March 7, 2016 |
Filing
192
ORDER ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSING PENDING APPEAL that all pending motions, including those docketed as 87 , 88 , 89 , 133 , 154 , and 174 are denied without prejudice, subject to renewal if this case again is set for trial before this court; tha t under D.C.COLO.LCivR 41.2, this action is closed administratively; and that under D.C.COLO.LCivR 41.2, the clerk is directed to close this civil action administratively, subject to reopening for good cause. Signed by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 3/7/2016. (cmira)
|
August 21, 2015 |
Filing
186
ORDER finding as moot 174 179 Motion to Quash; granting 178 Motion to Vacate Trial Setting and Stay Proceedings Pending Appeal. That the jury trial scheduled to commence August 24, 2015, is vacated and continued without date, pending further o rder. That all subpoenas issued in connection with the trial of this case are quashed.That all other pending motions to quash are denied as moot. This matter is stayed, pending resolution of defendants' appeal of the 175 Order Concerning Motion for Summary Judgment. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 8/21/2015.(mlace, )
|
August 18, 2015 |
Filing
175
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 106 Motion for Summary Judgment is granted to the extent the defendants seek a judgment holding that they are entitled to immunity under 47 U.S.C. § 230 and to the extent the defendants seek a judgment holding that the fair report privilege shields them from the claims of the plaintiff. Otherwise, 106 Motion for Summary Judgment is denied. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 8/18/2015.(mlace, )
|
July 31, 2015 |
Filing
157
COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer: Telephone Motion Hearing held on 7/31/2015. Granting 137 Motion to Strike. The court is not awarding fees and costs. FTR: Courtroom A-402. (amont, )
|
April 16, 2015 |
Filing
104
COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer: Motion Hearing held on 4/16/2015. Denying 95 Motion to Strike. Plaintiff may propound 5 additional requests for production. The requests for produc tion must be sent to defense counsel and the court by April 17, 2015 at 5:00 p.m. Telephonic Status Conference set for 4/20/2015 03:30 PM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer to discuss the requests for production. parties participating in the hearing shall initiate a conference call among themselves and call the court (303.844.2117) at the scheduled time. FTR: Courtroom A-402. (amont, )
|
March 5, 2015 |
Filing
80
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer: Motion Hearing held on 3/5/2015. Granting 63 Motion for Protective Order. Granting 77 Motion for Leave to Restrict. A Telephonic Status Conference set for 3/6/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer. Parties participating in the hearing shall initiate a conference call among themselves and call the court (303.844.2117) at the scheduled time. FTR: Courtroom A-402. (amont)
|
February 24, 2015 |
Filing
66
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer: Motion Hearing held on 2/24/2015. Granting 58 Motion to Compel. The court awards fees and costs in favor of the Plaintiff in the amount of $750 and the amount is due no later than two weeks from today's date. FTR: Courtroom A-402. (amont)
|
February 2, 2015 |
Filing
48
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer: Motion Hearing held on 2/2/2015. ORDERED: Mr. Gringras' oral motion is GRANTED and MOTION 19 to Dismiss Complaint is WITHDRAWN without prejudice. MOTION 37 to Amend Complaint is GRANTED. The Plaintiff shall file the amended complaint by February 3, 2015. FTR: Courtroom A-402. (amont)
|
December 2, 2014 |
Filing
41
PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 12/2/14. ORDERED that when filing documents under seal parties MUST fully comply with the requirements of D.C.ColoL.CivR. 7.2. (cbssec)
|
October 7, 2014 |
Filing
32
TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER: Proposed Pretrial Order due by 7/31/2015. Final Pretrial Conference and Trial Preparation Conference are set 8/7/2015 10:30 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Four (4) day Jury Trial set 8/24/2015 08:30 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 10/7/14. (rebsec)
|