Valley Equipment Leasing, Inc. v. McGriff, Seibels & Williams of Oregon, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Valley Equipment Leasing, Inc.
Defendant: McGriff, Seibels & Williams of Oregon, Inc. and Ryan Erickson
Case Number: 1:2014cv02383
Filed: August 27, 2014
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Adams
Presiding Judge: Christine M. Arguello
Referring Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 28, 2016 115 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED FINAL JUDGMENT in favor of Defendants McGriff, Seibels & Williams of Oregon, Inc. and Ryan Erickson and against Plaintiff Valley Equipment Leasing, Inc., by Clerk on 4/28/2016, by Clerk on 4/28/2016. (Amended to correct month of Judgment) (vbarn)
April 21, 2016 111 Opinion or Order of the Court COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for Motion Hearing held before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 4/21/2016. On or before April 28, 2016, Plaintiff shall send directly to chambers the January 17, 2014 email for in camera review. Taking under advisement 102 Defendants' Motion for Sanctions for Spoliation of Evidence. FTR: NYW Courtroom C-204. (ebuch)
August 27, 2015 67 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 65 Parties' Third Joint Motion to Amend the Scheduling Order, by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 08/27/15.(nmarb, )
June 16, 2015 61 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 6/16/15. IT IS ORDERED that the Joint Motion Re ESI Test Searches 59 is GRANTED and the proposed protocol as set forth therein is adopted as an Order of the court. (bsimm, )
May 22, 2015 55 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 53 Motion to Amend/Correct/Modify Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 8/28/2015. Dispositive Motions due by 9/29/2015. Further status conference set for 6/9/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom C205 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. By Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 5-22-15. (nywlc2).
March 31, 2015 50 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 47 Motion to Amend/Correct/Modify. Discovery due by 6/30/2015. Dispositive Motions due by 7/31/2015. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 9/23/2015. Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/30/2015 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. By Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 03/31/2015. (athom, )
February 23, 2015 42 Opinion or Order of the Court COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for Motion Hearing held on 2/23/2015 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y Wang. Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint 28 is GRANTED; and Plaintiff shall file the proposed First Amended Complaint, tendered as [28-6], in clean form on 2/24/2015. FTR: Courtroom C-205. (bsimm, )
October 15, 2014 23 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 10/15/2014. (athom, )
September 10, 2014 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING RULE 16(b) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND RULE 26(f) PLANNING MEETING by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 9/10/14. Scheduling Conference set for 10/16/2014 02:30 PM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland. (bsimm, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Valley Equipment Leasing, Inc. v. McGriff, Seibels & Williams of Oregon, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valley Equipment Leasing, Inc.
Represented By: Douglas Warner Colville
Represented By: Michael Wayne Reagor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McGriff, Seibels & Williams of Oregon, Inc.
Represented By: Jose Antonio Ramirez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Erickson
Represented By: Jose Antonio Ramirez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?