Hendrickson v. Doyle
Plaintiff: C. Vance Hendrickson
Defendant: Thomas Doyle
Case Number: 1:2014cv02013
Filed: July 21, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: William J. Martinez
Presiding Judge: Kristen L. Mix
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER denying 35 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, This matter REMAINS SET for a 5-day jury trial beginning on May 23, 2016, with a Final Trial Preparation Conference on May 17, 2016, at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom A801, by Judge William J. Martinez on 12/11/2015.(cthom, )
May 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting 23 Motion to Amend Complaint to Add Claim for Exemplary Damages. The Court accepts Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint [#23-11] for filing as of the date of this Order. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 5/4/2015. (alowe)
October 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 10/2/14. (lgale)
September 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER Denying Without Prejudice 13 Plaintiffs Motion for Entry of Stipulated Protective Order, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 9/29/2014.(evana, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hendrickson v. Doyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Doyle
Represented By: Billy-George Hertzke
Represented By: Jessica Rae Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C. Vance Hendrickson
Represented By: James E. Gigax
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?