Hicks v. Massenburg et al
Plaintiff: Edward Lee Hicks
Defendant: Alvin Massenburg, Nicole Blatnick, Trudy Sicotte, Valentina Kucher, Jennifer Novatny, Rick Raemisch, Martinez, Alvin (I) Massenburg, Nicole (I) Blatnick, Trudy (I) Sicotte, Martinez (I), Jennifer (I) Novatny, Rick (I) Raemisch and Valentina Kucher (I)
Case Number: 1:2014cv02331
Filed: August 21, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Lincoln
Presiding Judge: Raymond P. Moore
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER ADOPTING RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE 79 . CDOC Defendants Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint 27 is GRANTED as stated herein, Plaintiffs claims against the CDOC Defendants ARE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Plaintiffs clai ms against the CDOC Defendants in their official capacities for prospective injunctive relief are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS MOOT as to Defendants Massenburg, Blatnick, and Kucher as Plaintiff is no longer incarcerated at the Limon Correctional F acility. Plaintiffs remaining claims against the CDOC Defendants are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE for failure to state a claim under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) and there being no further claims against the CDOC Defendants, this matter shall proceed only against Defendant Trudy Sicotte, who filed an Answer on October 20, 2014 22 , by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 10/02/2015.(cthom, )
September 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER Setting Preliminary Scheduling Conference for 10/28/2015 09:30 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Plaintiff, or his case manager, shall arrange for his participation via telephone and shall call (303) 335-2780 at the scheduled time, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 9/10/15. (sgrim)
February 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER; 35 CDOC Defendants' Motion to Vacate the January 21, 2015 Scheduling Conference and Stay Discovery is GRANTED. All proceedings inthis matter are hereby STAYED pending ruling on Defendants Motion to Dismiss. The defendants shall file status report within seven days of a ruling on Defendants Motion to Dismiss, if any portion of the case remains pending, to advise if the Scheduling Conference should be reset, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 2/25/15.(morti, )
December 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER Setting Preliminary Scheduling Conference for 1/21/2015 09:45 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 12/3/14. (sgrim)
August 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER denying 7 (MOTION) Letter requesting Prisoner Complaint packet, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 8/29/2014.(slibi, )
August 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to File Amended Complaint, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 8/22/2014. (slibi, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hicks v. Massenburg et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Lee Hicks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alvin Massenburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicole Blatnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trudy Sicotte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valentina Kucher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Novatny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick Raemisch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alvin (I) Massenburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicole (I) Blatnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trudy (I) Sicotte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martinez (I)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer (I) Novatny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick (I) Raemisch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valentina Kucher (I)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?