Sutton et al v. Roberts et al
Plaintiff: Isha Roberts and Joshua Sutton
Defendant: Daniel Mariano, Peter Wiedmeyer, Marilyn Gifford, Atelle Jones, Gary Wyberg, Debra Tota, Debrah Romano, Bill Thiebout, Jeff Chostner and Mason Kate
Case Number: 1:2014cv02586
Filed: September 17, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Kit Carson
Presiding Judge: Lewis T Babcock
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - Civil Rights (U.S. not a defendant)
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2014. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MINUTE ORDER denying as moot #16 Motion to Dismiss by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 12/11/14.(dkals, )
December 10, 2014 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss by Plaintiff Joshua Sutton. (dkals, )
December 8, 2014 Filing 15 JUDGMENT pursuant to #14 Order of Dismissal by Clerk on 12/8/14. (dkals, )
December 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER dismissing this action without prejudice, and denying leave to proceed in forma pampers on appeal, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 12/8/14. (dkals, )
November 14, 2014 Filing 13 CASE REASSIGNED. This case is reassigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher.All future pleadings should be designated as 14-cv-02586-GPG. (Text Only Entry) (kweck)
November 6, 2014 Filing 12 NOTICE of Change of Address by Plaintiff Joshua Sutton. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(nmarb, )
October 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINITE ORDER denying as moot #10 Motion To Join, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 10/29/14.(nmarb, )
October 28, 2014 Filing 10 MOTION To Join and Notice of New Address at D.R.D.C., by Plaintiff Joshua Sutton. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(nmarb, )
October 28, 2014 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of Service by Mail by Clerk of Court of #8 Minute Order, #7 Order, to: Joshua Sutton, #96416, Denver Reception & Diagnostic Center (DRDC), P.O. Box 392004, 10900 Smith Road, Denver, CO 80239. Text Only Entry (nmarb, )
October 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 10/28/14. The Clerk of the Court is directed to note the Docket in this case with the new address plaintiff provided in his other two cases and resend to Plaintiff a copy of the Order to File an Amended Complaint, ECF No. 7. Plaintiff shall have thirty days from the date of this Minute Order to comply with the October 27, 2014 Order. (nmarb, )
October 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Directing Plaintiff Sutton to File Amended Complaint and Dismissing Plaintiff Roberts by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 10/27/14. (dkals, )
October 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 10/23/14 granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall send a copy of this Order to DOC_inmateaccounts@state.co.us.(nmarb, )
October 16, 2014 Filing 5 Statement and Amendment In RESPONSE to #4 Order to Cure Deficiencies, by Plaintiff Joshua Sutton. (Attachments: #1 Continuation of Main Document, #2 Continuation of Main Document, #3 Continuation of Main Document, #4 Continuation of Main Document, #5 Continuation of Main Document, #6 Continuation of Main Document, #7 Envelope)(nmarb, )
September 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Directing Plaintiffs To Cure Deficiencies, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 09/18/14. (nmarb, )
September 18, 2014 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland. Text Only Entry (sphil, )
September 17, 2014 Filing 2 Prisoner's MOTION and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Under 28 U.S.C. 1915 by Plaintiff Joshua Sutton. (sphil, )
September 17, 2014 Filing 1 Prisoner COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Isha Roberts, Joshua Sutton. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(sphil, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sutton et al v. Roberts et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Mariano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Wiedmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marilyn Gifford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atelle Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Wyberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debra Tota
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debrah Romano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill Thiebout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Chostner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mason Kate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Isha Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Sutton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?