott Campbell added to party Travelers Indemnity Company of America(pty:dft), Attorney Michael Scott Campbell added to party Travelers Indemnity Company of America(pty:dft), Attorney Michael Scott Campbell added to party Travelers Insurance Company, The(pty:dft), Attorney Michael Scott Campbell added to party Travelers Insurance Company, The(pty:dft) (Campbell, Michael)
September 17, 2014 Filing 331 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Blume, Robert)
September 17, 2014 Filing 330 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Robert Charles Blume on behalf of Automobile Insurance Company of Hartford Connecticut, Standard Fire Insurance Company, Travelers Commercial Insurance Company, Travelers Companies Inc., The, Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, Travelers Indemnity Company of America, Travelers Insurance Company, TheAttorney Robert Charles Blume added to party Automobile Insurance Company of Hartford Connecticut(pty:dft), Attorney Robert Charles Blume added to party Automobile Insurance Company of Hartford Connecticut(pty:dft), Attorney Robert Charles Blume added to party Standard Fire Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Robert Charles Blume added to party Standard Fire Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Robert Charles Blume added to party Travelers Commercial Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Robert Charles Blume added to party Travelers Commercial Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Robert Charles Blume added to party Travelers Companies Inc., The(pty:dft), Attorney Robert Charles Blume added to party Travelers Companies Inc., The(pty:dft), Attorney Robert Charles Blume added to party Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Robert Charles Blume added to party Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Robert Charles Blume added to party Travelers Indemnity Company of America(pty:dft), Attorney Robert Charles Blume added to party Travelers Indemnity Company of America(pty:dft), Attorney Robert Charles Blume added to party Travelers Insurance Company, The(pty:dft), Attorney Robert Charles Blume added to party Travelers Insurance Company, The(pty:dft) (Blume, Robert)
September 17, 2014 Filing 329 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance and Request for Notices by Keara M. Gordon on behalf of American International Group, Inc.Attorney Keara M. Gordon added to party American International Group, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Keara M. Gordon added to party American International Group, Inc.(pty:dft) (Gordon, Keara)
September 16, 2014 Filing 328 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Ashlee Marie Knuckey on behalf of American Association of Insurance Services, Inc.Attorney Ashlee Marie Knuckey added to party American Association of Insurance Services, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Ashlee Marie Knuckey added to party American Association of Insurance Services, Inc.(pty:dft) (Knuckey, Ashlee)
September 16, 2014 Filing 327 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Rowe Winston Snider on behalf of American Association of Insurance Services, Inc.Attorney Rowe Winston Snider added to party American Association of Insurance Services, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Rowe Winston Snider added to party American Association of Insurance Services, Inc.(pty:dft) (Snider, Rowe)
September 16, 2014 Filing 326 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance and Request for Notices by Sara Z. Moghadam on behalf of American International Group, Inc.Attorney Sara Z. Moghadam added to party American International Group, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Sara Z. Moghadam added to party American International Group, Inc.(pty:dft) (Moghadam, Sara)
September 15, 2014 Filing 325 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Jones, William)
September 15, 2014 Filing 324 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by William Frederick Jones on behalf of American International Group, Inc.Attorney William Frederick Jones added to party American International Group, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney William Frederick Jones added to party American International Group, Inc.(pty:dft) (Jones, William)
September 15, 2014 Filing 323 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Eric B. Liebman on behalf of American International Group, Inc.Attorney Eric B. Liebman added to party American International Group, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Eric B. Liebman added to party American International Group, Inc.(pty:dft) (Liebman, Eric)
September 15, 2014 Filing 322 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Timothy Michael Swanson on behalf of American International Group, Inc.Attorney Timothy Michael Swanson added to party American International Group, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Timothy Michael Swanson added to party American International Group, Inc.(pty:dft) (Swanson, Timothy)
September 15, 2014 Filing 321 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Allstate Insurance Company for Encompass Insurance Company of America. (Anderson, Sheryl)
September 15, 2014 Filing 320 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by James Patrick Gaughan on behalf of Milbank Insurance Company, State Automobile Insurance CompanyAttorney James Patrick Gaughan added to party Milbank Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney James Patrick Gaughan added to party Milbank Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney James Patrick Gaughan added to party State Automobile Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney James Patrick Gaughan added to party State Automobile Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Gaughan, James)
September 15, 2014 Filing 319 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Richard L. Fenton by Richard L. Fenton on behalf of Encompass Insurance Company of AmericaAttorney Richard L. Fenton added to party Encompass Insurance Company of America(pty:dft), Attorney Richard L. Fenton added to party Encompass Insurance Company of America(pty:dft) (Fenton, Richard)
September 15, 2014 Filing 318 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Mark L. Hanover by Mark Lane Hanover on behalf of Encompass Insurance Company of AmericaAttorney Mark Lane Hanover added to party Encompass Insurance Company of America(pty:dft), Attorney Mark Lane Hanover added to party Encompass Insurance Company of America(pty:dft) (Hanover, Mark)
September 15, 2014 Filing 317 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Marilyn S. Chappell by Marilyn S. Chappell on behalf of Encompass Insurance Company of AmericaAttorney Marilyn S. Chappell added to party Encompass Insurance Company of America(pty:dft), Attorney Marilyn S. Chappell added to party Encompass Insurance Company of America(pty:dft) (Chappell, Marilyn)
September 15, 2014 Filing 316 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Sheryl L. Anderson by Sheryl Lynn Anderson on behalf of Encompass Insurance Company of AmericaAttorney Sheryl Lynn Anderson added to party Encompass Insurance Company of America(pty:dft), Attorney Sheryl Lynn Anderson added to party Encompass Insurance Company of America(pty:dft) (Anderson, Sheryl)
September 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 315 ORDER granting # 314 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Stephanie A. Montague terminated, by Judge John L. Kane on 9/12/14. Text Only Entry(jlksec)
September 12, 2014 Filing 314 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Stephanie A. Montague by Defendants Addison Insurance Company, American Indemnity Financial Corporation, Employers Mutual Casualty Company, Lafayette Insurance Company, Texas General Indemnity Company, United Fire & Casualty Company, United Fire Group, Inc., United Fire Insurance Company, United Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Gaddy, Stephanie)
September 12, 2014 Filing 313 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (McClung, Larry)
September 12, 2014 Filing 312 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Rachel Ollar Entrican on behalf of Pharmacists Mutual Insurance CompanyAttorney Rachel Ollar Entrican added to party Pharmacists Mutual Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Rachel Ollar Entrican added to party Pharmacists Mutual Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Entrican, Rachel)
September 12, 2014 Filing 311 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Kristin Anderson George on behalf of Pharmacists Mutual Insurance CompanyAttorney Kristin Anderson George added to party Pharmacists Mutual Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Kristin Anderson George added to party Pharmacists Mutual Insurance Company(pty:dft) (George, Kristin)
September 12, 2014 Filing 310 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Larry S. McClung on behalf of Pharmacists Mutual Insurance CompanyAttorney Larry S. McClung added to party Pharmacists Mutual Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Larry S. McClung added to party Pharmacists Mutual Insurance Company(pty:dft) (McClung, Larry)
September 8, 2014 Filing 309 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent QBE Insurance Group, Limited for National Farmers Union Property and Casualty Company, Praetorian Insurance Company, QBE Holdings, Inc., QBE Insurance Company. (Harrison, Kendall)
September 8, 2014 Filing 308 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Kendall W. Harrison on behalf of National Farmers Union Property and Casualty Company, Praetorian Insurance Company, QBE Holdings, Inc., QBE Insurance Company, QBE Insurance Group, LimitedAttorney Kendall W. Harrison added to party National Farmers Union Property and Casualty Company(pty:dft), Attorney Kendall W. Harrison added to party National Farmers Union Property and Casualty Company(pty:dft), Attorney Kendall W. Harrison added to party Praetorian Insurance Company (pty:dft), Attorney Kendall W. Harrison added to party Praetorian Insurance Company (pty:dft), Attorney Kendall W. Harrison added to party QBE Holdings, Inc. (pty:dft), Attorney Kendall W. Harrison added to party QBE Holdings, Inc. (pty:dft), Attorney Kendall W. Harrison added to party QBE Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Kendall W. Harrison added to party QBE Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Kendall W. Harrison added to party QBE Insurance Group, Limited(pty:dft), Attorney Kendall W. Harrison added to party QBE Insurance Group, Limited(pty:dft) (Harrison, Kendall)
September 8, 2014 Filing 307 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Allianz SE, Corporate Parent Allianz Europe B.V., Corporate Parent Allianz of America, Inc. for Allianz Life Insurance Co. of North America. (Cuervo, Raul)
September 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 306 ORDER finding as moot # 303 Motion for Joinder; finding as moot # 303 Motion for Extension of Time to File, by Judge John L. Kane on 9/8/14. Text Only Entry(jlksec )
September 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 305 ORDER finding as moot # 302 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond, by Judge John L. Kane on 9/8/14. Text Only Entry(jlksec)
September 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 304 MINUTE ORDER. In light of the representations in Plaintiffs' "Reply" (which is actually a Response) to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, the Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 223) is DENIED, but the entirety of the text of the Amended Complaint is STRICKEN. Leave will be granted for Plaintiffs to file a Second Amended Complaint, but in the interim, counsel are directed to CONFER, in as practicable a manner as possible, regarding the appointment of LIAISON COUNSEL for defendant insurers and/or the possibility of proceeding against one or more representative defendants rather than the bevy originally named. Plaintiffs SHALL FILE a Status Report regarding the state of their efforts on or before September 24, 2014. Any party believing a Status Conference before Judge Kane -- or an Early Neutral Evaluation before a Magistrate Judge -- would be helpful should communicate the same to Plaintiffs before September 22, or file a separate Motion saying so. by Judge John L. Kane on 9/8/14. Text Only Entry (jlksec)
September 8, 2014 Filing 303 MOTION for Joinder re # 302 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re # 18 Amended Complaint, , MOTION for Extension of Time to by Defendants USAACasualty Insurance Company, United Services Automobile Association. (Scott, Jessica)
September 8, 2014 Filing 302 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re # 18 Amended Complaint, by Defendants Acord Corporation, Addison Insurance Company, All American Insurance Company, Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company, Allianz Life Insurance Co. of North America, Allianz of America, Inc., Allstate Insurance Company, American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida, American Family Home Insurance Company, American Family Mutual Insurance Company, American International Group, Inc., American Modern Home Insurance Company, American Modern Insurance Group, Inc., American Modern Select Insurance Company, American Reliable Insurance Company, Auto-Owners Insurance Company, Buckeye State Mutual Insurance Company, The, Casualty Actuarial Society, Central Mutual Insurance Company, Chubb Corporation, The, Chubb National Insurance Company, Chubb Services Corporation, Cincinnati Insurance Company, Colorado Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Co., Country Mutual Insurance Company, Electric Insurance Company, Farmers Alliance Mutual Insurance Company, Farmers Insurance Company, Federal Insurance Company, Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland, Fireman's Fund Insurance Company, First American Financial Corporation, First American Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Grange Insurance Association, Great Northern Insurance Company, Guideone Mutual Insurance Company, Hartford Accident and Indemnity Company, Hartford Financial Services Group, The, Hartford Fire Insurance Company, Insurance Services Office, Inc., Kemper Corporate Services, Inc., Kemper Corporation, LM Insurance Corporation, Lafayette Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Insurance, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Markel American Insurance Company, Markel Insurance Company, McKinsey & Company, Inc., McKinsey & Company, Inc., MetLife Auto & Home Insurance Agency, Inc., Metropolitan Direct Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Metropolitan Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Milbank Insurance Company, Nationwide Affinity Insurance Company of America, Nationwide Insurance Company of America, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Pacific Indemnity Company, Pharmacists Mutual Insurance Company, Property Casualty Insurers Association of America, QBE Holdings, Inc., QBE Insurance Company, QBE Insurance Group, Limited, Safeco Insurance Company of America, Secura Insurance Holdings, Inc., Standard Fire Insurance Company, State Automobile Insurance Company, State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, Texas General Indemnity Company, Travelers Commercial Insurance Company, Travelers Companies Inc., The, Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, Travelers Indemnity Company of America, Travelers Insurance Company, The, Travelers Insurance Group Holdings, Inc., United Fire & Casualty Company, United Fire Group, Inc., United Fire Insurance Company, United Fire Lloyds, United Fire and Indemnity Company, United Life Insurance Company, Unitrin Auto and Home Insurance Company, Unitrin Direct Property & Casualty Company, Verisk Analytics, Inc., Vigilant Insurance Company, Zurich American Insurance Company, Zurich Insurance Group Ltd/FI, Consol Defendant United Fire & Indemnity Company. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Theodore, Jeffrey)
September 8, 2014 Filing 301 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Paul Gregory Karlsgodt on behalf of California Casualty Indemnity Exchange, TheAttorney Paul Gregory Karlsgodt added to party California Casualty Indemnity Exchange, The(pty:dft), Attorney Paul Gregory Karlsgodt added to party California Casualty Indemnity Exchange, The(pty:dft) (Karlsgodt, Paul)
September 8, 2014 Filing 300 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Collignon, Casie)
September 8, 2014 Filing 299 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Casie D. Collignon on behalf of California Casualty Indemnity Exchange, TheAttorney Casie D. Collignon added to party California Casualty Indemnity Exchange, The(pty:dft), Attorney Casie D. Collignon added to party California Casualty Indemnity Exchange, The(pty:dft) (Collignon, Casie)
September 5, 2014 Filing 298 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Central Mutual Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Central Mutual Insurance Company for Central Mutual Insurance Company. (Morse, Stuart)
September 5, 2014 Filing 297 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance Central Mutual Insurance Company by Stuart Douglas Morse on behalf of Central Mutual Insurance CompanyAttorney Stuart Douglas Morse added to party Central Mutual Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Stuart Douglas Morse added to party Central Mutual Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Morse, Stuart)
September 5, 2014 Filing 296 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Gregory, Alan)
September 5, 2014 Filing 295 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Alan Peter Gregory on behalf of Acuity, A Mutual Insurance CompanyAttorney Alan Peter Gregory added to party Acuity, A Mutual Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Alan Peter Gregory added to party Acuity, A Mutual Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Gregory, Alan)
September 4, 2014 Filing 294 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by John David Mereness on behalf of Auto-Owners Insurance Company, Owners Insurance CompanyAttorney John David Mereness added to party Auto-Owners Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney John David Mereness added to party Auto-Owners Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney John David Mereness added to party Owners Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney John David Mereness added to party Owners Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Mereness, John)
September 4, 2014 Filing 293 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Gregory R. Giometti on behalf of Auto-Owners Insurance Company, Owners Insurance CompanyAttorney Gregory R. Giometti added to party Auto-Owners Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Gregory R. Giometti added to party Auto-Owners Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Gregory R. Giometti added to party Owners Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Gregory R. Giometti added to party Owners Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Giometti, Gregory)
September 4, 2014 Filing 292 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Raul A. Cuervo on behalf of Allianz Life Insurance Co. of North AmericaAttorney Raul A. Cuervo added to party Allianz Life Insurance Co. of North America(pty:dft), Attorney Raul A. Cuervo added to party Allianz Life Insurance Co. of North America(pty:dft) (Cuervo, Raul)
September 4, 2014 Filing 291 REPLY to Response to # 223 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 8 filed by Plaintiffs Louise Creager, Mary Ann Geldreich, Dorothy Wood Hammer, Mary Harrow, Sueham Kay Hoffman, Sueham (I) Kay Hoffman, Janet Koch, Gary Lemert, Martha Lemert, Tommy Meyer, Jeffrey Ray, Jennifer Ray, Ian Siemplenski, Dale Snyder, Marilyn Snyder, Catherine Taylor, Laila (I) Saeda Urban, Laila Saeda Urban, Nicole Wright-Meyer, Kenneth Dale Yoder. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 (General Form - Complaint), # 2 Exhibit 2 (Luciano Complaint))(Dougherty, Eddie)
September 3, 2014 Filing 290 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company for National Casualty Company. (Ingebretsen, Stephen)
September 3, 2014 Filing 289 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Ingebretsen, Stephen)
September 3, 2014 Filing 288 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company for Nationwide Insurance Company of America. (Ingebretsen, Stephen)
September 3, 2014 Filing 287 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company for Nationwide Affinity Insurance Company of America. (Ingebretsen, Stephen)
September 3, 2014 Filing 286 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Stephen Kirk Ingebretsen on behalf of National Casualty Company, Nationwide Affinity Insurance Company of America, Nationwide Insurance Company of America, Nationwide Mutual Insurance CompanyAttorney Stephen Kirk Ingebretsen added to party National Casualty Company(pty:dft), Attorney Stephen Kirk Ingebretsen added to party National Casualty Company(pty:dft), Attorney Stephen Kirk Ingebretsen added to party Nationwide Affinity Insurance Company of America(pty:dft), Attorney Stephen Kirk Ingebretsen added to party Nationwide Affinity Insurance Company of America(pty:dft), Attorney Stephen Kirk Ingebretsen added to party Nationwide Insurance Company of America(pty:dft), Attorney Stephen Kirk Ingebretsen added to party Nationwide Insurance Company of America(pty:dft), Attorney Stephen Kirk Ingebretsen added to party Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Stephen Kirk Ingebretsen added to party Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Ingebretsen, Stephen)
September 3, 2014 Filing 285 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Ingebretsen, Stephen)
September 3, 2014 Filing 284 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Stephen Kirk Ingebretsen on behalf of Property Casualty Insurers Association of AmericaAttorney Stephen Kirk Ingebretsen added to party Property Casualty Insurers Association of America(pty:dft), Attorney Stephen Kirk Ingebretsen added to party Property Casualty Insurers Association of America(pty:dft) (Ingebretsen, Stephen)
August 29, 2014 Filing 283 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Auto-Owners Insurance Company for Owners Insurance Company. (McAllister, Lori)
August 29, 2014 Filing 282 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Lori McAllister on behalf of Auto-Owners Insurance Company, Owners Insurance CompanyAttorney Lori McAllister added to party Auto-Owners Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Lori McAllister added to party Auto-Owners Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Lori McAllister added to party Owners Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Lori McAllister added to party Owners Insurance Company(pty:dft) (McAllister, Lori)
August 27, 2014 Filing 281 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Allstate Insurance Company for Encompass Indemnity Company. (Anderson, Sheryl)
August 27, 2014 Filing 280 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Marilyn S. Chappell on behalf of Encompass Indemnity CompanyAttorney Marilyn S. Chappell added to party Encompass Indemnity Company(pty:dft), Attorney Marilyn S. Chappell added to party Encompass Indemnity Company(pty:dft) (Chappell, Marilyn)
August 27, 2014 Filing 279 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Sheryl Lynn Anderson on behalf of Encompass Indemnity CompanyAttorney Sheryl Lynn Anderson added to party Encompass Indemnity Company(pty:dft), Attorney Sheryl Lynn Anderson added to party Encompass Indemnity Company(pty:dft) (Anderson, Sheryl)
August 27, 2014 Filing 278 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Mark Lane Hanover on behalf of Encompass Indemnity CompanyAttorney Mark Lane Hanover added to party Encompass Indemnity Company(pty:dft), Attorney Mark Lane Hanover added to party Encompass Indemnity Company(pty:dft) (Hanover, Mark)
August 27, 2014 Filing 277 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (athom, )
August 27, 2014 Filing 276 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Richard L. Fenton on behalf of Encompass Indemnity CompanyAttorney Richard L. Fenton added to party Encompass Indemnity Company(pty:dft), Attorney Richard L. Fenton added to party Encompass Indemnity Company(pty:dft) (Fenton, Richard)
August 27, 2014 Filing 275 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance Robertson and Ash LLC by Christopher C. Ash on behalf of McKinsey & Company, Inc.(a New York corporation), McKinsey & Company, Inc.(a Delware corporation)Attorney Christopher C. Ash added to party McKinsey & Company, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher C. Ash added to party McKinsey & Company, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher C. Ash added to party McKinsey & Company, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher C. Ash added to party McKinsey & Company, Inc.(pty:dft) (Ash, Christopher)
August 27, 2014 Filing 274 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Encompass Insurance Company of America by Plaintiffs Louise Creager, Mary Ann Geldreich, Dorothy Wood Hammer, Mary Harrow, Sueham Kay Hoffman, Sueham (I) Kay Hoffman, Janet Koch, Gary Lemert, Martha Lemert, Tommy Meyer, Jeffrey Ray, Jennifer Ray, Ian Siemplenski, Dale Snyder, Marilyn Snyder, Catherine Taylor, Laila (I) Saeda Urban, Laila Saeda Urban, Nicole Wright-Meyer, Kenneth Dale Yoder. (Dougherty, Eddie)
August 26, 2014 Filing 273 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Snyder, Bradley)
August 25, 2014 Filing 272 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Stillwater Insurance Company for Stillwater Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Stone, Lawrence)
August 25, 2014 Filing 271 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Lawrence Daniel Stone on behalf of Stillwater Property and Casualty Insurance CompanyAttorney Lawrence Daniel Stone added to party Stillwater Property and Casualty Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Lawrence Daniel Stone added to party Stillwater Property and Casualty Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Stone, Lawrence)
August 25, 2014 Filing 270 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jeffrey Michael Theodore on behalf of Acord Corporation (Theodore, Jeffrey)
August 25, 2014 Filing 269 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Bradley Lewis Snyder on behalf of Buckeye State Mutual Insurance Company, TheAttorney Bradley Lewis Snyder added to party Buckeye State Mutual Insurance Company, The(pty:dft), Attorney Bradley Lewis Snyder added to party Buckeye State Mutual Insurance Company, The(pty:dft) (Snyder, Bradley)
August 23, 2014 Filing 268 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. McKinsey & Company, Inc.(a New York corporation) served on 8/13/2014, answer due 9/15/2014. (Dougherty, Eddie)
August 23, 2014 Filing 267 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. (Dougherty, Eddie)
August 23, 2014 Filing 266 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Travelers Insurance Company, The served on 7/16/2014, answer due 9/15/2014. (Dougherty, Eddie)
August 23, 2014 Filing 265 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proof of Mailing)(Dougherty, Eddie)
August 23, 2014 Filing 264 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. (Dougherty, Eddie)
August 22, 2014 Filing 263 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. (Dougherty, Eddie)
August 22, 2014 Filing 262 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. United Fire and Indemnity Company served on 7/16/2014, answer due 9/15/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Second Copy Delivered)(Dougherty, Eddie)
August 22, 2014 Filing 261 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Lafayette Insurance Company served on 8/4/2014, answer due 9/15/2014. (Dougherty, Eddie)
August 22, 2014 Filing 260 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Hartford Fire Insurance Company served on 7/16/2014, answer due 9/15/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Second Copy Delivered)(Dougherty, Eddie)
August 22, 2014 Filing 259 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Terence M. Ridley on behalf of American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida, American Reliable Insurance CompanyAttorney Terence M. Ridley added to party American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida(pty:dft), Attorney Terence M. Ridley added to party American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida(pty:dft), Attorney Terence M. Ridley added to party American Reliable Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Terence M. Ridley added to party American Reliable Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Ridley, Terence)
August 22, 2014 Filing 258 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Zurich American Insurance Company served on 7/16/2014, answer due 9/15/2014. (Dougherty, Eddie)
August 22, 2014 Filing 257 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. United Life Insurance Company served on 8/4/2014, answer due 9/15/2014. (Dougherty, Eddie)
August 22, 2014 Filing 256 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. United Fire Group, Inc. served on 8/4/2014, answer due 9/15/2014. (Dougherty, Eddie)
August 22, 2014 Filing 255 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. United Fire & Casualty Company served on 7/23/2014, answer due 9/15/2014. (Dougherty, Eddie)
August 22, 2014 Filing 254 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Chubb Corporation, The served on 8/7/2014, answer due 9/15/2014. (Dougherty, Eddie)
August 22, 2014 Filing 253 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Standard Fire Insurance Company served on 7/16/2014, answer due 9/15/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Second Copy Delivered)(Dougherty, Eddie)
August 22, 2014 Filing 252 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Sentry Insurance, A Mutual Company served on 7/16/2014, answer due 9/15/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Second Copy Delivered)(Dougherty, Eddie)
August 22, 2014 Filing 251 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Safeco Insurance Company of America served on 7/30/2014, answer due 9/15/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Copy Mailed, # 2 Exhibit Proof of Mailing)(Dougherty, Eddie)
August 22, 2014 Filing 250 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Nationwide Insurance Company of America served on 7/16/2014, answer due 9/15/2014. (Dougherty, Eddie)
August 22, 2014 Filing 249 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Nationwide Affinity Insurance Company of America served on 7/16/2014, answer due 9/15/2014. (Dougherty, Eddie)
August 22, 2014 Filing 248 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. National Surety Corporation served on 7/30/2014, answer due 9/15/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Copy Mailed, # 2 Exhibit Proof of Mailing)(Dougherty, Eddie)
August 22, 2014 Filing 247 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Munich-American Holding Corporation served on 8/5/2014, answer due 9/15/2014. (Dougherty, Eddie)
August 22, 2014 Filing 246 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Metropolitan Life Insurance Company served on 7/18/2014, answer due 9/15/2014. (Dougherty, Eddie)
August 22, 2014 Filing 245 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. McKinsey & Company, Inc.(a Delware corporation) served on 7/16/2014, answer due 9/15/2014. (Dougherty, Eddie)
August 22, 2014 Filing 244 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland served on 7/16/2014, answer due 9/15/2014. (Dougherty, Eddie)
August 22, 2014 Filing 243 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Associated Indemnity Corporation served on 8/1/2014, answer due 9/15/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proof of Mailing)(Dougherty, Eddie)
August 22, 2014 Filing 242 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. American Indemnity Financial Corporation served on 8/13/2014, answer due 9/15/2014. (Dougherty, Eddie)
August 22, 2014 Filing 241 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Addison Insurance Company served on 8/4/2014, answer due 9/15/2014. (Dougherty, Eddie)
August 22, 2014 Filing 240 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Acord Corporation served on 7/16/2014, answer due 9/15/2014. (Dougherty, Eddie)
August 22, 2014 Filing 239 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Erin Frances Frohardt on behalf of American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida, American Reliable Insurance CompanyAttorney Erin Frances Frohardt added to party American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida(pty:dft), Attorney Erin Frances Frohardt added to party American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida(pty:dft), Attorney Erin Frances Frohardt added to party American Reliable Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Erin Frances Frohardt added to party American Reliable Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Frohardt, Erin)
August 22, 2014 Filing 238 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Evan Bennett Stephenson on behalf of American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida, American Reliable Insurance CompanyAttorney Evan Bennett Stephenson added to party American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida(pty:dft), Attorney Evan Bennett Stephenson added to party American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida(pty:dft), Attorney Evan Bennett Stephenson added to party American Reliable Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Evan Bennett Stephenson added to party American Reliable Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Stephenson, Evan)
August 21, 2014 Filing 237 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Jeffrey M. Theodore as Co-Counsel by Frank W. Visciano on behalf of Acord Corporation (Visciano, Frank)
August 21, 2014 Filing 236 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Mark F. Horning as Co-Counsel by Frank W. Visciano on behalf of Acord Corporation (Visciano, Frank)
August 21, 2014 Filing 235 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Stephanie N. Gaddy by Stephanie Natsuko Gaddy on behalf of Addison Insurance Company, American Family Home Insurance Company, American Indemnity Financial Corporation, Employers Mutual Casualty Company, Lafayette Insurance Company, Texas General Indemnity Company, United Fire & Casualty Company, United Fire Group, Inc., United Fire Insurance Company, United Life Insurance CompanyAttorney Stephanie Natsuko Gaddy added to party Addison Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Stephanie Natsuko Gaddy added to party Addison Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Stephanie Natsuko Gaddy added to party American Family Home Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Stephanie Natsuko Gaddy added to party American Family Home Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Stephanie Natsuko Gaddy added to party American Indemnity Financial Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Stephanie Natsuko Gaddy added to party American Indemnity Financial Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Stephanie Natsuko Gaddy added to party Employers Mutual Casualty Company(pty:dft), Attorney Stephanie Natsuko Gaddy added to party Employers Mutual Casualty Company(pty:dft), Attorney Stephanie Natsuko Gaddy added to party Lafayette Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Stephanie Natsuko Gaddy added to party Lafayette Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Stephanie Natsuko Gaddy added to party Texas General Indemnity Company(pty:dft), Attorney Stephanie Natsuko Gaddy added to party Texas General Indemnity Company(pty:dft), Attorney Stephanie Natsuko Gaddy added to party United Fire & Casualty Company(pty:dft), Attorney Stephanie Natsuko Gaddy added to party United Fire & Casualty Company(pty:dft), Attorney Stephanie Natsuko Gaddy added to party United Fire Group, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Stephanie Natsuko Gaddy added to party United Fire Group, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Stephanie Natsuko Gaddy added to party United Fire Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Stephanie Natsuko Gaddy added to party United Fire Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Stephanie Natsuko Gaddy added to party United Life Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Stephanie Natsuko Gaddy added to party United Life Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Gaddy, Stephanie)
August 21, 2014 Filing 234 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance Snyder v. Acord by Stephanie A. Montague on behalf of Addison Insurance Company, American Indemnity Financial Corporation, Employers Mutual Casualty Company, Lafayette Insurance Company, Texas General Indemnity Company, United Fire & Casualty Company, United Fire Group, Inc., United Fire Insurance Company, United Life Insurance CompanyAttorney Stephanie A. Montague added to party Addison Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Stephanie A. Montague added to party Addison Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Stephanie A. Montague added to party American Indemnity Financial Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Stephanie A. Montague added to party American Indemnity Financial Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Stephanie A. Montague added to party Employers Mutual Casualty Company(pty:dft), Attorney Stephanie A. Montague added to party Employers Mutual Casualty Company(pty:dft), Attorney Stephanie A. Montague added to party Lafayette Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Stephanie A. Montague added to party Lafayette Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Stephanie A. Montague added to party Texas General Indemnity Company(pty:dft), Attorney Stephanie A. Montague added to party Texas General Indemnity Company(pty:dft), Attorney Stephanie A. Montague added to party United Fire & Casualty Company(pty:dft), Attorney Stephanie A. Montague added to party United Fire & Casualty Company(pty:dft), Attorney Stephanie A. Montague added to party United Fire Group, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Stephanie A. Montague added to party United Fire Group, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Stephanie A. Montague added to party United Fire Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Stephanie A. Montague added to party United Fire Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Stephanie A. Montague added to party United Life Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Stephanie A. Montague added to party United Life Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Montague, Stephanie)
August 21, 2014 Filing 233 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance Jerad West by Jerad A. West on behalf of American Indemnity Financial CorporationAttorney Jerad A. West added to party American Indemnity Financial Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Jerad A. West added to party American Indemnity Financial Corporation(pty:dft) (West, Jerad)
August 21, 2014 Filing 232 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of L. Kathleen Chaney by Lelia Kathleen Chaney on behalf of American Indemnity Financial CorporationAttorney Lelia Kathleen Chaney added to party American Indemnity Financial Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Lelia Kathleen Chaney added to party American Indemnity Financial Corporation(pty:dft) (Chaney, Lelia)
August 20, 2014 Filing 231 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent American Bankers Insurance Group, Inc. for American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida, American Reliable Insurance Company. (Pitblado, John)
August 20, 2014 Filing 230 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by John C. Pitblado on behalf of American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida, American Reliable Insurance CompanyAttorney John C. Pitblado added to party American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida(pty:dft), Attorney John C. Pitblado added to party American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida(pty:dft), Attorney John C. Pitblado added to party American Reliable Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney John C. Pitblado added to party American Reliable Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Pitblado, John)
August 20, 2014 Filing 229 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Robert David Helfand on behalf of American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida, American Reliable Insurance CompanyAttorney Robert David Helfand added to party American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida(pty:dft), Attorney Robert David Helfand added to party American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida(pty:dft), Attorney Robert David Helfand added to party American Reliable Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Robert David Helfand added to party American Reliable Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Helfand, Robert)
August 20, 2014 Filing 228 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Daniel M. Reilly on behalf of Insurance Services Office, Inc., Verisk Analytics, Inc.Attorney Daniel M. Reilly added to party Insurance Services Office, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel M. Reilly added to party Insurance Services Office, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel M. Reilly added to party Verisk Analytics, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel M. Reilly added to party Verisk Analytics, Inc.(pty:dft) (Reilly, Daniel)
August 20, 2014 Filing 227 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jason M. Lynch on behalf of Insurance Services Office, Inc., Verisk Analytics, Inc.Attorney Jason M. Lynch added to party Insurance Services Office, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Jason M. Lynch added to party Insurance Services Office, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Jason M. Lynch added to party Verisk Analytics, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Jason M. Lynch added to party Verisk Analytics, Inc.(pty:dft) (Lynch, Jason)
August 20, 2014 Filing 226 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Markel Corporation for Markel Insurance Company. (Spohn, Matthew)
August 20, 2014 Filing 225 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Markel Corporation for Markel American Insurance Company. (Spohn, Matthew)
August 20, 2014 Filing 224 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Matthew David Spohn on behalf of Markel American Insurance Company, Markel Insurance CompanyAttorney Matthew David Spohn added to party Markel American Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew David Spohn added to party Markel American Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew David Spohn added to party Markel Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew David Spohn added to party Markel Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Spohn, Matthew)
August 19, 2014 Filing 223 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 8 by Defendants USAACasualty Insurance Company, United Services Automobile Association. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Scott, Jessica)
August 19, 2014 Filing 222 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Ben Alexander Barnes on behalf of Insurance Services Office, Inc., Verisk Analytics, Inc.Attorney Ben Alexander Barnes added to party Insurance Services Office, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Ben Alexander Barnes added to party Insurance Services Office, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Ben Alexander Barnes added to party Verisk Analytics, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Ben Alexander Barnes added to party Verisk Analytics, Inc.(pty:dft) (Barnes, Ben)
August 19, 2014 Filing 221 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Verisk Analytics, Inc. for Insurance Services Office, Inc.. (Bayer, Mark)
August 19, 2014 Filing 220 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Mark William Bayer on behalf of Insurance Services Office, Inc., Verisk Analytics, Inc.Attorney Mark William Bayer added to party Insurance Services Office, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Mark William Bayer added to party Insurance Services Office, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Mark William Bayer added to party Verisk Analytics, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Mark William Bayer added to party Verisk Analytics, Inc.(pty:dft) (Bayer, Mark)
August 19, 2014 Filing 219 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent LMHC Massachusetts Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Group, Inc., Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Agency Corporation, Corporate Parent Liberty Insurance Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Holding Company, Inc., Corporate Parent Safeco Corporation for Safeco Insurance Company of America. (Collignon, Casie)
August 19, 2014 Filing 218 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent LMHC Massachusetts Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Group Inc., Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Holding Company, Inc. for LM Insurance Corporation. (Collignon, Casie)
August 18, 2014 Filing 217 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Kemper Corporation, Corporate Parent Trinity Universal Insurance Company for Unitrin Auto and Home Insurance Company. (Collignon, Casie)
August 18, 2014 Filing 216 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Collignon, Casie)
August 18, 2014 Filing 215 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Kemper Corporation for Kemper Corporate Services, Inc.. (Collignon, Casie)
August 18, 2014 Filing 214 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Munich Reinsurance Company for Munich-American Holding Corporation. (Collignon, Casie)
August 18, 2014 Filing 213 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Munich Reinsurance Company, Corporate Parent American Modern Insurance Group, Inc., Corporate Parent Midland-Guardian Co., Corporate Parent The Midland Company, Corporate Parent Munich American Holding Corp, Corporate Parent American Modern Home Insurance Company for American Modern Select Insurance Company. (Collignon, Casie)
August 18, 2014 Filing 212 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Munich Reinsurance Company, Corporate Parent Midland-Guardian Co., Corporate Parent The Midland Company, Corporate Parent Munich American Holding Corp for American Modern Insurance Group, Inc.. (Collignon, Casie)
August 18, 2014 Filing 211 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jacqueline K. Matthews on behalf of LM Insurance Corporation, Safeco Insurance Company of AmericaAttorney Jacqueline K. Matthews added to party LM Insurance Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Jacqueline K. Matthews added to party LM Insurance Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Jacqueline K. Matthews added to party Safeco Insurance Company of America(pty:dft), Attorney Jacqueline K. Matthews added to party Safeco Insurance Company of America(pty:dft) (Matthews, Jacqueline)
August 18, 2014 Filing 210 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Matthew Courtney Baisley on behalf of LM Insurance Corporation, Safeco Insurance Company of AmericaAttorney Matthew Courtney Baisley added to party LM Insurance Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew Courtney Baisley added to party LM Insurance Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew Courtney Baisley added to party Safeco Insurance Company of America(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew Courtney Baisley added to party Safeco Insurance Company of America(pty:dft) (Baisley, Matthew)
August 18, 2014 Filing 209 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Rand Lawrence McClellan on behalf of American Modern Insurance Group, Inc., American Modern Select Insurance Company, Kemper Corporate Services, Inc., Kemper Corporation, Munich-American Holding Corporation, Unitrin Auto and Home Insurance CompanyAttorney Rand Lawrence McClellan added to party American Modern Insurance Group, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Rand Lawrence McClellan added to party American Modern Insurance Group, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Rand Lawrence McClellan added to party American Modern Select Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Rand Lawrence McClellan added to party American Modern Select Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Rand Lawrence McClellan added to party Kemper Corporate Services, Inc. (pty:dft), Attorney Rand Lawrence McClellan added to party Kemper Corporate Services, Inc. (pty:dft), Attorney Rand Lawrence McClellan added to party Kemper Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Rand Lawrence McClellan added to party Kemper Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Rand Lawrence McClellan added to party Munich-American Holding Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Rand Lawrence McClellan added to party Munich-American Holding Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Rand Lawrence McClellan added to party Unitrin Auto and Home Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Rand Lawrence McClellan added to party Unitrin Auto and Home Insurance Company(pty:dft) (McClellan, Rand)
August 18, 2014 Filing 208 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Mark Alan Johnson on behalf of American Modern Insurance Group, Inc., American Modern Select Insurance Company, Kemper Corporate Services, Inc., Kemper Corporation, Munich-American Holding Corporation, Unitrin Auto and Home Insurance CompanyAttorney Mark Alan Johnson added to party American Modern Insurance Group, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Mark Alan Johnson added to party American Modern Insurance Group, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Mark Alan Johnson added to party American Modern Select Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Mark Alan Johnson added to party American Modern Select Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Mark Alan Johnson added to party Kemper Corporate Services, Inc. (pty:dft), Attorney Mark Alan Johnson added to party Kemper Corporate Services, Inc. (pty:dft), Attorney Mark Alan Johnson added to party Kemper Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Mark Alan Johnson added to party Kemper Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Mark Alan Johnson added to party Munich-American Holding Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Mark Alan Johnson added to party Munich-American Holding Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Mark Alan Johnson added to party Unitrin Auto and Home Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Mark Alan Johnson added to party Unitrin Auto and Home Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Johnson, Mark)
August 18, 2014 Filing 207 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Paul Gregory Karlsgodt on behalf of American Modern Insurance Group, Inc., American Modern Select Insurance Company, Kemper Corporate Services, Inc., Kemper Corporation, Munich-American Holding Corporation, Unitrin Auto and Home Insurance CompanyAttorney Paul Gregory Karlsgodt added to party American Modern Insurance Group, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Paul Gregory Karlsgodt added to party American Modern Insurance Group, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Paul Gregory Karlsgodt added to party American Modern Select Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Paul Gregory Karlsgodt added to party American Modern Select Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Paul Gregory Karlsgodt added to party Kemper Corporate Services, Inc. (pty:dft), Attorney Paul Gregory Karlsgodt added to party Kemper Corporate Services, Inc. (pty:dft), Attorney Paul Gregory Karlsgodt added to party Kemper Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Paul Gregory Karlsgodt added to party Kemper Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Paul Gregory Karlsgodt added to party Munich-American Holding Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Paul Gregory Karlsgodt added to party Munich-American Holding Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Paul Gregory Karlsgodt added to party Unitrin Auto and Home Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Paul Gregory Karlsgodt added to party Unitrin Auto and Home Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Karlsgodt, Paul)
August 18, 2014 Filing 206 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Rodger L. Eckelberry on behalf of American Modern Insurance Group, Inc., American Modern Select Insurance Company, Kemper Corporate Services, Inc., Kemper Corporation, LM Insurance Corporation, Munich-American Holding Corporation, Safeco Insurance Company of America, Unitrin Auto and Home Insurance CompanyAttorney Rodger L. Eckelberry added to party American Modern Insurance Group, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Rodger L. Eckelberry added to party American Modern Insurance Group, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Rodger L. Eckelberry added to party American Modern Select Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Rodger L. Eckelberry added to party American Modern Select Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Rodger L. Eckelberry added to party Kemper Corporate Services, Inc. (pty:dft), Attorney Rodger L. Eckelberry added to party Kemper Corporate Services, Inc. (pty:dft), Attorney Rodger L. Eckelberry added to party Kemper Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Rodger L. Eckelberry added to party Kemper Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Rodger L. Eckelberry added to party LM Insurance Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Rodger L. Eckelberry added to party LM Insurance Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Rodger L. Eckelberry added to party Munich-American Holding Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Rodger L. Eckelberry added to party Munich-American Holding Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Rodger L. Eckelberry added to party Safeco Insurance Company of America(pty:dft), Attorney Rodger L. Eckelberry added to party Safeco Insurance Company of America(pty:dft), Attorney Rodger L. Eckelberry added to party Unitrin Auto and Home Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Rodger L. Eckelberry added to party Unitrin Auto and Home Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Eckelberry, Rodger)
August 18, 2014 Filing 205 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Casie D. Collignon on behalf of American Modern Insurance Group, Inc., American Modern Select Insurance Company, Kemper Corporate Services, Inc., Kemper Corporation, LM Insurance Corporation, Munich-American Holding Corporation, Safeco Insurance Company of America, Unitrin Auto and Home Insurance CompanyAttorney Casie D. Collignon added to party American Modern Insurance Group, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Casie D. Collignon added to party American Modern Insurance Group, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Casie D. Collignon added to party American Modern Select Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Casie D. Collignon added to party American Modern Select Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Casie D. Collignon added to party Kemper Corporate Services, Inc. (pty:dft), Attorney Casie D. Collignon added to party Kemper Corporate Services, Inc. (pty:dft), Attorney Casie D. Collignon added to party Kemper Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Casie D. Collignon added to party Kemper Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Casie D. Collignon added to party LM Insurance Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Casie D. Collignon added to party LM Insurance Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Casie D. Collignon added to party Munich-American Holding Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Casie D. Collignon added to party Munich-American Holding Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Casie D. Collignon added to party Safeco Insurance Company of America(pty:dft), Attorney Casie D. Collignon added to party Safeco Insurance Company of America(pty:dft), Attorney Casie D. Collignon added to party Unitrin Auto and Home Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Casie D. Collignon added to party Unitrin Auto and Home Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Collignon, Casie)
August 18, 2014 Filing 204 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jacqueline C. Melmed on behalf of Hartford Accident and Indemnity Company, Hartford Financial Services Group, The, Hartford Fire Insurance CompanyAttorney Jacqueline C. Melmed added to party Hartford Accident and Indemnity Company(pty:dft), Attorney Jacqueline C. Melmed added to party Hartford Accident and Indemnity Company(pty:dft), Attorney Jacqueline C. Melmed added to party Hartford Financial Services Group, The(pty:dft), Attorney Jacqueline C. Melmed added to party Hartford Financial Services Group, The(pty:dft), Attorney Jacqueline C. Melmed added to party Hartford Fire Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Jacqueline C. Melmed added to party Hartford Fire Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Melmed, Jacqueline)
August 15, 2014 Filing 203 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Morse, Stuart)
August 15, 2014 Filing 202 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Stuart Douglas Morse on behalf of Grange Insurance AssociationAttorney Stuart Douglas Morse added to party Grange Insurance Association(pty:dft), Attorney Stuart Douglas Morse added to party Grange Insurance Association(pty:dft) (Morse, Stuart)
August 14, 2014 Filing 201 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jerad A. West on behalf of Addison Insurance Company, Employers Mutual Casualty Company, Lafayette Insurance Company, Texas General Indemnity Company, United Fire & Casualty Company, United Fire Group, Inc., United Fire Insurance Company, United Life Insurance CompanyAttorney Jerad A. West added to party Employers Mutual Casualty Company(pty:dft), Attorney Jerad A. West added to party Employers Mutual Casualty Company(pty:dft), Attorney Jerad A. West added to party United Life Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Jerad A. West added to party United Life Insurance Company(pty:dft) (West, Jerad)
August 14, 2014 Filing 200 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Lelia Kathleen Chaney on behalf of Addison Insurance Company, Employers Mutual Casualty Company, Lafayette Insurance Company, Texas General Indemnity Company, United Fire & Casualty Company, United Fire Group, Inc., United Fire Insurance Company, United Life Insurance CompanyAttorney Lelia Kathleen Chaney added to party Addison Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Lelia Kathleen Chaney added to party Addison Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Lelia Kathleen Chaney added to party Lafayette Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Lelia Kathleen Chaney added to party Lafayette Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Lelia Kathleen Chaney added to party United Fire & Casualty Company(pty:dft), Attorney Lelia Kathleen Chaney added to party United Fire & Casualty Company(pty:dft), Attorney Lelia Kathleen Chaney added to party United Fire Group, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Lelia Kathleen Chaney added to party United Fire Group, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Lelia Kathleen Chaney added to party United Fire Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Lelia Kathleen Chaney added to party United Fire Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Lelia Kathleen Chaney added to party United Life Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Lelia Kathleen Chaney added to party United Life Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Chaney, Lelia)
August 14, 2014 Filing 199 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Kathleen Kramer Custer on behalf of Casualty Actuarial SocietyAttorney Kathleen Kramer Custer added to party Casualty Actuarial Society(pty:dft), Attorney Kathleen Kramer Custer added to party Casualty Actuarial Society(pty:dft) (Custer, Kathleen)
August 14, 2014 Filing 198 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc., The for Hartford Accident and Indemnity Company, Hartford Fire Insurance Company. (Mitchell, Cynthia)
August 14, 2014 Filing 197 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Alice Warren-Gregory on behalf of Hartford Accident and Indemnity Company, Hartford Financial Services Group, The, Hartford Fire Insurance CompanyAttorney Alice Warren-Gregory added to party Hartford Accident and Indemnity Company(pty:dft), Attorney Alice Warren-Gregory added to party Hartford Accident and Indemnity Company(pty:dft), Attorney Alice Warren-Gregory added to party Hartford Financial Services Group, The(pty:dft), Attorney Alice Warren-Gregory added to party Hartford Financial Services Group, The(pty:dft), Attorney Alice Warren-Gregory added to party Hartford Fire Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Alice Warren-Gregory added to party Hartford Fire Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Warren-Gregory, Alice)
August 14, 2014 Filing 196 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by William Arnold Waddell, Jr on behalf of Colorado Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Co.Attorney William Arnold Waddell, Jr added to party Colorado Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Co.(pty:dft), Attorney William Arnold Waddell, Jr added to party Colorado Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Co.(pty:dft) (Waddell, William)
August 13, 2014 Filing 195 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Shannon Marie Bell on behalf of Country Mutual Insurance CompanyAttorney Shannon Marie Bell added to party Country Mutual Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Shannon Marie Bell added to party Country Mutual Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Bell, Shannon)
August 13, 2014 Filing 194 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent The Chubb Corporation, Corporate Parent FEDERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, for Vigilant Insurance Company. (Palmeri, John)
August 13, 2014 Filing 193 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent The Chubb Corporation, Corporate Parent FEDERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, for Pacific Indemnity Company. (Palmeri, John)
August 13, 2014 Filing 192 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent The Chubb Corporation, Corporate Parent FEDERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, for Great Northern Insurance Company. (Palmeri, John)
August 13, 2014 Filing 191 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent The Chubb Corporation, Corporate Parent Chubb & Son, Inc. for Chubb Services Corporation. (Palmeri, John)
August 13, 2014 Filing 190 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent The Chubb Corporation, Corporate Parent FEDERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, for Chubb National Insurance Company. (Palmeri, John)
August 13, 2014 Filing 189 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent The Chubb Corporation for Federal Insurance Company. (Palmeri, John)
August 13, 2014 Filing 188 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Palmeri, John)
August 13, 2014 Filing 187 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance on behalf of Chubb National Insurance Company, Chubb Services Company, Federal Insurance Company, Great Northern Insurance Company, Pacific Indemnity Company, Vigilant Insurance Company and The Chubb Company by John M. Palmeri on behalf of Chubb Corporation, TheAttorney John M. Palmeri added to party Chubb Corporation, The(pty:dft), Attorney John M. Palmeri added to party Chubb Corporation, The(pty:dft) (Palmeri, John)
August 13, 2014 Filing 186 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Paul Howard Schwartz on behalf of Hartford Accident and Indemnity Company, Hartford Financial Services Group, The, Hartford Fire Insurance CompanyAttorney Paul Howard Schwartz added to party Hartford Accident and Indemnity Company(pty:dft), Attorney Paul Howard Schwartz added to party Hartford Accident and Indemnity Company(pty:dft), Attorney Paul Howard Schwartz added to party Hartford Financial Services Group, The(pty:dft), Attorney Paul Howard Schwartz added to party Hartford Financial Services Group, The(pty:dft), Attorney Paul Howard Schwartz added to party Hartford Fire Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Paul Howard Schwartz added to party Hartford Fire Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Schwartz, Paul)
August 13, 2014 Filing 185 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance on behalf of Chubb Defendants Chubb National Insurance Company, Chubb Services Company, Federal Insurance Company, Great Northern Insurance Company, Pacific Indemnity Company, Vigilant Insurance Company and The Chubb Corporation by Jacob C. Cohn on behalf of Chubb Corporation, TheAttorney Jacob C. Cohn added to party Chubb Corporation, The(pty:dft), Attorney Jacob C. Cohn added to party Chubb Corporation, The(pty:dft) (Cohn, Jacob)
August 13, 2014 Filing 184 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Cynthia A. Mitchell on behalf of Hartford Accident and Indemnity Company, Hartford Financial Services Group, The, Hartford Fire Insurance CompanyAttorney Cynthia A. Mitchell added to party Hartford Accident and Indemnity Company(pty:dft), Attorney Cynthia A. Mitchell added to party Hartford Accident and Indemnity Company(pty:dft), Attorney Cynthia A. Mitchell added to party Hartford Financial Services Group, The(pty:dft), Attorney Cynthia A. Mitchell added to party Hartford Financial Services Group, The(pty:dft), Attorney Cynthia A. Mitchell added to party Hartford Fire Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Cynthia A. Mitchell added to party Hartford Fire Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Mitchell, Cynthia)
August 13, 2014 Filing 183 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Sollod, Holly)
August 13, 2014 Filing 182 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Holly Stein Sollod on behalf of Casualty Actuarial SocietyAttorney Holly Stein Sollod added to party Casualty Actuarial Society(pty:dft), Attorney Holly Stein Sollod added to party Casualty Actuarial Society(pty:dft) (Sollod, Holly)
August 12, 2014 Filing 181 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. American Automobile Insurance Company served on 7/16/2014, answer due 9/15/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Second Copy Delivered)(Dougherty, Eddie)
August 12, 2014 Filing 180 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Travelers Insurance Group Holdings, Inc. served on 8/5/2014, answer due 9/15/2014. (Dougherty, Eddie)
August 12, 2014 Filing 179 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Milbank Insurance Company served on 7/16/2014, answer due 9/15/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Second Copy Delivered)(Dougherty, Eddie)
August 12, 2014 Filing 178 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Vigilant Insurance Company served on 7/18/2014, answer due 9/15/2014. (Dougherty, Eddie)
August 12, 2014 Filing 177 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Verisk Analytics, Inc. served on 8/1/2014, answer due 9/15/2014. (Dougherty, Eddie)
August 12, 2014 Filing 176 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. USAACasualty Insurance Company served on 7/18/2014, answer due 9/15/2014. (Dougherty, Eddie)
August 12, 2014 Filing 175 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Unitrin Direct Property & Casualty Company served on 7/18/2014, answer due 9/15/2014. (Dougherty, Eddie)
August 12, 2014 Filing 174 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Unitrin Auto and Home Insurance Company served on 7/30/2014, answer due 9/15/2014. (Dougherty, Eddie)
August 12, 2014 Filing 173 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. United Services Automobile Association served on 7/16/2014, answer due 9/15/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Second Copy Delivered)(Dougherty, Eddie)
August 12, 2014 Filing 172 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. United Fire Insurance Company served on 7/16/2014, answer due 9/15/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Second Copy Delivered)(Dougherty, Eddie)
August 12, 2014 Filing 171 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Travelers Indemnity Company of America served on 7/16/2014, answer due 9/15/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Second Copy Delivered)(Dougherty, Eddie)
August 12, 2014 Filing 170 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company served on 7/16/2014, answer due 9/15/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Second Copy Delivered)(Dougherty, Eddie)
August 12, 2014 Filing 169 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Travelers Commercial Insurance Company served on 7/16/2014, answer due 9/15/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Second Copy Delivered)(Dougherty, Eddie)
August 12, 2014 Filing 168 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. California Casualty Indemnity Exchange, The served on 7/21/2014, answer due 9/15/2014. (Dougherty, Eddie)
August 12, 2014 Filing 167 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Buckeye State Mutual Insurance Company, The served on 8/1/2014, answer due 9/15/2014. (Dougherty, Eddie)
August 12, 2014 Filing 166 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Stillwater Property and Casualty Insurance Company served on 7/16/2014, answer due 9/15/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Second Copy Delivered)(Dougherty, Eddie)
August 12, 2014 Filing 165 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Mark Lane Hanover on behalf of Allstate Insurance CompanyAttorney Mark Lane Hanover added to party Allstate Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Mark Lane Hanover added to party Allstate Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Hanover, Mark)
August 11, 2014 Filing 164 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company served on 7/21/2014, answer due 9/15/2014. (Dougherty, Eddie)
August 11, 2014 Filing 163 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company served on 7/21/2014, answer due 9/15/2014. (Dougherty, Eddie)
August 11, 2014 Filing 162 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. State Automobile Insurance Company served on 7/16/2014, answer due 9/15/2014. (Dougherty, Eddie)
August 11, 2014 Filing 161 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Shelter Mutual Insurance Company served on 7/16/2014, answer due 9/15/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Second Copy Delivered)(Dougherty, Eddie)
August 11, 2014 Filing 160 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Secura Insurance Holdings, Inc. served on 8/6/2014, answer due 9/15/2014. (Dougherty, Eddie)
August 11, 2014 Filing 159 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. QBE Insurance Company served on 7/16/2014, answer due 9/15/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Second Copy Delivered)(Dougherty, Eddie)
August 11, 2014 Filing 158 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Property Casualty Insurers Association of America served on 7/18/2014, answer due 9/15/2014. (Dougherty, Eddie)
August 11, 2014 Filing 157 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Praetorian Insurance Company served on 7/18/2014, answer due 9/15/2014. (Dougherty, Eddie)
August 11, 2014 Filing 156 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Pharmacists Mutual Insurance Company served on 7/16/2014, answer due 9/15/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Second Copy Delivered)(Dougherty, Eddie)
August 11, 2014 Filing 155 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Pacific Indemnity Company served on 7/18/2014, answer due 9/15/2014. (Dougherty, Eddie)
August 11, 2014 Filing 154 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Owners Insurance Company served on 7/16/2014, answer due 9/15/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Second Copy Delivered)(Dougherty, Eddie)
August 11, 2014 Filing 153 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company served on 7/16/2014, answer due 9/15/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Second Copy Delivered)(Dougherty, Eddie)
August 11, 2014 Filing 152 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. National Farmers Union Property and Casualty Company served on 7/18/2014, answer due 9/15/2014. (Dougherty, Eddie)
August 11, 2014 Filing 151 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. National Casualty Company served on 7/16/2014, answer due 9/15/2014. (Dougherty, Eddie)
August 11, 2014 Filing 150 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Metropolitan Direct Property & Casualty Insurance Company served on 7/16/2014, answer due 9/15/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Second Copy Delivered)(Dougherty, Eddie)
August 11, 2014 Filing 149 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. MetLife Auto & Home Insurance Agency, Inc. served on 7/18/2014, answer due 9/15/2014. (Dougherty, Eddie)
August 11, 2014 Filing 148 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Markel Insurance Company served on 7/16/2014, answer due 9/15/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Second Copy Delivered)(Dougherty, Eddie)
August 11, 2014 Filing 147 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Markel American Insurance Company served on 7/16/2014, answer due 9/15/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Second Copy Delivered)(Dougherty, Eddie)
August 11, 2014 Filing 146 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. LM Insurance Corporation served on 7/16/2014, answer due 9/15/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Second Copy Delivered)(Dougherty, Eddie)
August 11, 2014 Filing 145 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Liberty Insurance Corporation served on 7/18/2014, answer due 9/15/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Second Copy Delivered)(Dougherty, Eddie)
August 11, 2014 Filing 144 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Kemper Corporation served on 8/4/2014, answer due 9/15/2014. (Dougherty, Eddie)
August 11, 2014 Filing 143 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Kemper Corporate Services, Inc. served on 7/16/2014, answer due 9/15/2014. (Dougherty, Eddie)
August 11, 2014 Filing 142 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Insurance Services Office, Inc. served on 8/1/2014, answer due 9/15/2014. (Dougherty, Eddie)
August 11, 2014 Filing 141 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Hartford Financial Services Group, The served on 8/5/2014, answer due 9/15/2014. (Dougherty, Eddie)
August 11, 2014 Filing 140 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Hartford Accident and Indemnity Company served on 7/16/2014, answer due 9/15/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Second Copy Delivered)(Dougherty, Eddie)
August 11, 2014 Filing 139 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Guideone Mutual Insurance Company served on 7/18/2014, answer due 9/15/2014. (Dougherty, Eddie)
August 11, 2014 Filing 138 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Great Northern Insurance Company served on 7/18/2014, answer due 9/15/2014. (Dougherty, Eddie)
August 11, 2014 Filing 137 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Grange Insurance Association served on 7/16/2014, answer due 9/15/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Second Copy Delivered)(Dougherty, Eddie)
August 11, 2014 Filing 136 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. First American Property & Casualty Insurance Company served on 7/16/2014, answer due 9/15/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Second Copy Delivered)(Dougherty, Eddie)
August 11, 2014 Filing 135 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Fireman's Fund Insurance Company served on 7/18/2014, answer due 9/15/2014. (Dougherty, Eddie)
August 11, 2014 Filing 134 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Federal Insurance Company served on 7/18/2014, answer due 9/15/2014. (Dougherty, Eddie)
August 11, 2014 Filing 133 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Farmers Insurance Company served on 7/16/2014, answer due 9/15/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Second Copy Delivered)(Dougherty, Eddie)
August 11, 2014 Filing 132 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Farmers Alliance Mutual Insurance Company served on 7/16/2014, answer due 9/15/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Second Copy Delivered)(Dougherty, Eddie)
August 11, 2014 Filing 131 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Encompass Indemnity Company served on 8/1/2014, answer due 9/15/2014. (Dougherty, Eddie)
August 11, 2014 Filing 130 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Employers Mutual Casualty Company served on 7/21/2014, answer due 9/15/2014. (Dougherty, Eddie)
August 11, 2014 Filing 129 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Electric Insurance Company served on 7/18/2014, answer due 9/15/2014. (Dougherty, Eddie)
August 11, 2014 Filing 128 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Bledsoe, Philip)
August 11, 2014 Filing 127 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Country Mutual Insurance Company served on 7/18/2014, answer due 9/15/2014. (Dougherty, Eddie)
August 11, 2014 Filing 126 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Colorado Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Co. served on 7/21/2014, answer due 9/15/2014. (Dougherty, Eddie)
August 11, 2014 Filing 125 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Cincinnati Insurance Company served on 7/18/2014, answer due 9/15/2014. (Dougherty, Eddie)
August 11, 2014 Filing 124 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Chubb Services Corporation served on 7/18/2014, answer due 9/15/2014. (Dougherty, Eddie)
August 11, 2014 Filing 123 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Chubb National Insurance Company served on 7/18/2014, answer due 9/15/2014. (Dougherty, Eddie)
August 11, 2014 Filing 122 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Central Mutual Insurance Company served on 7/16/2014, answer due 9/15/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Second Copy Delivered)(Dougherty, Eddie)
August 11, 2014 Filing 121 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Casualty Actuarial Society served on 8/4/2014, answer due 9/15/2014. (Dougherty, Eddie)
August 11, 2014 Filing 120 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Automobile Insurance Company of Hartford Connecticut served on 7/16/2014, answer due 9/15/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Second Copy Delivered)(Dougherty, Eddie)
August 11, 2014 Filing 119 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Auto-Owners Insurance Company served on 7/16/2014, answer due 9/15/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Second Copy Delivered)(Dougherty, Eddie)
August 11, 2014 Filing 118 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. American Strategic Insurance Corp. served on 7/18/2014, answer due 9/15/2014. (Dougherty, Eddie)
August 11, 2014 Filing 117 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. American Reliable Insurance Company served on 7/16/2014, answer due 9/15/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Second Copy Delivered)(Dougherty, Eddie)
August 11, 2014 Filing 116 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. American Modern Select Insurance Company served on 7/31/2014, answer due 9/15/2014. (Dougherty, Eddie)
August 11, 2014 Filing 115 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. American Modern Insurance Group, Inc. served on 7/31/2014, answer due 9/15/2014. (Dougherty, Eddie)
August 11, 2014 Filing 114 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. American Modern Home Insurance Company served on 7/21/2014, answer due 9/15/2014. (Dougherty, Eddie)
August 11, 2014 Filing 113 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. American Family Home Insurance Company served on 7/21/2014, answer due 9/15/2014. (Dougherty, Eddie)
August 11, 2014 Filing 112 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida served on 7/16/2014, answer due 9/15/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Second Copy Delivered)(Dougherty, Eddie)
August 11, 2014 Filing 111 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. American Association of Insurance Services, Inc. served on 7/31/2014, answer due 9/15/2014. (Dougherty, Eddie)
August 11, 2014 Filing 110 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Allstate Insurance Company served on 7/16/2014, answer due 9/15/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Second Copy Delivered)(Dougherty, Eddie)
August 11, 2014 Filing 109 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Allianz Life Insurance Co. of North America served on 7/16/2014, answer due 9/15/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Second Copy Delivered)(Dougherty, Eddie)
August 11, 2014 Filing 108 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company served on 7/16/2014, answer due 9/15/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Second Copy Delivered)(Dougherty, Eddie)
August 11, 2014 Filing 107 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance (of Richard M. Murray) by Richard Maxton Murray on behalf of Shelter Mutual Insurance CompanyAttorney Richard Maxton Murray added to party Shelter Mutual Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Richard Maxton Murray added to party Shelter Mutual Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Murray, Richard)
August 11, 2014 Filing 106 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Joshua David McMahon on behalf of State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance CompanyAttorney Joshua David McMahon added to party State Farm Fire and Casualty Company(pty:dft), Attorney Joshua David McMahon added to party State Farm Fire and Casualty Company(pty:dft), Attorney Joshua David McMahon added to party State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Joshua David McMahon added to party State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company(pty:dft) (McMahon, Joshua)
August 11, 2014 Filing 105 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. All American Insurance Company served on 8/1/2014, answer due 9/15/2014. (Dougherty, Eddie)
August 11, 2014 Filing 104 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Acuity, A Mutual Insurance Company served on 7/16/2014, answer due 9/15/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit)(Dougherty, Eddie)
August 8, 2014 Filing 103 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance (of Bennett L. Cohen) by Bennett L. Cohen on behalf of Shelter Mutual Insurance CompanyAttorney Bennett L. Cohen added to party Shelter Mutual Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Bennett L. Cohen added to party Shelter Mutual Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Cohen, Bennett)
August 8, 2014 Filing 102 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance (of Philip W. Bledsoe) by Philip Wayne Bledsoe on behalf of Shelter Mutual Insurance CompanyAttorney Philip Wayne Bledsoe added to party Shelter Mutual Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Philip Wayne Bledsoe added to party Shelter Mutual Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Bledsoe, Philip)
August 8, 2014 Filing 101 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Zurich Insurance Company Ltd, Corporate Parent Zurich Insurance Group Ltd, Corporate Parent Zurich American Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Zurich Holding Company of America, Inc. for Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland. (Curvin, Thomas)
August 8, 2014 Filing 100 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Zurich Insurance Company Ltd, Corporate Parent Zurich Insurance Group Ltd, Corporate Parent Zurich Holding Company of America, Inc. for Zurich American Insurance Company. (Curvin, Thomas)
August 7, 2014 Filing 99 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent MetLife, Inc. for Metropolitan Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Lilly, Lisa)
August 7, 2014 Filing 98 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent MetLife, Inc. for Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Lilly, Lisa)
August 7, 2014 Filing 97 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent MetLife, Inc. for Metropolitan Direct Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (Lilly, Lisa)
August 7, 2014 Filing 96 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent MetLife, Inc. for MetLife Auto & Home Insurance Agency, Inc.. (Lilly, Lisa)
August 7, 2014 Filing 95 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Lisa M. Lilly on behalf of MetLife Auto & Home Insurance Agency, Inc., Metropolitan Direct Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Metropolitan Property and Casualty Insurance CompanyAttorney Lisa M. Lilly added to party MetLife Auto & Home Insurance Agency, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Lisa M. Lilly added to party MetLife Auto & Home Insurance Agency, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Lisa M. Lilly added to party Metropolitan Direct Property & Casualty Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Lisa M. Lilly added to party Metropolitan Direct Property & Casualty Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Lisa M. Lilly added to party Metropolitan Life Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Lisa M. Lilly added to party Metropolitan Life Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Lisa M. Lilly added to party Metropolitan Property and Casualty Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Lisa M. Lilly added to party Metropolitan Property and Casualty Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Lilly, Lisa)
August 7, 2014 Filing 94 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jeremy A. Moseley on behalf of United Services Automobile Association (Moseley, Jeremy)
August 7, 2014 Filing 93 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by John Mark Vaught on behalf of United Services Automobile Association (Vaught, John)
August 7, 2014 Filing 92 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Scott, Jessica)
August 7, 2014 Filing 91 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jessica Goneau Scott on behalf of United Services Automobile AssociationAttorney Jessica Goneau Scott added to party United Services Automobile Association(pty:dft), Attorney Jessica Goneau Scott added to party United Services Automobile Association(pty:dft) (Scott, Jessica)
August 6, 2014 Filing 90 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (McCarthy, Michael)
August 6, 2014 Filing 89 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Erin Frances Frohardt on behalf of First American Property & Casualty Insurance CompanyAttorney Erin Frances Frohardt added to party First American Property & Casualty Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Erin Frances Frohardt added to party First American Property & Casualty Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Frohardt, Erin)
August 6, 2014 Filing 88 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Allstate Corporation, The, Other Affiliate Allstate Insurance Holdings, LLC for Allstate Insurance Company. (Anderson, Sheryl)
August 6, 2014 Filing 87 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Daniel Albert Nicholas Graham on behalf of American Family Mutual Insurance CompanyAttorney Daniel Albert Nicholas Graham added to party American Family Mutual Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel Albert Nicholas Graham added to party American Family Mutual Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Graham, Daniel)
August 6, 2014 Filing 86 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Richard L. Fenton by Richard L. Fenton on behalf of Allstate Insurance CompanyAttorney Richard L. Fenton added to party Allstate Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Richard L. Fenton added to party Allstate Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Fenton, Richard)
August 6, 2014 Filing 85 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Daniel David Williams on behalf of American Family Mutual Insurance CompanyAttorney Daniel David Williams added to party American Family Mutual Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel David Williams added to party American Family Mutual Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Williams, Daniel)
August 6, 2014 Filing 84 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Marilyn S. Chappell by Marilyn S. Chappell on behalf of Allstate Insurance CompanyAttorney Marilyn S. Chappell added to party Allstate Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Marilyn S. Chappell added to party Allstate Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Chappell, Marilyn)
August 6, 2014 Filing 83 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Sheryl L. Anderson by Sheryl Lynn Anderson on behalf of Allstate Insurance CompanyAttorney Sheryl Lynn Anderson added to party Allstate Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Sheryl Lynn Anderson added to party Allstate Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Anderson, Sheryl)
August 6, 2014 Filing 82 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Hetal Janak Doshi on behalf of American Family Mutual Insurance CompanyAttorney Hetal Janak Doshi added to party American Family Mutual Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Hetal Janak Doshi added to party American Family Mutual Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Doshi, Hetal)
August 6, 2014 Filing 81 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Michael S. McCarthy on behalf of American Family Mutual Insurance CompanyAttorney Michael S. McCarthy added to party American Family Mutual Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Michael S. McCarthy added to party American Family Mutual Insurance Company(pty:dft) (McCarthy, Michael)
August 6, 2014 Filing 80 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by R. Livingston Keithley on behalf of Country Mutual Insurance CompanyAttorney R. Livingston Keithley added to party Country Mutual Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney R. Livingston Keithley added to party Country Mutual Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Keithley, R.)
August 6, 2014 Filing 79 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Chanda Marie Feldkamp on behalf of Country Mutual Insurance CompanyAttorney Chanda Marie Feldkamp added to party Country Mutual Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Chanda Marie Feldkamp added to party Country Mutual Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Feldkamp, Chanda)
August 6, 2014 Filing 78 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Illinois Agricultural Association for Country Mutual Insurance Company. (Kelly, William)
August 6, 2014 Filing 77 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by William James Kelly, III on behalf of Country Mutual Insurance CompanyAttorney William James Kelly, III added to party Country Mutual Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney William James Kelly, III added to party Country Mutual Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Kelly, William)
August 6, 2014 Filing 76 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Thomas W. Curvin on behalf of Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland, Zurich American Insurance Company (Curvin, Thomas)
August 6, 2014 Filing 75 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Janette L. Ferguson (filed by Farmers Insurance Exchange) by Janette L. Ferguson on behalf of Farmers Insurance CompanyAttorney Janette L. Ferguson added to party Farmers Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Janette L. Ferguson added to party Farmers Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Ferguson, Janette)
August 6, 2014 Filing 74 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Thomas P. Johnson (filed by Farmers Insurance Exchange) by Thomas P. Johnson on behalf of Farmers Insurance Company (Johnson, Thomas)
August 6, 2014 Filing 73 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Ann T. Lebeck (filed by Farmers Insurance Exchange) by Ann Tuxbury Lebeck on behalf of Farmers Insurance CompanyAttorney Ann Tuxbury Lebeck added to party Farmers Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Ann Tuxbury Lebeck added to party Farmers Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Lebeck, Ann)
August 6, 2014 Filing 72 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Sands, Jon)
August 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER granting # 67 Unopposed Motion to Consolidate Claims. Civil Action No. 14-cv-01884-WJM-CBS is consolidated with 14-cv-01736-JLK for all purposes. Civil Action No. 14-cv-01884-WJM-CBS is ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED by Judge John L. Kane on 08/05/2014. (athom, ) Modified on 8/6/2014 to correct text (athom, ).
August 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 70 MINUTE ORDER CLARIFYING 59 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond. The time to answer or file responsive pleadings for all defendants previously served is extended to September 15, 2014. Subsequently served defendants shall likewise have up to and including September 15, 2014 to answer or otherwise respond, or 21 days after service, whichever date is later, by Judge John L. Kane on 8/5/14. Text Only Entry (jlksec)
August 5, 2014 Filing 69 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Terence M. Ridley on behalf of First American Property & Casualty Insurance CompanyAttorney Terence M. Ridley added to party First American Property & Casualty Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Terence M. Ridley added to party First American Property & Casualty Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Ridley, Terence)
August 5, 2014 Filing 68 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent First American Financial Corporation for First American Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (Stephenson, Evan)
August 5, 2014 Filing 67 Unopposed MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:14-cv-1884 and 1:14-cv-1736 by Plaintiffs Louise Creager, Mary Ann Geldreich, Dorothy Wood Hammer, Mary Harrow, Sueham Kay Hoffman, Sueham (I) Kay Hoffman, Janet Koch, Gary Lemert, Martha Lemert, Tommy Meyer, Jeffrey Ray, Jennifer Ray, Ian Siemplenski, Dale Snyder, Marilyn Snyder, Catherine Taylor, Laila (I) Saeda Urban, Laila Saeda Urban, Nicole Wright-Meyer, Kenneth Dale Yoder. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 (Notice of Related Cases), # 2 Exhibit 2 (Defendants' Motions on 14-cv-1884), # 3 Exhibit 3 (Communications Regarding Notice on Motions), # 4 Exhibit 4 (Motion to Stay Proceedings), # 5 Exhibit 5 (Complaint, State Court), # 6 Exhibit 6 (Unpublished Authority), # 7 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Dougherty, Eddie)
August 4, 2014 Filing 66 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Johnson, Thomas)
August 4, 2014 Filing 65 NOTICE re # 40 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re # 18 Amended Complaint, Notice of Errata (filed by Farmers Insurance Exchange) by Defendant Farmers Insurance Company (Attachments: # 1 Attachment 1 to Notice of Errata, # 2 Attachment 2 to Notice of Errata)(Johnson, Thomas)
August 4, 2014 Filing 64 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Wiedenhoff, Laurie)
August 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER finding as moot # 62 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond. All served defendants were given an extension of time to answer or otherwise respond of up to and including September 15, 2014, pursuant to minute order 59 entered earlier today, by Judge John L. Kane on 8/1/14. Text Only Entry(jlksec)
August 1, 2014 Filing 62 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re # 4 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, by Defendant American Strategic Insurance Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Gregory, Alan)
August 1, 2014 Filing 61 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Gregory, Alan)
August 1, 2014 Filing 60 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jeffrey Clay Ruebel on behalf of Guideone Mutual Insurance CompanyAttorney Jeffrey Clay Ruebel added to party Guideone Mutual Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Jeffrey Clay Ruebel added to party Guideone Mutual Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Ruebel, Jeffrey)
August 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER granting # 40 opposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond. All served defendants shall have up and including 9/15/14 to file an answer or other responsive pleading. Subsequently served defendants shall have 21 days after service to answer or otherwise respond, by Judge John L. Kane on 8/1/14. Text Only Entry(jlksec)
August 1, 2014 Filing 58 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Laurie Jo Wiedenhoff on behalf of Guideone Mutual Insurance CompanyAttorney Laurie Jo Wiedenhoff added to party Guideone Mutual Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Laurie Jo Wiedenhoff added to party Guideone Mutual Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Wiedenhoff, Laurie)
July 31, 2014 Filing 57 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Evan Bennett Stephenson on behalf of Electric Insurance CompanyAttorney Evan Bennett Stephenson added to party Electric Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Evan Bennett Stephenson added to party Electric Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Stephenson, Evan)
July 30, 2014 Filing 56 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Wilmington Trust Company for Electric Insurance Company. (Moseley, Jeremy)
July 30, 2014 Filing 55 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent USAA for USAACasualty Insurance Company. (Moseley, Jeremy)
July 30, 2014 Filing 54 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Michael Patrick Kenny on behalf of State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance CompanyAttorney Michael Patrick Kenny added to party State Farm Fire and Casualty Company(pty:dft), Attorney Michael Patrick Kenny added to party State Farm Fire and Casualty Company(pty:dft), Attorney Michael Patrick Kenny added to party State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Michael Patrick Kenny added to party State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Kenny, Michael)
July 30, 2014 Filing 53 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Elizabeth Helmer on behalf of State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance CompanyAttorney Elizabeth Helmer added to party State Farm Fire and Casualty Company(pty:dft), Attorney Elizabeth Helmer added to party State Farm Fire and Casualty Company(pty:dft), Attorney Elizabeth Helmer added to party State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Elizabeth Helmer added to party State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Helmer, Elizabeth)
July 30, 2014 Filing 52 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jon F. Sands on behalf of State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance CompanyAttorney Jon F. Sands added to party State Farm Fire and Casualty Company(pty:dft), Attorney Jon F. Sands added to party State Farm Fire and Casualty Company(pty:dft), Attorney Jon F. Sands added to party State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Jon F. Sands added to party State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Sands, Jon)
July 29, 2014 Filing 51 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Alan Peter Gregory on behalf of American Strategic Insurance Corp.Attorney Alan Peter Gregory added to party American Strategic Insurance Corp.(pty:dft), Attorney Alan Peter Gregory added to party American Strategic Insurance Corp.(pty:dft) (Gregory, Alan)
July 29, 2014 Filing 50 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Robertson, Stephen)
July 29, 2014 Filing 49 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Charles Edmond Fuller on behalf of Acord CorporationAttorney Charles Edmond Fuller added to party Acord Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Charles Edmond Fuller added to party Acord Corporation(pty:dft) (Fuller, Charles)
July 29, 2014 Filing 48 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Visciano, Frank)
July 29, 2014 Filing 47 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Frank W. Visciano on behalf of Acord CorporationAttorney Frank W. Visciano added to party Acord Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Frank W. Visciano added to party Acord Corporation(pty:dft) (Visciano, Frank)
July 29, 2014 Filing 46 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Terence M. Ridley on behalf of Electric Insurance CompanyAttorney Terence M. Ridley added to party Electric Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Terence M. Ridley added to party Electric Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Ridley, Terence)
July 29, 2014 Filing 45 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Mayer, Ellis)
July 29, 2014 Filing 44 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance Entry of Appearance by Ellis Jay Mayer on behalf of Colorado Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Co.Attorney Ellis Jay Mayer added to party Colorado Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Co.(pty:dft), Attorney Ellis Jay Mayer added to party Colorado Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Co.(pty:dft) (Mayer, Ellis)
July 29, 2014 Filing 43 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jacqueline K. Matthews on behalf of Liberty Insurance Corporation, Liberty Mutual Insurance, Liberty Mutual Insurance CompanyAttorney Jacqueline K. Matthews added to party Liberty Insurance Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Jacqueline K. Matthews added to party Liberty Insurance Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Jacqueline K. Matthews added to party Liberty Mutual Insurance(pty:dft), Attorney Jacqueline K. Matthews added to party Liberty Mutual Insurance(pty:dft), Attorney Jacqueline K. Matthews added to party Liberty Mutual Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Jacqueline K. Matthews added to party Liberty Mutual Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Matthews, Jacqueline)
July 28, 2014 Filing 42 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Michael L. O'Donnell on behalf of Electric Insurance CompanyAttorney Michael L. O'Donnell added to party Electric Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Michael L. O'Donnell added to party Electric Insurance Company(pty:dft) (O'Donnell, Michael)
July 28, 2014 Filing 41 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Stephen Clawson Robertson on behalf of McKinsey & Company, Inc.(a New York corporation), McKinsey & Company, Inc.(a Delware corporation)Attorney Stephen Clawson Robertson added to party McKinsey & Company, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Stephen Clawson Robertson added to party McKinsey & Company, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Stephen Clawson Robertson added to party McKinsey & Company, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Stephen Clawson Robertson added to party McKinsey & Company, Inc.(pty:dft) (Robertson, Stephen)
July 28, 2014 Filing 40 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re # 18 Amended Complaint, by Defendants American Family Home Insurance Company, American Modern Home Insurance Company, Cincinnati Insurance Company, Liberty Insurance Corporation, Liberty Mutual Insurance, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Unitrin Direct Property & Casualty Company. (Collignon, Casie)
July 28, 2014 Filing 39 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Jeremy A. Moseley by Jeremy A. Moseley on behalf of Electric Insurance CompanyAttorney Jeremy A. Moseley added to party Electric Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Jeremy A. Moseley added to party Electric Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Moseley, Jeremy)
July 28, 2014 Filing 38 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Jeremy A. Moseley by Jeremy A. Moseley on behalf of USAACasualty Insurance Company (Moseley, Jeremy)
July 28, 2014 Filing 37 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Jessica G. Scott by Jessica Goneau Scott on behalf of USAACasualty Insurance CompanyAttorney Jessica Goneau Scott added to party USAACasualty Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Jessica Goneau Scott added to party USAACasualty Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Scott, Jessica)
July 28, 2014 Filing 36 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance John M. Vaught by John Mark Vaught on behalf of USAACasualty Insurance Company (Vaught, John)
July 28, 2014 Filing 35 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Kemper Corporation for Unitrin Direct Property & Casualty Company. (Collignon, Casie)
July 28, 2014 Filing 34 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent LMHC Massachusetts Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Group, Inc., Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Holding Company, Inc. for Liberty Insurance Corporation. (Collignon, Casie)
July 28, 2014 Filing 33 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent LMHC Massachusetts Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Group, Inc., Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Holding Company, Inc. for Liberty Mutual Insurance. (Collignon, Casie)
July 28, 2014 Filing 32 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent LMHC Massachusetts Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Group Inc., Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Holding Company, Inc. for Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. (Collignon, Casie)
July 28, 2014 Filing 31 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Munich Reinsurance Company, Corporate Parent American Modern Insurance Group, Inc., Corporate Parent Munich-American Holding Corporation, Corporate Parent Midland-Guardian Co., Corporate Parent The Midland Company for American Modern Home Insurance Company. (Collignon, Casie)
July 28, 2014 Filing 30 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Cincinnati Financial Corporation for Cincinnati Insurance Company. (Collignon, Casie)
July 28, 2014 Filing 29 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Collignon, Casie)
July 28, 2014 Filing 28 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Rodger L. Eckelberry on behalf of American Family Home Insurance Company, American Modern Home Insurance Company, Cincinnati Insurance Company, Liberty Insurance Corporation, Liberty Mutual Insurance, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Unitrin Direct Property & Casualty CompanyAttorney Rodger L. Eckelberry added to party American Family Home Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Rodger L. Eckelberry added to party American Family Home Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Rodger L. Eckelberry added to party American Modern Home Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Rodger L. Eckelberry added to party American Modern Home Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Rodger L. Eckelberry added to party Cincinnati Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Rodger L. Eckelberry added to party Cincinnati Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Rodger L. Eckelberry added to party Liberty Insurance Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Rodger L. Eckelberry added to party Liberty Insurance Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Rodger L. Eckelberry added to party Liberty Mutual Insurance(pty:dft), Attorney Rodger L. Eckelberry added to party Liberty Mutual Insurance(pty:dft), Attorney Rodger L. Eckelberry added to party Liberty Mutual Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Rodger L. Eckelberry added to party Liberty Mutual Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Rodger L. Eckelberry added to party Unitrin Direct Property & Casualty Company(pty:dft), Attorney Rodger L. Eckelberry added to party Unitrin Direct Property & Casualty Company(pty:dft) (Eckelberry, Rodger)
July 28, 2014 Filing 27 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Matthew Courtney Baisley on behalf of Liberty Insurance Corporation, Liberty Mutual Insurance, Liberty Mutual Insurance CompanyAttorney Matthew Courtney Baisley added to party Liberty Insurance Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew Courtney Baisley added to party Liberty Insurance Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew Courtney Baisley added to party Liberty Mutual Insurance(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew Courtney Baisley added to party Liberty Mutual Insurance(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew Courtney Baisley added to party Liberty Mutual Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew Courtney Baisley added to party Liberty Mutual Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Baisley, Matthew)
July 28, 2014 Filing 26 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Mark Alan Johnson on behalf of American Family Home Insurance Company, American Modern Home Insurance Company, Cincinnati Insurance Company, Unitrin Direct Property & Casualty CompanyAttorney Mark Alan Johnson added to party American Family Home Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Mark Alan Johnson added to party American Family Home Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Mark Alan Johnson added to party American Modern Home Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Mark Alan Johnson added to party American Modern Home Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Mark Alan Johnson added to party Cincinnati Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Mark Alan Johnson added to party Cincinnati Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Mark Alan Johnson added to party Unitrin Direct Property & Casualty Company(pty:dft), Attorney Mark Alan Johnson added to party Unitrin Direct Property & Casualty Company(pty:dft) (Johnson, Mark)
July 28, 2014 Filing 25 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Rand Lawrence McClellan on behalf of American Family Home Insurance Company, American Modern Home Insurance Company, Cincinnati Insurance Company, Unitrin Direct Property & Casualty CompanyAttorney Rand Lawrence McClellan added to party American Family Home Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Rand Lawrence McClellan added to party American Family Home Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Rand Lawrence McClellan added to party American Modern Home Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Rand Lawrence McClellan added to party American Modern Home Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Rand Lawrence McClellan added to party Cincinnati Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Rand Lawrence McClellan added to party Cincinnati Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Rand Lawrence McClellan added to party Unitrin Direct Property & Casualty Company(pty:dft), Attorney Rand Lawrence McClellan added to party Unitrin Direct Property & Casualty Company(pty:dft) (McClellan, Rand)
July 28, 2014 Filing 24 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Casie D. Collignon on behalf of American Family Home Insurance Company, American Modern Home Insurance Company, Cincinnati Insurance Company, Liberty Insurance Corporation, Liberty Mutual Insurance, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Unitrin Direct Property & Casualty CompanyAttorney Casie D. Collignon added to party American Family Home Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Casie D. Collignon added to party American Family Home Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Casie D. Collignon added to party American Modern Home Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Casie D. Collignon added to party American Modern Home Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Casie D. Collignon added to party Cincinnati Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Casie D. Collignon added to party Cincinnati Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Casie D. Collignon added to party Liberty Insurance Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Casie D. Collignon added to party Liberty Insurance Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Casie D. Collignon added to party Liberty Mutual Insurance(pty:dft), Attorney Casie D. Collignon added to party Liberty Mutual Insurance(pty:dft), Attorney Casie D. Collignon added to party Liberty Mutual Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Casie D. Collignon added to party Liberty Mutual Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Casie D. Collignon added to party Unitrin Direct Property & Casualty Company(pty:dft), Attorney Casie D. Collignon added to party Unitrin Direct Property & Casualty Company(pty:dft) (Collignon, Casie)
July 28, 2014 Filing 23 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Paul Gregory Karlsgodt on behalf of American Family Home Insurance Company, American Modern Home Insurance Company, Cincinnati Insurance Company, Unitrin Direct Property & Casualty CompanyAttorney Paul Gregory Karlsgodt added to party American Family Home Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Paul Gregory Karlsgodt added to party American Family Home Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Paul Gregory Karlsgodt added to party American Modern Home Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Paul Gregory Karlsgodt added to party American Modern Home Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Paul Gregory Karlsgodt added to party Cincinnati Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Paul Gregory Karlsgodt added to party Cincinnati Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Paul Gregory Karlsgodt added to party Unitrin Direct Property & Casualty Company(pty:dft), Attorney Paul Gregory Karlsgodt added to party Unitrin Direct Property & Casualty Company(pty:dft) (Karlsgodt, Paul)
July 17, 2014 Filing 22 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons) (jhawk, )
July 17, 2014 Filing 21 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Unitrin Auto and Home Ins Co by Plaintiffs Louise Creager, Mary Ann Geldreich, Dorothy Wood Hammer, Mary Harrow, Sueham Kay Hoffman, Sueham (I) Kay Hoffman, Janet Koch, Gary Lemert, Martha Lemert, Tommy Meyer, Jeffrey Ray, Jennifer Ray, Ian Siemplenski, Dale Snyder, Marilyn Snyder, Catherine Taylor, Laila (I) Saeda Urban, Laila Saeda Urban, Nicole Wright-Meyer, Kenneth Dale Yoder. (Dougherty, Eddie)
July 17, 2014 Filing 20 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Liberty Ins Corp by Plaintiffs Louise Creager, Mary Ann Geldreich, Dorothy Wood Hammer, Mary Harrow, Sueham Kay Hoffman, Sueham (I) Kay Hoffman, Janet Koch, Gary Lemert, Martha Lemert, Tommy Meyer, Jeffrey Ray, Jennifer Ray, Ian Siemplenski, Dale Snyder, Marilyn Snyder, Catherine Taylor, Laila (I) Saeda Urban, Laila Saeda Urban, Nicole Wright-Meyer, Kenneth Dale Yoder. (Dougherty, Eddie)
July 17, 2014 Filing 19 SUMMONS REQUEST as to American Family Mutual Ins. Co. by Plaintiffs Louise Creager, Mary Ann Geldreich, Dorothy Wood Hammer, Mary Harrow, Sueham Kay Hoffman, Sueham (I) Kay Hoffman, Janet Koch, Gary Lemert, Martha Lemert, Tommy Meyer, Jeffrey Ray, Jennifer Ray, Ian Siemplenski, Dale Snyder, Marilyn Snyder, Catherine Taylor, Laila (I) Saeda Urban, Laila Saeda Urban, Nicole Wright-Meyer, Kenneth Dale Yoder. (Dougherty, Eddie)
July 11, 2014 Filing 18 AMENDED COMPLAINT Class Action and Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Louise Creager, Mary Ann Geldreich, Dorothy Wood Hammer, Sueham Kay Hoffman, Sueham (I) Kay Hoffman, Janet Koch, Gary Lemert, Martha Lemert, Tommy Meyer, Jeffrey Ray, Jennifer Ray, Ian Siemplenski, Dale Snyder, Marilyn Snyder, Catherine Taylor, Laila (I) Saeda Urban, Laila Saeda Urban, Nicole Wright-Meyer, Kenneth Dale Yoder.(Dougherty, Eddie)
June 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting # 14 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Jeremy A. Moseley terminated, by Judge John L. Kane on 6/26/14. Text Only Entry(jlksec)
June 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting # 13 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney John Mark Vaught terminated, by Judge John L. Kane on 6/26/14. Text Only Entry(jlksec)
June 25, 2014 Filing 15 Notice to Counsel and All Parties by Judge John L. Kane on 06/25/14. (jhawk, )
June 24, 2014 Filing 14 NOTICE re # 12 Notice of Entry of Appearance, Withdrawal of Appearance of Jeremy A. Moseley by Defendants USAACasualty Insurance Company, United Services Automobile Association (Moseley, Jeremy) Modified on 6/26/2014 to turn into a motion to withdrawal (jhawk, ).
June 24, 2014 Filing 13 NOTICE re # 11 Notice of Entry of Appearance Withdrawal of Appearance of John M. Vaught by Defendants USAACasualty Insurance Company, United Services Automobile Association (Vaught, John) Modified on 6/26/2014 to turn into a motion to withdraw (jhawk, ).
June 24, 2014 Filing 12 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jeremy A. Moseley by Jeremy A. Moseley on behalf of USAACasualty Insurance Company, United Services Automobile AssociationAttorney Jeremy A. Moseley added to party USAACasualty Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Jeremy A. Moseley added to party USAACasualty Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Jeremy A. Moseley added to party United Services Automobile Association(pty:dft), Attorney Jeremy A. Moseley added to party United Services Automobile Association(pty:dft) (Moseley, Jeremy)
June 24, 2014 Filing 11 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by John M. Vaught by John Mark Vaught on behalf of USAACasualty Insurance Company, United Services Automobile AssociationAttorney John Mark Vaught added to party USAACasualty Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney John Mark Vaught added to party USAACasualty Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney John Mark Vaught added to party United Services Automobile Association(pty:dft), Attorney John Mark Vaught added to party United Services Automobile Association(pty:dft) (Vaught, John)
June 24, 2014 Filing 10 Magistrate Judge Consent Form issued pursuant to Local Rule. (jofox, )
June 24, 2014 Filing 9 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. Magistrate Judge Consent Form issued pursuant to Magistrate Judge Pilot Project to Assign Civil Cases to Full Time Magistrate Judges. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons, # 6 Summons, # 7 Summons, # 8 Summons, # 9 Summons, # 10 Summons, # 11 Summons, # 12 Summons, # 13 Summons, # 14 Summons, # 15 Summons, # 16 Summons, # 17 Summons, # 18 Summons, # 19 Summons, # 20 Summons, # 21 Summons, # 22 Summons, # 23 Summons, # 24 Summons, # 25 Summons, # 26 Summons, # 27 Summons, # 28 Summons, # 29 Summons, # 30 Summons, # 31 Summons, # 32 Summons, # 33 Summons, # 34 Summons, # 35 Summons, # 36 Summons, # 37 Summons, # 38 Summons, # 39 Summons, # 40 Summons, # 41 Summons, # 42 Summons, # 43 Summons, # 44 Summons, # 45 Summons, # 46 Summons, # 47 Summons, # 48 Summons, # 49 Summons, # 50 Summons, # 51 Summons, # 52 Summons, # 53 Summons, # 54 Summons, # 55 Summons, # 56 Summons, # 57 Summons, # 58 Summons, # 59 Summons, # 60 Summons, # 61 Summons, # 62 Summons, # 63 Summons, # 64 Summons, # 65 Summons, # 66 Summons, # 67 Summons, # 68 Summons, # 69 Summons, # 70 Summons, # 71 Summons, # 72 Summons, # 73 Summons, # 74 Summons, # 75 Summons, # 76 Summons, # 77 Summons, # 78 Summons, # 79 Summons, # 80 Summons, # 81 Summons, # 82 Summons, # 83 Summons, # 84 Summons, # 85 Summons, # 86 Summons, # 87 Summons, # 88 Summons, # 89 Summons, # 90 Summons, # 91 Summons, # 92 Summons, # 93 Summons, # 94 Summons, # 95 Summons, # 96 Summons, # 97 Summons, # 98 Summons, # 99 Summons, # 100 Summons, # 101 Summons, # 102 Summons, # 103 Summons, # 104 Summons, # 105 Summons, # 106 Summons, # 107 Summons, # 108 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (jofox, )
June 24, 2014 Filing 8 Magistrate Judge Consent Form issued pursuant to Local Rule. (smoor)
June 24, 2014 Filing 7 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to # 6 Order of Recusal. This case is reassigned to Judge John L. Kane and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. All future pleadings should be designated as 14-cv-01736-JLK-KMT. (Text Only Entry) (smoor)
June 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF RECUSAL. This court directs that this case be returned to the Clerk of Court for reassignment by random draw for a new judicial officer, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 6/24/2014. (smoor)
June 23, 2014 Filing 4 COMPLAINT Class Action and Jury Demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-3925346), filed by LOUISE CREAGER, ESTATE OF DOROTHY WOOD HAMMER, MARY ANN GELDREICH, MARY HARROW, SUEHAM KAY HOFFMAN, SUEHAM (I) KAY HOFFMAN, JANET KOCH, GARY LEMERT, MARTHA LEMERT, TOMMY MEYER, JEFFERY RAY, JENNIFER RAY, IAN SIEMPLENSKI, DALE SNYDER, MARILYN SNYDER, CATHERINE TAYLOR, LAILA SAEDA URBAN, LAILA (I) SAEDA URBAN, NICOLE WRIGHT-MEYER, KENNETH DALE YODER. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons ACORD CORPORATIOn, # 3 Summons ACUITY, A MUTUAL INS. CO., # 4 Summons ADDISON INS. CO., # 5 Summons ALL AMERICAN INS. CO., # 6 Summons ALLIANZ AMERICA, INC., # 7 Summons ALLIANZ GLOBAL RISKS US INS. CO., # 8 Summons ALLIANZ LIFE INS. CO. OF N. AMER., # 9 Summons ALLSTATE INS. CO., # 10 Summons AMMERICAN ASSOC. OF INS. SERV., # 11 Summons AMERICAN AUTO INS. CO., # 12 Summons AMERICAN BANKERS INS. CO. of FL, # 13 Summons AMERICAN FAMILY HOME INS. CO., # 14 Summons AMERICAN INDEMNITY FINANCIAL CORP., # 15 Summons AMERICAN INTERNATIONAL GROUP, INC., # 16 Summons AMERICAN MODERN HOME INS. CO., # 17 Summons AMERICAN MODERN INS. GROUP, INC., # 18 Summons AMERICAN MODERN SELECT INS. CO., # 19 Summons AMERICAN RELIABLE INS. CO., # 20 Summons AMERICAN STRATEGIC INS. CORP., # 21 Summons ASSOC. INDEMNITY. COPR., # 22 Summons AUTO IN. CO. of HARTFORD CT, # 23 Summons AUTO OWNERS INS. CO., # 24 Summons CASUALTY ACTUARIAL SOCIETY, # 25 Summons CENTRAL MUTUAL INS. CO., # 26 Summons CHUBB CORP., # 27 Summons CHUBB NATIONAL INS. CO., # 28 Summons CHUB SRVCS. CORP., # 29 Summons CINCINNATI INS. CO., # 30 Summons COLORADO FARM BUREAU INS. CO., # 31 Summons COUNTY MUTUAL INS. CO., # 32 Summons ELECTRIC INS. CO., # 33 Summons EMPLOYERS MUTUAL CASUALTY CO., # 34 Summons ENCOMPASS INDEMNITY CO., # 35 Summons FARMERS ALLIANCE MUTUAL INS. CO., # 36 Summons FARMERS INS. CO., # 37 Summons FEDREAL INS. CO., # 38 Summons FIDELITY AND DEPOSIT CO. OF MD, # 39 Summons FIREMANS FUND INS. CO., # 40 Summons FIRST AMERICAN FINANCIAL CORP., # 41 Summons FIRST AMERICAN PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INS. CO., # 42 Summons GRANGE INS. ASSOC., # 43 Summons GREAT N. INS. CO., # 44 Summons GUIDEONE MUTUAL INS. CO., # 45 Summons HARTFORD ACCIDENT AND INDEMNITY CO., # 46 Summons HARFORD FIRE INS. CO., # 47 Summons INS. SRVCS. OFFICE, INC., # 48 Summons INTERNATIONAL INS. SOC., INC., # 49 Summons KENPER CORP., # 50 Summons KENPER CORP. SRVCS., INC., # 51 Summons LAFAYETTE INS. CO., # 52 Summons LIBERTY MUTUAL INS. CO., # 53 Summons LIBERTY MUTUAL INS., # 54 Summons LM INS. CORP., # 55 Summons MARKEL AMERICAN INS. CO., # 56 Summons MARKEL INS. CO., # 57 Summons MCKINSEY AND CO., INC., # 58 Summons MCKINSEY AND CO., INC., # 59 Summons METLIFE AUTO AND HOME INS. AGENCY, INC., # 60 Summons METROPOLITAIN DIRECT PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INS. CO., # 61 Summons METROPOLITAIN PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INS. CO., # 62 Summons MILBANK INS. CO., # 63 Summons MUNICH AMERICAN HOLDING CORP., # 64 Summons NATIONAL CASUALTY CO., # 65 Summons NATIONAL FARMERS UNION PROPERTY AND CASUALTY CO., # 66 Summons NATIONAL SURETY CORP., # 67 Summons NATIONWIDE AFFINITY INS. CO. OF AMERICA, # 68 Summons NATIONWIDE INS. CO OF AMERICA, # 69 Summons NATIONWIDE MUTUAL INS. CO., # 70 Summons OWNERS INS. CO., # 71 Summons PACIFIC INDEMNITY CO., # 72 Summons PHRMACISTS MUTUAL INS. CO., # 73 Summons PRAETORIAN INS. CO., # 74 Summons PROPERTY CASUALTY INSURERS ASSOC. OF AMERICA, # 75 Summons QBE HOLDINGS, INC., # 76 Summons QBE INS. CO., # 77 Summons QBE INS. GROUP, LTD., # 78 Summons SAFECO INS. CO. OF AMERICA, # 79 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet SECURA INS. HOLDINGS, INC., # 80 Summons SENTRY INS., # 81 Summons SHELTER MUTUAL INS. CO., # 82 Summons STANDARD FIRE INS. CO., # 83 Summons STATE AUTO. INS. CO., # 84 Summons STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY CO., # 85 Summons STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTO. INS. CO., # 86 Summons STILWATER PROPERTY AND CASUALTYINS. CO., # 87 Summons TEXAS GEN. INDEMNITY CO., # 88 Summons THE BUCKEYE STATE MUTUAL INS. CO., # 89 Summons THE CALIFORNIA CASUALTY INDEMNITY EXCHANGE, # 90 Summons THE HARFORD FINANCIAL SVCS. GROUP, # 91 Summons THE TRAVELRS COMPANIES, INC., # 92 Summons THE TRAVELERS INS. CO., # 93 Summons TRAVELERS COMMERCIAL INS. CO., # 94 Summons TRAVELERS HOME AND MARINE INS. CO., # 95 Summons TRAVELERS INDEMNITY CO. OF AMERICA, # 96 Summons TRAVELERS INS. GROUP HOLDINGS, INC., # 97 Summons UNITED FORE AND CASUALTY CO., # 98 Summons UNITED FORE AND INDEMNITY CO., # 99 Summons UNITED FIRE GROUP, INC., # 100 Summons UNITED FIRE INS. CO., # 101 Summons UNITED FIRE LLOYDS, # 102 Summons UNITED LIFE INS. CO., # 103 Summons UNITED SVCS AUTOMOBILE ASSOC., # 104 Summons UNITRIN AUTO AND HOME INS. CO., # 105 Summons UNITRIN DIRECT PROPERTY AND CASUALTY CO., # 106 Summons USAA CASUALTY INS. CO., # 107 Summons VERISK ANALYTICS, INC., # 108 Summons ZURICH AMERICAN INS. CO., # 109 Summons ZURICH INS. GROUP, LTD.)(Dougherty, Eddie)
June 21, 2014 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE ASSOCIATION and RELATED CASES by Plaintiffs LOUISE CREAGER, ESTATE OF DOROTHY WOOD HAMMER, MARY ANN GELDREICH, MARY HARROW, SUEHAM KAY HOFFMAN, SUEHAM (I) KAY HOFFMAN, JANET KOCH, GARY LEMERT, MARTHA LEMERT, TOMMY MEYER, JEFFERY RAY, JENNIFER RAY, IAN SIEMPLENSKI, DALE SNYDER, MARILYN SNYDER, CATHERINE TAYLOR, LAILA SAEDA URBAN, LAILA (I) SAEDA URBAN, NICOLE WRIGHT-MEYER, KENNETH DALE YODER (Dougherty, Eddie)
June 21, 2014 Filing 2 COMPLAINT Class Action and Jury Demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-3925309)Attorney Eddie Gene Dougherty added to party LOUISE CREAGER(pty:pla), Attorney Eddie Gene Dougherty added to party LOUISE CREAGER(pty:pla), Attorney Eddie Gene Dougherty added to party ESTATE OF DOROTHY WOOD HAMMER(pty:pla), Attorney Eddie Gene Dougherty added to party ESTATE OF DOROTHY WOOD HAMMER(pty:pla), Attorney Eddie Gene Dougherty added to party MARY ANN GELDREICH(pty:pla), Attorney Eddie Gene Dougherty added to party MARY ANN GELDREICH(pty:pla), Attorney Eddie Gene Dougherty added to party MARY HARROW(pty:pla), Attorney Eddie Gene Dougherty added to party MARY HARROW(pty:pla), Attorney Eddie Gene Dougherty added to party SUEHAM KAY HOFFMAN(pty:pla), Attorney Eddie Gene Dougherty added to party SUEHAM KAY HOFFMAN(pty:pla), Attorney Eddie Gene Dougherty added to party SUEHAM (I) KAY HOFFMAN(pty:pla), Attorney Eddie Gene Dougherty added to party SUEHAM (I) KAY HOFFMAN(pty:pla), Attorney Eddie Gene Dougherty added to party JANET KOCH(pty:pla), Attorney Eddie Gene Dougherty added to party JANET KOCH(pty:pla), Attorney Eddie Gene Dougherty added to party GARY LEMERT(pty:pla), Attorney Eddie Gene Dougherty added to party GARY LEMERT(pty:pla), Attorney Eddie Gene Dougherty added to party MARTHA LEMERT(pty:pla), Attorney Eddie Gene Dougherty added to party MARTHA LEMERT(pty:pla), Attorney Eddie Gene Dougherty added to party TOMMY MEYER(pty:pla), Attorney Eddie Gene Dougherty added to party TOMMY MEYER(pty:pla), Attorney Eddie Gene Dougherty added to party JEFFERY RAY(pty:pla), Attorney Eddie Gene Dougherty added to party JEFFERY RAY(pty:pla), Attorney Eddie Gene Dougherty added to party JENNIFER RAY(pty:pla), Attorney Eddie Gene Dougherty added to party JENNIFER RAY(pty:pla), Attorney Eddie Gene Dougherty added to party IAN SIEMPLENSKI(pty:pla), Attorney Eddie Gene Dougherty added to party IAN SIEMPLENSKI(pty:pla), Attorney Eddie Gene Dougherty added to party MARILYN SNYDER(pty:pla), Attorney Eddie Gene Dougherty added to party MARILYN SNYDER(pty:pla), Attorney Eddie Gene Dougherty added to party CATHERINE TAYLOR(pty:pla), Attorney Eddie Gene Dougherty added to party CATHERINE TAYLOR(pty:pla), Attorney Eddie Gene Dougherty added to party LAILA SAEDA URBAN(pty:pla), Attorney Eddie Gene Dougherty added to party LAILA SAEDA URBAN(pty:pla), Attorney Eddie Gene Dougherty added to party LAILA (I) SAEDA URBAN(pty:pla), Attorney Eddie Gene Dougherty added to party LAILA (I) SAEDA URBAN(pty:pla), Attorney Eddie Gene Dougherty added to party NICOLE WRIGHT-MEYER(pty:pla), Attorney Eddie Gene Dougherty added to party NICOLE WRIGHT-MEYER(pty:pla), Attorney Eddie Gene Dougherty added to party KENNETH DALE YODER(pty:pla), Attorney Eddie Gene Dougherty added to party KENNETH DALE YODER(pty:pla), filed by LOUISE CREAGER, ESTATE OF DOROTHY WOOD HAMMER, MARY ANN GELDREICH, MARY HARROW, SUEHAM KAY HOFFMAN, SUEHAM (I) KAY HOFFMAN, JANET KOCH, GARY LEMERT, MARTHA LEMERT, TOMMY MEYER, JEFFERY RAY, JENNIFER RAY, IAN SIEMPLENSKI, DALE SNYDER, MARILYN SNYDER, CATHERINE TAYLOR, LAILA SAEDA URBAN, LAILA (I) SAEDA URBAN, NICOLE WRIGHT-MEYER, KENNETH DALE YODER. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet CIVIL COVER SHEET, # 2 Summons ACORD CORP., # 3 Summons ACUITY, A MUTUAL COMP., # 4 Summons ADDISON INS. CO., # 5 Summons ALL AMERICAN INS. CO., # 6 Summons ALLIANZ AMERICA INC., # 7 Summons ALLIANZ GLOBAL RISKS US INS. CO., # 8 Summons ALLIANZ LIFE INS CO of N. AMERICA, # 9 Summons ALLSTATE INS. CO., # 10 Summons AMERICAN ASSOC of INS SVCS, # 11 Summons AMERICAN AUTO INS. CO., # 12 Summons AMERICAN BANKERS INS. CO. of FL, # 13 Summons AMERICAN FAMILY HOME INS. CO., # 14 Summons AMERICAN INDEMNITY FINANCIAL CORP., # 15 Summons AMERICAN INTERNANTIONAL GROUP, INC., # 16 Summons AMERICAN MODERN HOME INS. CO., # 17 Summons SUMMAMERICAN MODERN INS. GROUP, INC., # 18 Summons SAMERICAN MODERN SELECT INS. CO., # 19 Summons AMERICAN RELIABLE INS. CO., # 20 Summons AMERICAN STRATEGIC INS. CORP., # 21 Summons ASSOC INDEMNITY CORP., # 22 Summons AUTO INS. CO. of HARTFORD CT, # 23 Summons AUTO OWNERS INS. CO., # 24 Summons CASUALTY ACTUARIAL SOCIETY, # 25 Summons CENTRAL MUTUAL INS. CO., # 26 Summons CHUBB CORP., # 27 Summons CHUBB NATIONAL INS. CO., # 28 Summons CHUBB SRVCS. CORP., # 29 Summons CINCINNATI INS. CO., # 30 Summons COLORADO FARM BUREAU MUTUAL INS. CO., # 31 Summons COUNTRY MUTUAL INS. CO., # 32 Summons ELECTRIC INS. CO., # 33 Summons EMPLOYERS MUTUAL CASUALTY CO., # 34 Summons ENCOMPASS INDEMNITY CO., # 35 Summons FARMERS ALLIANCE MUTUAL INS. CO., # 36 Summons FARMERS INS. CO., # 37 Summons FEDERAL INS. CO., # 38 Summons FIDELITY AND DEPOSIT CO., # 39 Summons FIREMANS FUND INS. CO., # 40 Summons FIRST AMERICAN FINANCIAL CORP., # 41 Summons FIRST AMERICAN PROPERTY and CASUALTY INS. CO., # 42 Summons GRANGE INS. ASSOC., # 43 Summons GREAT NORTHERN INS. CO., # 44 Summons GuideOne MUTUAL INS. CO., # 45 Summons HARTFORD ACCIDENT AND INDEMNITY CO., # 46 Summons HARTFORD FIRE INS. CO., # 47 Summons INS. SVCS. OFFICE, INC., # 48 Summons INTERNATIONAL INS. SOCIETY, INC., # 49 Summons KEMPER CORP., # 50 Summons KEMPER CORP. SVCS. INC., # 51 Summons LAFAYETTE INS. CO., # 52 Summons LIBERTY MUTUAL INS. CO., # 53 Summons LIBERTY MUTUAL INS., # 54 Summons LM INS. CORP., # 55 Summons MARKEL AMERICAN INS. CO., # 56 Summons MARKEL INS. CO., # 57 Summons MCKINSEY AND CO., INC., # 58 Summons MCKINSEY AND CO., INC., # 59 Summons MetLife AUTO and HOME INS. AGENCY, INC., # 60 Summons METROPOLITAN DIRECT PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INS. CO., # 61 Summons METROPOLITAIN LIFE INS. CO., # 62 Summons METROPOLITAIN PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INS. CO., # 63 Summons MILBANK INS. CO., # 64 Summons MUNICH AMERICAN HOLDING CORP., # 65 Summons NATIONAL CASUALTY CO., # 66 Summons NATIONAL FARMERS UNION PROPERTY AND CASUALTY CO., # 67 Summons NATIONAL SURETY CORP., # 68 Summons NATIONWIDE AFFINITY INS. CO. of AMERICA, # 69 Summons NATIONWIDE INS. CO. of AMERICA, # 70 Summons NATIONWIDE MUTUAL INS. CO., # 71 Summons OWNERS INS. CO., # 72 Summons PACIFIC INDEMNITY CO., # 73 Summons PHARMACISTS MUTUAL INS. CO., # 74 Summons PRAETORIAN INS. CO., # 75 Summons PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURERS ASSOC. OF AMERICA, # 76 Summons QBE HOLDINGS, INC., # 77 Summons QBE INS. CO., # 78 Summons QBE INS. GROUP LMTD., # 79 Summons SAFECO INS. CO. of AMERICA, # 80 Summons SECURA INS. HOLDINGS INC., # 81 Summons SENTRY INS., # 82 Summons SHELTER MUTUAL INS. CO., # 83 Summons STANDARD FIRE INS. CO., # 84 Summons STATE AUTOMOBILE INS. CO., # 85 Summons STATE FARM FIRE and CASUALTY CO., # 86 Summons STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INS. CO., # 87 Summons STILLWATER PROPERTY and CASUALTY INS. CO., # 88 Summons TEXAS GENERAL INDEMNITY CO., # 89 Summons The BUCKEY STATE MUTUAL INS. CO., # 90 Summons THE CALIFORNIA CASUALTY INDEMNITY EXCHANGE, # 91 Summons THE HARTFORD FINANCIAL SVCS. GROUP, # 92 Summons THE TRAVELERS COMPANIES, INC., # 93 Summons THE TRAVELERS INS. CO., # 94 Summons TRAVELERS COMMERCIAL INS. CO., # 95 Summons TRAVELERS HOME AND MARINE INS. CO., # 96 Summons TRAVELERS INDEMNITY CO. of AMERICA, # 97 Summons TRAVELERS INS. GROUP, INC., # 98 Summons UNITED FIRE AND CASUALTY CO., # 99 Summons UNITED FIRE AND INDEMNITY CO., # 100 Summons UNITED FIRE GROUP, INC., # 101 Summons UNITED FIRE INSURANCE CO., # 102 Summons UNITED FIRE LLOYDS, # 103 Summons UNITED LIFE INS. CO., # 104 Summons UNITED SVCS AUTOMOBILE ASSOC., # 105 Summons UNITED AUTO AND HOME INS. CO., # 106 Summons UNITRIN DIRECT PROPERTY AND CASUALTY CO., # 107 Summons UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOC. CASUALTY INS. CO., # 108 Summons VERISK ANALYTICS, INC., # 109 Summons VIGILANT INS. CO., # 110 Summons ZURICH AMERICAN INS. CO., # 111 Summons ZURICH AMERICAN INS. CO.)(Dougherty, Eddie)
June 21, 2014 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-3925260)Attorney Eddie Gene Dougherty added to party DALE SNYDER(pty:pla), Attorney Eddie Gene Dougherty added to party DALE SNYDER(pty:pla), filed by DALE SNYDER.(Dougherty, Eddie)
June 20, 2014 Filing 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. Text Only Entry. (jofox, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Snyder et al v. Acord Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louise Creager
Represented By: Eddie Gene Dougherty
Represented By: Josue David Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Ann Geldreich
Represented By: Eddie Gene Dougherty
Represented By: Josue David Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dorothy Wood Hammer
Represented By: Eddie Gene Dougherty
Represented By: Josue David Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Harrow
Represented By: Eddie Gene Dougherty
Represented By: Josue David Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sueham Kay Hoffman
Represented By: Eddie Gene Dougherty
Represented By: Josue David Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sueham (I) Kay Hoffman
Represented By: Eddie Gene Dougherty
Represented By: Josue David Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janet Koch
Represented By: Eddie Gene Dougherty
Represented By: Josue David Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Lemert
Represented By: Eddie Gene Dougherty
Represented By: Josue David Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martha Lemert
Represented By: Eddie Gene Dougherty
Represented By: Josue David Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tommy Meyer
Represented By: Eddie Gene Dougherty
Represented By: Josue David Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Ray
Represented By: Eddie Gene Dougherty
Represented By: Josue David Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Ray
Represented By: Eddie Gene Dougherty
Represented By: Josue David Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ian Siemplenski
Represented By: Eddie Gene Dougherty
Represented By: Josue David Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dale Snyder
Represented By: Eddie Gene Dougherty
Represented By: Josue David Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marilyn Snyder
Represented By: Eddie Gene Dougherty
Represented By: Josue David Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catherine Taylor
Represented By: Eddie Gene Dougherty
Represented By: Josue David Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laila Saeda Urban
Represented By: Eddie Gene Dougherty
Represented By: Josue David Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laila (I) Saeda Urban
Represented By: Eddie Gene Dougherty
Represented By: Josue David Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole Wright-Meyer
Represented By: Eddie Gene Dougherty
Represented By: Josue David Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Dale Yoder
Represented By: Eddie Gene Dougherty
Represented By: Josue David Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ken Yoder
Represented By: Eddie Gene Dougherty
Represented By: Josue David Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kate Taylor
Represented By: Eddie Gene Dougherty
Represented By: Josue David Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeff Ray
Represented By: Eddie Gene Dougherty
Represented By: Josue David Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: ABC Insurance Company
Represented By: Lelia Kathleen Chaney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: ABC Organization
Represented By: Lelia Kathleen Chaney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: United Fire & Indemnity Company
Represented By: Jerad A. West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acord Corporation
Represented By: Charles Edmond Fuller
Represented By: Mark Frederick Horning
Represented By: Jeffrey Michael Theodore
Represented By: Frank W. Visciano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acuity, A Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Alan Peter Gregory
Represented By: Jamey William Jamison
Represented By: Gary Lyn Fleming
Represented By: Mark Andrew Sares
Represented By: Thomas Howard Falivene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Addison Insurance Company
Represented By: Lelia Kathleen Chaney
Represented By: Stephanie Natsuko Gaddy
Represented By: Jerad A. West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All American Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company
Represented By: Thomas John Lyons
Represented By: Lisa F. Mickley
Represented By: Lance E. Shurtleff
Represented By: Thomas J. Lyons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allianz Life Insurance Co. of North America
Represented By: Raul A. Cuervo
Represented By: Stephen James Jorden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allianz of America, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas John Lyons
Represented By: Lisa F. Mickley
Represented By: Lance E. Shurtleff
Represented By: Thomas J. Lyons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Insurance Company
Represented By: Sheryl Lynn Anderson
Represented By: Marilyn S. Chappell
Represented By: Richard L. Fenton
Represented By: Mark Lane Hanover
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Association of Insurance Services, Inc.
Represented By: Jessica Lynn Fuller
Represented By: Joel Alan Glover
Represented By: Ashlee Marie Knuckey
Represented By: Rowe Winston Snider
Represented By: Joel A. Glover
Represented By: Julia C. Webb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Thomas John Lyons
Represented By: Lisa F. Mickley
Represented By: Lance E. Shurtleff
Represented By: Thomas J. Lyons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida
Represented By: Erin Frances Frohardt
Represented By: Robert David Helfand
Represented By: John C. Pitblado
Represented By: Terence M. Ridley
Represented By: Evan Bennett Stephenson
Represented By: Erin Frohardt Tatman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Family Home Insurance Company
Represented By: Stephanie Natsuko Gaddy
Represented By: Casie D. Collignon
Represented By: Rodger L. Eckelberry
Represented By: Mark Alan Johnson
Represented By: Paul Gregory Karlsgodt
Represented By: Rand Lawrence McClellan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Family Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Daniel Albert Nicholas Graham
Represented By: Michael S. McCarthy
Represented By: Daniel David Williams
Represented By: Hetal Janak Doshi
Represented By: Margaret Young Cass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Indemnity Financial Corporation
Represented By: Lelia Kathleen Chaney
Represented By: Stephanie Natsuko Gaddy
Represented By: Jerad A. West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American International Group, Inc.
Represented By: Keara M. Gordon
Represented By: William Frederick Jones
Represented By: Eric B. Liebman
Represented By: Sara Z. Moghadam
Represented By: Timothy Michael Swanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Modern Home Insurance Company
Represented By: Casie D. Collignon
Represented By: Rodger L. Eckelberry
Represented By: Mark Alan Johnson
Represented By: Paul Gregory Karlsgodt
Represented By: Rand Lawrence McClellan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Modern Insurance Group, Inc.
Represented By: Casie D. Collignon
Represented By: Rodger L. Eckelberry
Represented By: Mark Alan Johnson
Represented By: Paul Gregory Karlsgodt
Represented By: Rand Lawrence McClellan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Modern Select Insurance Company
Represented By: Casie D. Collignon
Represented By: Rodger L. Eckelberry
Represented By: Mark Alan Johnson
Represented By: Paul Gregory Karlsgodt
Represented By: Rand Lawrence McClellan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Reliable Insurance Company
Represented By: Erin Frances Frohardt
Represented By: Robert David Helfand
Represented By: John C. Pitblado
Represented By: Terence M. Ridley
Represented By: Evan Bennett Stephenson
Represented By: Erin Frohardt Tatman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Strategic Insurance Corp.
Represented By: Alan Peter Gregory
Represented By: Jamey William Jamison
Represented By: Gary Lyn Fleming
Represented By: Mark Andrew Sares
Represented By: Thomas Howard Falivene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Associated Indemnity Corporation
Represented By: Thomas John Lyons
Represented By: Lisa F. Mickley
Represented By: Lance E. Shurtleff
Represented By: Thomas J. Lyons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Auto-Owners Insurance Company
Represented By: Gregory R. Giometti
Represented By: Lori McAllister
Represented By: John David Mereness
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Automobile Insurance Company of Hartford Connecticut
Represented By: Robert Charles Blume
Represented By: Michael Scott Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buckeye State Mutual Insurance Company, The
Represented By: Bradley Lewis Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Casualty Indemnity Exchange, The
Represented By: Casie D. Collignon
Represented By: Paul Gregory Karlsgodt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Casualty Actuarial Society
Represented By: Kathleen Kramer Custer
Represented By: Kevin Christopher McAdam
Represented By: Holly Stein Sollod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Stuart Douglas Morse
Represented By: William M. Savino
Represented By: Jason Douglas Krueger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chubb Corporation, The
Represented By: Jacob C. Cohn
Represented By: John M. Palmeri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chubb National Insurance Company
Represented By: Jacob C. Cohn
Represented By: John M. Palmeri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chubb Services Corporation
Represented By: Jacob C. Cohn
Represented By: John M. Palmeri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cincinnati Insurance Company
Represented By: Casie D. Collignon
Represented By: Rodger L. Eckelberry
Represented By: Mark Alan Johnson
Represented By: Paul Gregory Karlsgodt
Represented By: Rand Lawrence McClellan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colorado Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Co.
Represented By: Ellis Jay Mayer
Represented By: William Arnold Waddell, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Country Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Shannon Marie Bell
Represented By: Chanda Marie Feldkamp
Represented By: R. Livingston Keithley
Represented By: William James Kelly, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Electric Insurance Company
Represented By: Terence M. Ridley
Represented By: Evan Bennett Stephenson
Represented By: Jeremy A. Moseley
Represented By: Michael L. O'Donnell
Represented By: Michael Lawrence O'Donnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Employers Mutual Casualty Company
Represented By: Lelia Kathleen Chaney
Represented By: Stephanie Natsuko Gaddy
Represented By: Jerad A. West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Encompass Indemnity Company
Represented By: Sheryl Lynn Anderson
Represented By: Marilyn S. Chappell
Represented By: Richard L. Fenton
Represented By: Mark Lane Hanover
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets