Garza v. Western Stone of Lyons, LLC et al.

Defendant: Western Stone of Lyons, LLC and Paul W. Frysig
Plaintiff: Eloy Garza
Case Number: 1:2014cv01953
Filed: July 14, 2014
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Boulder
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 15:2
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 16, 2015 73 Opinion or Order of the Court TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/9/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Eight (8) day Jury Trial set for 9/19/2016 08:30 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Trial Preparation Conference set for 9/9/2016 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 10/16/2015. (mlace, )
August 19, 2015 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING RULE 16(b) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 8/19/15. A Scheduling Conference is set for 9/16/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. The parties shall submit their proposed scheduling order, including a copy of the proposed scheduling order in a Word format sent via email to Wang_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov, seven days prior to the Scheduling Conference. (bsimm, )
July 9, 2015 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Adopting Recommendation of the United States Magistrate Judge 51 , filed June 24, 2015, is approved and adopted as an order of this court. That the Defendants Motion To Dismiss Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint [#45] filed December 29, 2014, is denied. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 7/9/2015.(mlace, )
December 15, 2014 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot 40 Motion to Dismiss. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 12/15/2014. (alowe)
November 20, 2014 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 33 RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE: The Motion to Dismiss is DENIED. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 11/20/2014.(alowe)
October 27, 2014 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 29 Motion to Strike Answer and Motion to Dismiss. The Answer [Doc. # 25 ] and the Motion to Dismiss [Doc. # 26 ] are STRICKEN insofar as they are submitted on behalf of Western Stone. Western Stone, through counsel. must answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint on or before 11/10/2014. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 10/27/2014.(alowe)
September 16, 2014 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 19 Motion for Service by US Marshals at No Cost Pursuant to 28 USC § 1915. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 9/16/2014.(alowe)
September 5, 2014 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 16 Motion for Service by US Marshals at No Cost. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 9/5/2014.(alowe )
August 18, 2014 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Drawing Case; This case shall be drawn to a presiding judge and, if applicable, to a magistrate judge, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 8/18/14. (morti, )
July 15, 2014 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Directing Plaintiff to Cure Deficiencies, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 7/15/14. (morti, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garza v. Western Stone of Lyons, LLC et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Stone of Lyons, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul W. Frysig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eloy Garza
Represented By: Alexander Neville Hood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?