Harbinger Capital Partners LLC et al v. Ergen et al
Plaintiff: Harbinger Capital Partners LLC, HGW US Holding Company LP, Blue Line DZM Corp. and Harbinger Capital Partners SP, Inc.
Defendant: Charles W. Ergen, DISH Network Corporation, L-Band Acquisition LLC, SP Special Opportunities LLC, Sound Point Capital Management LP, Stephen Ketchum and Special Opportunties Holdings LLC
Case Number: 1:2014cv01907
Filed: July 8, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: William J. Martinez
Presiding Judge: Kathleen M. Tafoya
Nature of Suit: Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause of Action: 18:1962
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 73 FINAL JUDGMENT. re: 72 by Clerk on 5/27/2015. (dhans, )
April 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER granting 39 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Complaint. This dismissal is without prejudice to Harbinger re-filing its claims in an appropriate forum. The Clerk SHALL TERMINATE this case. By Judge William J. Martinez on 4/28/2015.(alowe)
March 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER granting 45 Defendants' Motion to Stay Pending Resolution of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Complaint. All discovery and deadlines in the case are STAYED pending ruling on the Motion to Dismiss. The parties shall file a joint status report within ten days of ruling on the Motion to Dismiss to advise if a scheduling conference should be set. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 3/10/2015. (alowe)
September 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 38 AMENDED ORDER Resetting Scheduling Conference for 11/20/2014 09:45 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 9/22/14. (sgrim)
July 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 10/9/2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 7/14/14. (sgrim)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harbinger Capital Partners LLC et al v. Ergen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harbinger Capital Partners LLC
Represented By: Paul J. Burgo
Represented By: Marc E. Kasowitz
Represented By: Jason M. Lynch
Represented By: Christine A. Montenegro
Represented By: Daniel M. Reilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HGW US Holding Company LP
Represented By: Paul J. Burgo
Represented By: Marc E. Kasowitz
Represented By: Jason M. Lynch
Represented By: Christine A. Montenegro
Represented By: Daniel M. Reilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blue Line DZM Corp.
Represented By: Paul J. Burgo
Represented By: Marc E. Kasowitz
Represented By: Jason M. Lynch
Represented By: Christine A. Montenegro
Represented By: Daniel M. Reilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harbinger Capital Partners SP, Inc.
Represented By: Paul J. Burgo
Represented By: Marc E. Kasowitz
Represented By: Jason M. Lynch
Represented By: Christine A. Montenegro
Represented By: Daniel M. Reilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles W. Ergen
Represented By: Hugh Q. Gottschalk
Represented By: LaMar Fredrick Jost
Represented By: Kenneth Edward Stalzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DISH Network Corporation
Represented By: John V. McDermott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L-Band Acquisition LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SP Special Opportunities LLC
Represented By: Hugh Q. Gottschalk
Represented By: LaMar Fredrick Jost
Represented By: Kenneth Edward Stalzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sound Point Capital Management LP
Represented By: Charles E. Bachman
Represented By: Andrew J. Frackman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Ketchum
Represented By: Charles E. Bachman
Represented By: Andrew J. Frackman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Special Opportunties Holdings LLC
Represented By: Hugh Q. Gottschalk
Represented By: LaMar Fredrick Jost
Represented By: Kenneth Edward Stalzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?