Pelle et al v. Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Leonard L. Pelle and Katherine Pelle
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2014cv02713
Filed: October 3, 2014
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Boulder
Presiding Judge: Kristen L. Mix
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 17, 2015 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 34 The Joint Stipulation for Dismissal With Prejudice and this case is dismissed with prejudice, each party to pay its own attorneys' fees and costs. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 11/17/2015. (mlace, )
March 23, 2015 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 23 Stipulation of Dismissal of Party filed by Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company. Katherine Pelle terminated. by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 3/23/15. (jdyne, )
March 13, 2015 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE: This matter has been scheduled for a four day jury trial on the docket of Judge R. Brooke Jackson in the U.S. District Courthouse, Courtroom A902, 9th Floor, 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado, to commence on February 29, 2016 at 9:00 a.m. A Trial Preparation Conference is set for February 12, 2016 at 1:30 p.m. Please see the order for additional details. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 3/13/2015. (rbjsec. )
January 14, 2015 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SET SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: This matter comes before the Court sua sponte. In light of the decline of consent to a magistrate judge by one or more of the parties in this case, the Scheduling Conference set March 26, 2015 at 10:30 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix is VACATED. The parties are ordered to set an initial scheduling conference in this Court (with Judge Jackson) pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.1. Please see the order for details. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 1/14/2015. (rbjsec. )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pelle et al v. Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leonard L. Pelle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katherine Pelle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: Lyndsay K. Arundel
Represented By: Brian John Spano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?