USA v. $8,374.00 in United States Currency
Plaintiff: USA
Defendant: $8,374.00 in United States Currency
Case Number: 1:2014cv02333
Filed: August 21, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Michael E. Hegarty
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 37 Final JUDGMENT by Clerk in favor of USA, Dowinder Boparai against $7,000.00 in United States Currency, on 9/01/2015. (slibi, )
August 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 36 FINAL ORDER of Forfeiture, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 8/31/2015. (slibi, )
November 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MINUTE ORDER granting 18 Unopposed Motion to Stay Proceedings. The parties shall file a joint status report on the fifteenth day of each month while the case is stayed, beginning on 1/15/2015, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 11/26/2014.(slibi, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. $8,374.00 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $8,374.00 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: Tonya Shotwell Andrews(Designation Federal Agency Attorney)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?