Beatty et al v. Mortgageit, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Thomas J. Beatty and Deborah Q. Beatty
Defendant: Mortgageit, Inc., Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Bank of New York Mellon, The, Bank of America NA and Public Trustee of Douglas County, Colorado
Case Number: 1:2014cv02843
Filed: October 17, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Douglas
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Presiding Judge: Marcia S. Krieger
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER DENYING REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF PARTIES OR CLAIMS WITH LEAVE TO REFILE by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 2/17/16.(msksec, )
June 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 44 COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for Status Conference held on 6/10/2015 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Joint Motion to Amend Scheduling Order 40 is GRANTED IN PART. The Scheduling Order is modified as follows:Plaintiff's initial disclosures due by 6/22/2015. Discovery due by 8/28/2015. Dispositive Motions due by 9/30/2015. FTR: Courtroom C-205. (bsimm, )
February 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 36 TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER - CIVIL by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 2/27/15. (msksec, )
October 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Setting Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference and Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting set for 2/26/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 401, before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 10/27/14. (dkals, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beatty et al v. Mortgageit, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas J. Beatty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Q. Beatty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgageit, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Melissa Louise Cizmorris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of New York Mellon, The
Represented By: Melissa Louise Cizmorris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America NA
Represented By: Melissa Louise Cizmorris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Public Trustee of Douglas County, Colorado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?