Brumfiel v. U.S. Bank, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: Lisa Kay Brumfiel
Defendant: U.S. Bank, N.A., Select Portfolio Servicing Inc and Bank of America N.A.
Case Number: 1:2014cv02453
Filed: September 3, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Arapahoe
Presiding Judge: Michael E. Hegarty
Presiding Judge: William J. Martinez
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 71 MINUTE ORDER granting in part and denying in part 68 Unopposed Motion for Clarification. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 2/9/2015.(alowe)
January 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER denying 58 Motion for Order Declaring Lisa Kay Brumfiel a Vexatious Litigant by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 1/28/2015.(mdave)
January 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 63 COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty taking under advisement 58 Motion for Order to Declare Lisa Kay Brumfiel a Vexatious Litigant and Imposing Pro Se Filing LimitationS; Motion Hearing held on 1/15/2015. FTR: Courtroom A 501. (mdave, )
December 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 57 FINAL JUDGMENT by Clerk re: 56 Order Adopting in Part and Rejecting in Part the Report and Recommendation of the United States Magistrate Judge. By Clerk on 12/12/2014. (alowe)
December 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER adopting in part Report and Recommendation of the United States Magistrate Judge. The Recommendation is ADOPTED IN PART as to the Colorado River doctrine and REJECTED IN PART as to the Younger abstention doctrine. Defendants' 10 Motion to Dismiss Complaint is GRANTED and Plaintiff's claims are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for lack of jurisdiction. By Judge William J. Martinez on 12/11/2014. (alowe)
November 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 55 MINUTE ORDER granting 53 Motion to Vacate Scheduling Conference. The scheduling conference set for 12/3/2014 at 10:45 AM is vacated. The Court will reset the Scheduling Conference, if necessary, upon the District Court's ruling on this Court's Recommendation to dismiss the case. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 11/26/2014.(alowe)
November 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Motion to Remove and Consolidate State Court Unlawful Detainer Proceeding by Judge William J. Martinez on 11/14/14.(jhawk, )
November 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 45 MINUTE ORDER granting 37 Motion to Clarify the Notice of Removal in State Court to Federal Court. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 11/6/2014.(alowe)
October 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MINUTE ORDER denying 22 Motion to Accept and Consolidate Under Rule 42 without prejudice with leave to refile upon proper notice of removal, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 10/21/2014.(agarc, )
October 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MINUTE ORDER denying 21 Emergency Motion to Stay Proceedings, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 10/20/2014.(agarc, )
September 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Denying as Moot 3 Plaintiffs Ex Parte Application for Temporary Restraining Order and Request for Order to Show Cause Why a Preliminary Injunction Should Not Be Issued Prohibiting Defendant from Selling Real Property Pending Trial, by Judge William J. Martinez on 9/8/2014.(evana, )
September 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 10/30/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 9/5/2014. (evana, ) (Modified on 9/5/2014 This is a Docketing error and NOT a part of this case)(evana, ).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brumfiel v. U.S. Bank, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Kay Brumfiel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Sean Michael Hanlon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Select Portfolio Servicing Inc
Represented By: Sean Michael Hanlon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America N.A.
Represented By: Sean Michael Hanlon
Represented By: James N. Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?