Sutton v. Thiebout et al
Plaintiff: Kalen McKee, Joshua Sutton and Isha Roberts
Defendant: Stephen Talbot, Gary Roybal, Robert Houton, Thomas Flesher, Bill Thiebout, Amiel Markenson and Kathy Mora
Case Number: 1:2014cv02579
Filed: September 17, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Kit Carson
Presiding Judge: Lewis T Babcock
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2014. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER denying as moot #15 Motion to Dismiss by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 12/11/14.(dkals, )
December 10, 2014 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss by Plaintiff Joshua Sutton. (dkals, )
December 8, 2014 Filing 14 JUDGMENT pursuant to #13 Order of Dismissal by Clerk on 12/8/14. (dkals, )
December 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER dismissing this action without prejudice, and denying leave to proceed in forma pampers on appeal, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 12/8/14. (dkals, )
November 14, 2014 Filing 12 CASE REASSIGNED. This case is reassigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher.All future pleadings should be designated as 14-cv-02579-GPG. (Text Only Entry) (kweck)
November 6, 2014 Filing 11 NOTICE of Change of Address/Contact Information, by Plaintiff Joshua Sutton. (nmarb, )
October 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER denying as moot #9 Motion To Join, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 10/29/14.(nmarb, )
October 28, 2014 Filing 9 MOTION To Join and Notice of New Address at D.R.D.C., by Plaintiff Joshua Sutton. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(nmarb, )
October 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 10/28/14. The Clerk of the Court is directed to note the Docket in this case with the new address Plaintiff provided in his other two cases and resend to Plaintiff a copy of the Order to File an Amended Complaint, ECF No. 7. Plaintiff shall have thirty days from the date of this Minute Order to comply with the October 27, 2014 Order. (nmarb, )
October 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Directing Plaintiff Sutton to File Amended Complaint and Dismissing Plaintiffs Roberts and Mckee by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 10/27/14. (dkals, )
October 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 10/23/14 granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall send a copy of this Order to DOC_inmateaccounts@state.co.us.(nmarb, )
October 15, 2014 Filing 5 Inmate Trust Fund Account STATEMENT and Amendment in Response to re #4 Order, by Plaintiff Joshua Sutton. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(slibi, )
September 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Directing Plaintiffs To Cure Deficiencies, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 09/18/14. (nmarb, )
September 17, 2014 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland. Text Only Entry (sphil )
September 17, 2014 Filing 2 Prisoner's MOTION and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Under 28 U.S.C. 1915 by Plaintiff Joshua Sutton. (sphil, )
September 17, 2014 Filing 1 Prisoner COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Kalen McKee, Isha Roberts, Joshua Sutton. (Attachments: #1 Continuation of Main Document, #2 Envelope)(sphil, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sutton v. Thiebout et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Talbot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Roybal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Houton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Flesher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill Thiebout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amiel Markenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathy Mora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kalen McKee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Sutton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Isha Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?