Kuhlmann v. Norgren, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Hans Kuhlmann
Defendant: Donna Ross, Norgren, Inc. and Donna Ross (I)
Case Number: 1:2014cv01777
Filed: June 26, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Broomfield
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Watanabe
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 5
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 1/16/15. (jdyne, )
September 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE: This matter has been scheduled for a five day jury trial on the docket of Judge R. Brooke Jackson in the U.S. District Courthouse, Courtroom A902, 9th Floor, 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado, to commence on September 21, 2015 at 9:00 a.m. A Trial Preparation Conference is set for July 28, 2015 at 1:30 p.m. Please see the order for additional details. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 09/16/2014. (rbjsec. )
August 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER TO SET SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: This matter comes before the Court sua sponte. In light of the decline of consent to a magistrate judge by one or more of the parties in this case, the Scheduling Conference set August 27, 2014 before Magistrate J udge Michael J. Watanabe is vacated. The parties are ordered to set an initial scheduling conference in this Court (with Judge Jackson) pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.1. The parties are directed to jointly contact Chambers by telephone at (303) 844-4694 or by email at Jackson_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov to obtain a scheduling conference date within 14 days of the date of this order. Please see the order for additional details. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 08/07/2014. (rbjsec.)
July 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE AND SETTING DEADLINE FOR FILING OF PILOT PROGRAM CONSENT FORM. Scheduling Conference set for 8/27/2014 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. Consent Form due by 8/13/2014. by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 7/2/2014. (emill)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kuhlmann v. Norgren, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donna Ross
Represented By: Janet Ann Savage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norgren, Inc.
Represented By: Janet Ann Savage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donna Ross (I)
Represented By: Janet Ann Savage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hans Kuhlmann
Represented By: Michael S. Porter
Represented By: Richard C. LaFond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?