Hicks v. Sprint Nextel Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Brian Hicks
Defendant: Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint Nextel Company, LP, Sprint Communications Company, LP and Sprint Spectrum, LP
Case Number: 1:2014cv02857
Filed: October 20, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Gordon P. Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - Civil Rights (U.S. not a defendant)
Cause of Action: 28:1983 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER granting 46 Motion to Dismiss by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 3/15/16.(jdyne, )
January 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 72 MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 70 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Supplementation of Sprints Initial Disclosures, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 1/11/2016.(emill)
October 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 67 MINUTEORDER Granting 61 Defendants' Motion to Stay Discovery. All proceedings in this case are STAYED pending resolution of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss 46 . Denying without prejudice 64 Plaintiff's Second Motion for I ssuance of Subpoenas, to be refilled if and when the stay is lifted. Status Report by each party due by 1/5/2016 in the event Defendants' Motion to Dismiss has not been ruled on by Judge Jackson. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 10/29/2015.(emill)
October 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 59 MINUTE ORDER granting 57 Motion for Issuance of Subpoenas, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 10/01/2015.(slibi, )
September 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 53 MINUTE ORDER denying as moot 51 Plaintiff's Motion for Early and Expedited Discovery. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 9/11/2015.(emill)
July 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MINUTE ORDER denying 37 Plaintiff's Motion for Issuance of Summons and Specially Appointed Serving, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 7/8/2015.(emill)
June 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE FOR PRO SE PLAINTIFF Status Conference set for 8/24/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 6/23/2015. (emill)
June 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MINUTE ORDER denying as moot 29 Motion for Disposition Regarding Plaintiffs Motion for Reconsideration filed on June 2, 2015 by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 6/5/15.(dkals, )
May 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting 23 Motion to Reconsider by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 5/29/15.(dkals, )
April 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER dismissing this action with prejudice, and denying leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 4/13/15. 9 Motion to Amend Complaint, 10 Renewed Ex Parte Motion to Take Expedited Discovery, 18 Motion for Extension of Time to Serve Summons and Complaint, and 20 Second Motion to Amend are denied as moot. (dkals, )
January 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting 13 MOTION for Reconsideration, and reinstating this action, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 1/8/15. (dkals, )
December 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER denying motions 8 and 9 by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 12/9/14.(dkals, )
December 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER dismissing this action without prejudice, and denying leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 12/3/14. (dkals, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hicks v. Sprint Nextel Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Hicks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sprint Nextel Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sprint Nextel Company, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sprint Communications Company, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sprint Spectrum, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?