Warner v. Aurora Public Schools

Plaintiff: Ann Warner
Defendant: Aurora Public Schools
Case Number: 1:2014cv02359
Filed: August 26, 2014
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Arapahoe
Presiding Judge: Kristen L. Mix
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12112
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 14, 2016 52 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER Due to a conflict in the Court's calendar, the April 14, 2016, trial preparation conference and the April 18, 2016, trial date are vacated. The trial is rescheduled for September 26, 2016, at 8:30 a.m. in Courtroom A, Second Floor, the Byron White United States Courthouse, 1823 Stout Street, Denver, Colorado, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 4/14/16. (ktera)
January 5, 2016 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE This matter is set for trial to jury on April 18, 2016, at 8:30 a.m., in Courtroom A, Second Floor, the Byron White United States Courthouse, 1823 Stout Street, Denver, Colorado, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 1/5/16. (ktera)
November 16, 2015 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE A pretrial conference is scheduled for January 5, 2016, at 10:00 a.m. in the Conference Room, Second Floor, the Byron White United States Courthouse, 1823 Stout Street, Denver, Colorado. The proposed Final Pret rial Order, original only, shall be delivered in paper form directly to chambers by 4:00 p.m. on December 30, 2015. The conference is conducted with lead counsel present in person. No parties or representatives of parties will be permitted to attend, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 11/16/15. (ktera)
November 10, 2015 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 34 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 11/10/15. (ktera)
June 5, 2015 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 26 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel, filed May 14, 2015, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 6/5/15. (ktera)
March 18, 2015 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Vacating Order of Reference to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix regarding 12 Order, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 3/18/15. (ktera)
February 18, 2015 22 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 2/18/2015. (evana, )
February 4, 2015 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 3/17/2015 02:30 PM in the Conference Room, Second Floor, the Byron White United States Courthouse, 1823 Stout Street, Denver, Colorado. The proposed order (original only) on paper, shall be submitted directly to chambers by 4:00 p.m. on March 12, 2015. by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 2/4/2015. (evana, )
December 8, 2014 18 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER denying 16 Plaintiffs Motion For Leave to Have Her Husband, Michael Warner, Attend the Settlement Conference, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 12/8/2014.(evana, )
November 24, 2014 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Vacating 4 Scheduling/Planning Conference set for January 6, 2015 and REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix for Settlement Conference re 9 Joint MOTION, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 11/24/2014. (jsmit)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Warner v. Aurora Public Schools
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ann Warner
Represented By: Ralph Emerson Lamar, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aurora Public Schools
Represented By: Mary Gwyneth Whalen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?