Armijo v. Star Farms, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Juana Armijo
Defendant: Star Farms, Inc. and Angelo Palombo
Case Number: 1:2014cv01785
Filed: June 27, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Watanabe
Nature of Suit: Agricultural Acts
Cause of Action: 28:1854
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER ON JOINT MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF COLLECTIVE AND CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT: The Court hereby GRANTS the Joint Motion for Preliminary Approval of Proposed Class Action Settlement 72 and Supplement to the Joint Motion for Preliminary Approval 78 subject to any conditions set forth in this Order. by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 2/9/16.(msksec, )
January 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 75 MINUTE ENTRY for Law and Motion Hearing held before Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 1/13/2016. 47 Motion to Certify Class is GRANTED; 48 Motion to Certify Class is DENIED. Court Reporter: Terri Lindblom. (pglov)
December 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER ON JOINT MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF COLLECTIVE AND CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT: The Court defers ruling on the Joint Motion for Preliminary Approval of Proposed Class Action Settlement 72 pending clarification and modification of the not ice, claim and objection procedures. The Parties shall jointly contact chambers at 303-335-2289 within 7 days of the date of this Order to set a hearing date to address notice and other issues. by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 12/14/15. Text Only Entry(msksec, )
June 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 60 PROTECTIVE ORDER Entered by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 6/25/2015. (emill)
January 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 44 MINUTE ORDER granting 42 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Amend Scheduling Order Deadlines for Class Discovery and Class Motion Filing. Discovery due by 3/6/2015. Dispositive Motions/collective action and class certification due by 4/3/2015. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 1/22/2015.(emill)
January 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MINUTE ORDER granting 37 Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 1/07/2015.(slibi, )
November 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MINUTE ORDER granting in part and denying in part 34 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Stay Scheduling Order. Granted insofar as it seeks relief from the current scheduling order deadlines; Denied insofar as it seeks an indefinite stay of proceedings. Scheduling Order RE: Class Certification Only 30 is amended. Discovery due by 1/9/2015. Dispositive Motions/Collective action and class certification due by 2/2/2015. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 11/12/2014.(emill)
August 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 31 TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER - CIVIL by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 8/27/14. (msksec, )
August 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MINUTE ORDER denying as moot 17 Unopposed Motion to Vacate and Reschedule Scheduling Conference; denying 18 Amended Motion to Vacate and Reschedule Scheduling Conference, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 8/21/2014.(slibi, )
July 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER granting 7 plaintiff's Renewed Motion for Service by U.S. Marshals, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 7/2/2014.(emill)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Armijo v. Star Farms, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juana Armijo
Represented By: Alexander Neville Hood
Represented By: Edward Frank Siegel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Star Farms, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angelo Palombo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?