Lezama v. Tall Pines Painting, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Ricardo Lezama
Defendant: Tall Pines Painting, Inc. and Bryan Kelly
Case Number: 1:2014cv02953
Filed: October 30, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Arapahoe
Presiding Judge: Kathleen M. Tafoya
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 05:704
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER denying 11 Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint. The stay of briefing on collective action certification (ECF No. 13 ) is LIFTED. Defendants shall file their response to to Lezama's Motion for Conditional Collective Action Certification (ECF No. 4 ) no later than 5/4/2015. Lezama shall file his reply, if any, no later than 5/18/2015. By Judge William J. Martinez on 4/13/2015. (alowe)
January 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 2/3/2015 09:30 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 1/15/15. (sgrim)
November 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Setting Scheduling/Planning Conference and Setting Deadline for Filing of Pilot Program Consent Form; Consent Form due on or before 2/3/2015. Scheduling Conference set for 2/3/2015 09:30 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 11/12/14. (morti, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lezama v. Tall Pines Painting, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricardo Lezama
Represented By: Brandt Powers Milstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tall Pines Painting, Inc.
Represented By: Gregg E. Kay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryan Kelly
Represented By: Gregg E. Kay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?