USA v. Bushman et al
Plaintiff: USA
Defendant: MetLife Home Loans LLC, JP Morgan Chase & Co., Federal National Mortgage Association and Shannon E. Bushman
Case Number: 1:2014cv02340
Filed: August 22, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Douglas
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Watanabe
Nature of Suit: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
Cause of Action: 26:7401
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting 38 Motion to Dismiss Party Party Federal National Mortgage Association terminated. by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 1/14/15.(jdyne, )
December 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER TO SET SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: This matter comes before the Court sua sponte. In light of the decline of consent to a magistrate judge by one or more of the parties in this case, the Scheduling Conference set December 17, 2014 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe has been vacated. The parties are ordered to set an initial scheduling conference in this Court (with Judge Jackson) pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.1. Each partys lead trial counsel shall attend t he conference. The conference shall be held in Courtroom A-902, Alfred A. Arraj U.S. Courthouse, 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado. The parties are directed to jointly contact Chambers by telephone at (303) 844-4694 or by email at Jackson_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov to obtain a scheduling conference date within 14 days of the date of this order. See order for details. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 12/19/2014. (rbjsec. )
August 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE AND SETTING DEADLINE FOR FILING OF PILOT PROGRAM CONSENT FORM. On or before 10/14/2014, parties shall complete and file the Pilot Program Consent Form 3 . Scheduling Conference set for 10/27/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. Consent Form due by 10/14/2014. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 8/25/2014. (emill)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. Bushman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MetLife Home Loans LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase & Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal National Mortgage Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shannon E. Bushman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: Lindsay Laurie Clayton(Designation Federal Agency Attorney)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?