Pak Mail Centers of America, Inc. v. Kim
Plaintiff: Pak Mail Centers of America, Inc.
Defendant: Bum Sik Kim
Case Number: 1:2014cv02634
Filed: September 23, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Arapahoe
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Watanabe
Nature of Suit: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER Granting 30 Plaintiff Pak Mail Centers of America, Inc.'s (Pak Mail) Motion for Leave to Conduct Discovery, as set forth in the Order.Plaintiff Pak Mail's Second Motion for Default Judgment 24 is held in abeyance until Plaintiff Pak Mail can obtain the requested discovery. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 5/7/2015.(emill)
December 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MINUTE ORDER granting 17 Motion for Extension of Time; granting 21 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; denying without prejudice 10 Motion for Entry of Default and Default Judgment, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 12/12/2014. Bum Sik Kim answer due up to and including 1/12/2015. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 2/5/2015 11:00 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. (slibi, )
September 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE AND SETTING DEADLINE FOR FILING OF PILOT PROGRAM CONSENT FORM. On or before 11/10/2014, parties shall complete and file the Pilot Program Consent Form 6 . Scheduling Conference set for 11/24/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. Consent Form due by 11/10/2014. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 9/25/2014. (emill)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pak Mail Centers of America, Inc. v. Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pak Mail Centers of America, Inc.
Represented By: Elizabeth Harris Getches
Represented By: Jason David Hermele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bum Sik Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?