Travelers Indemnity Company of America, The v. BonBeck Parker, LLC et al
Plaintiff: |
Travelers Indemnity Company of America, The |
Defendant: |
BonBeck Parker, LLC and BonBeck HL, LLC |
Case Number: |
1:2014cv02059 |
Filed: |
July 24, 2014 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Colorado |
Office: |
Denver Office |
County: |
XX US, Outside State |
Presiding Judge: |
Michael J. Watanabe |
Nature of Suit: |
Insurance |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1332 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
April 23, 2020 |
Filing
202
ORDER denying as moot 189 , 190 , 191 , and 192 Motions in Limine, and granting 196 Motion for Order. Judgment shall enter pursuant to this order and 194 . Entered by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 4/23/2020. (cpear)
|
February 3, 2020 |
Filing
194
ORDER. Travelers' 139 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. Bonbeck's 137 Motion for Partial is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. Bonbecks Count III for bad faith breach of contract is hereby DISMISSED WI THOUT PREJUDICE nunc pro tunc to the 13th day of March, 2019; and the parties shall confer prior to the Trial Preparation Conference and be prepared to discuss what remains for trial at the conference. By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 02/03/2020. (rvill, )
|
February 20, 2015 |
Filing
50
MINUTE ORDER granting 47 parties' Joint Motion for Entry of Stay. Discovery and other proceedings in this case are STAYED pending a ruling on the parties' motions for partial summary judgment 31 and 41 . Status Report due by 8/31/2015. Should a ruling be entered before 8/31/ 2015, parties to file a proposed amended scheduling order within 14 days of such ruling. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 2/20/2015. (emill)
|
January 8, 2015 |
Filing
33
MINUTE ORDER granting in part and denying in part 28 Defendant/Counter Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Compliance with Rule 26(a)(1)(A)(iv); To Compel Production of Information Redacted in Plaintiff/Counter Defendant's Rule 26(a)(1)(A)(ii); and Request for In Camera Inspection. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 1/8/2015.(emill)
|
July 25, 2014 |
Filing
4
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE AND SETTING DEADLINE FOR FILING OF PILOT PROGRAM CONSENT FORM. On or before 9/10/2014, parties shall complete and file the Pilot Program Consent Form 3 . Scheduling Conference set for 9/24/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. Consent Form due by 9/10/2014. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 7/25/2014. (emill)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?