Phelps Oil and Gas, LLC v. Noble Energy, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: |
Phelps Oil and Gas, LLC |
Defendant: |
Noble Energy, Inc. and DCP Midstream, LP |
Case Number: |
1:2014cv02604 |
Filed: |
September 19, 2014 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Colorado |
Office: |
Denver Office |
County: |
Denver |
Presiding Judge: |
Robert E. Blackburn |
Presiding Judge: |
Craig B. Shaffer |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Contract |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1332 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Both |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
March 24, 2016 |
Filing
131
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 03/24/16 GRANTING 127 Motion for Leave to Restrict ; and GRANTING 128 Motion for Leave To File a Revised Motion for Partial Summary Judgment.(nmarb, )
|
September 22, 2015 |
Filing
85
ORDER approving and adopting 55 Recommendation of the United States Magistrate Judge. That DCP Midstream, LP's Motion To Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) 24 is granted. Defendant DCP Midstream, LP is dropped as a party to this action. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 9/22/2015.(mlace, )
|
June 18, 2015 |
Filing
76
MINUTE ORDER granting 75 DCP Midstream, LP's Motion for Leave To File Surreply to Plaintiff's Objections to the Magistrate Judge's Recommendations that its Motion To Dismiss Be Granted (Dkt. 65) by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 6/18/15.(mlace, )
|
June 1, 2015 |
Filing
71
STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 6/1/15. ORDERED that when filing restricted documents, parties MUST fully comply with the requirements of D.C.ColoL.CivR. 7.2. (cbssec)
|
April 24, 2015 |
Filing
54
COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer: Motion Hearing held on 4/24/2015. Finding as moot 39 Motion to Expedite. Finding as moot 47 APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court. Finding as moot 48 Motion to Expedite. Finding as moot 20 Motion to Stay. Granting 36 Motion to Amend/Correct/Modify. Exhibit 1 to this motion is accepted and deemed as filed today. The court RECOMMENDS LP's MOTION 24 to Dismiss P ursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) be GRANTED. The court RECOMMENDS the breach of contact claim be dismissed with prejudice, the declaratory judgment claim be dismissed with prejudice, and the unjust enrichment claim be dismissed without prejudice. The court RECOMMENDS the Plaintiff be allowed to file an amended complaint. Parties have 14 days to file an objection starting from April 25, 2015. Scheduling Conference set for 5/21/2015 11:00 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer. Proposed scheduling order due 5/18/2015. FTR: Courtroom A-402. (amont, )
|
April 23, 2015 |
Filing
53
ORDER denying 19 Motion for Remand and Request for Attorney's Fees by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 4/23/15.(dkals, )
|
April 2, 2015 |
Filing
46
COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer: Telephonic Motion Hearing held on 4/2/2015. Denying 41 Motion to Vacate. Denying 42 Motion to Expedite. FTR: Courtroom A-402. (amont)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?