Weaver v. Silva et al
Plaintiff: David Weaver
Defendant: Sam Silva, Ross Blank and City of Steamboat Springs, Colorado
Case Number: 1:2014cv02963
Filed: October 31, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Routt
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Watanabe
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER granting 70 Motion to Dismiss Party. Defendant City of Steamboat Springs, Colorado is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE from this proceeding, with each party to pay his or its own attorney's fees and costs. By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 10/19/2015. (athom, )
October 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 71 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 10/13/15 GRANTING 66 Motion to Amend/Correct/Modify Exhibits. The Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED TO RESTRICT documents [#44-1] and [#58-1] as Level 1 restricted documents.The previously scheduled Status Conference set for October 13, 2015 at 11:30 a.m. is hereby VACATED.(nmarb, ) Modified on 10/13/2015 to add Status Conference information. (nmarb, ).
September 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER granting 64 Stipulated Motion to Dismiss. Defendants Sam Silva and Ross Blank are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE from this proceeding. By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 09/30/2015. (athom, )
August 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 56 COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for Motion Hearing held on 8/31/2015 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint 44 is DENIED. Plaintiff is granted leave to file a Third Amended Complaint on or before 9/8/2015. The Parties are ordered to meet and confer regarding an appropriate Third Amended Complaint that may be submitted pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a). FTR: Courtroom C-204. (bsimm, )
April 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 4/20/15. To the extent that Plaintiff seeks to compel any pre-employment screening materials, such Motion to Compel should be filed no later than April 23, 2015; Defendants' response to any Motion to Compel filed by Plaintiff should be filed no later than noon on April 27, 2015; and Should a Motion be filed, the Parties are directed to contact Chambers to set a telephonic hearing on the issue for the afternoon of April 27, 2015. (bsimm, )
April 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 35 Stipulation and Protective Order. By Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 4/13/2015.(tscha, )
January 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER SETTING RULE 16(b) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND RULE 26(f) PLANNING MEETING by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 1/16/15. Scheduling Conference set for 3/20/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland. (bsimm, )
January 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER granting in part 8 Unopposed Motion to Vacate and Re-Set Scheduling Conference, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 1/02/2015. Scheduling Conference set for 1/07/2015 is VACATED and RESET on 1/27/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. (slibi, )
November 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE AND SETTING DEADLINE FOR FILING OF PILOT PROGRAM CONSENT FORM. On or before 12/23/2014, parties shall complete and file the Pilot Program Consent Form 6 . Scheduling Conference set for 1/7/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. Consent Form due by 12/23/2014. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 11/4/2014. (emill)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Weaver v. Silva et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sam Silva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ross Blank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Steamboat Springs, Colorado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Weaver
Represented By: Grant Patrick Bursek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?