Barajas v. Falk et al
Petitioner: Jesse Barajas
Respondent: Francis Falk and Attorney General of the State of Colorado, The
Case Number: 1:2014cv01827
Filed: July 1, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Lincoln
Presiding Judge: Kathleen M. Tafoya
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 40 SUPPLEMENTAL FINDINGS RE ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO FILE APPEAL OUT OF TIME re: 38 Order. ORDERED that the time to appeal should be reopened pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 4(a)(6). ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall supplement the preliminary record on appeal by transmitting to the Tenth Circuit Court of Appeals a copy of this order. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 12/15/2015. (agarc, )
November 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER. ORDERED that Applicant's Motion to Supplement Record With Prison Mail Log 35 is GRANTED. ORDERED that Applicant's Motion to File/Accept Notice of Appeal Out-of-Time 30 is GRANTED. Applicant's Notice of Appeal filed on September 8, 2015 26 is deemed to be timely filed. ORDERED that the Clerk of Court provide the Court of Appeals with a copy of this Order. Signed by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 11/03/15.(jhawk, )
July 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER ON APPLICATION FOR A WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 7/29/15. ORDERED: The Amended Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 2254 8 is DENIED. (kpreu)
July 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Drawing Case by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 7/30/14. (dkals, )
July 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER To Respondents to File Pre-Answer Response, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 07/21/14. (nmarb, )
July 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Directing Applicant To Cure Deficiencies, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 07/01/14. (nmarb, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barajas v. Falk et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jesse Barajas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Francis Falk
Represented By: Christine Cates Brady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Colorado, The
Represented By: Christine Cates Brady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?