San Juan Citizens Alliance, Inc. v. Bureau of Land Management
Plaintiff: San Juan Citizens Alliance, Inc.
Defendant: Bureau of Land Management
Case Number: 1:2014cv02784
Filed: October 10, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: La Plata
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDERS ON CROSS-MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT Defendant's motion for summary judgment Doc. 72 is denied as to claim one and granted with respect to the third claim which is dismissed. Plaintiff's cross-motion for summary judgment Doc. 89 is denied. Defendant's motion for leave to file updated motion for summary judgment Doc. 90 is moot, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 8/29/2018. (ktera)
December 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE Pursuant to the hearing held on December 3, 2015 40 , a scheduling conference will be held on February 12, 2016, at 10:00 a.m. in the Conference Room, Second Floor, the Byron White United States Courthouse, 1823 Stout Street, Denver, Colorado.. The proposed order (original only) on paper, shall be submitted directly to chambers by 4:00 p.m. on February 4, 2016. The conference is conducted with lead counsel present in person. No parties or representatives of parties will be permitted to attend, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 12/7/15. (ktera)
December 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Senior Judge Richard P. Matsch: Motion Hearing held on 12/3/2015. Denying 36 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Bureau of Land Management answer due 1/15/2016. Scheduling Conference set for 2/12/2016 10:00 AM in Courtroom A before Judge Richard P. Matsch. FTR: K. Terasaki. (rkeec)
March 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting 29 joint motion to vacate the March 23, 2015 conference, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 3/19/15. (ktera)
January 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER that a scheduling conference will be held on February 12, 2015, at 10:00 a.m. in the Conference Room, Second Floor, the Byron White United States Courthouse, 1823 Stout Street, Denver, Colorado, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 1/8/2015. (evana, )
January 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER Upon review of the expedited joint motion to withdraw several motions Docs. 7 , 16 , 17 , and 18 and vacate the January 7, 2015, hearing 23 , it is ORDERED that the motion is granted. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the Defendant shall file an answer to the Complaint on or before January 21, 2015. The Court will set a scheduling conference upon notice of availability of counsel, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 1/5/2015.(evana, )
December 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER that on Monday, December 29, 2014, counsel for the parties will be contacted to set a date and time for a hearing on the motions to extend time and Mr. Wu shall inform the United States Attorney John Walsh of the need for this hearing and the need for his personal appearance at the hearing to explain the assignment of this matter within his office, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 12/24/2014. (evana, )
October 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 10/27/14 Setting Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference and Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Scheduling Conference set for 2/26/2015 11:00 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland. (nmarb, ) (Main Document 5 replaced on 10/27/2014) (nmarb, ). Modified on 10/27/2014 to replace document with amended document showing correct year of hearing. (nmarb, ).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: San Juan Citizens Alliance, Inc. v. Bureau of Land Management
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: San Juan Citizens Alliance, Inc.
Represented By: Allison N. Melton
Represented By: Travis Earl Stills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bureau of Land Management
Represented By: Katherine Mesenbring Field
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?