Blanco et al v. USA
Plaintiff: Richard Blanco and Patricia Duke
Defendant: USA
Case Number: 1:2014cv02987
Filed: November 3, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: R. Brooke Jackson
Nature of Suit: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
Cause of Action: 26:6532
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 35 FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS AND ORDER OF JUDGMENT. Final judgment shall enter in favor of the defendant and against the plaintiffs. This civil action and all claims therein are dismissed with prejudice. Defendant is awarded its reasonable costs, by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 1/25/2016. (ebuch)
January 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER denying 18 and 19 Motions for Summary Judgment; granting 22 Motion to File Response Out of Time. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 01/06/2016. (athom, )
February 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE: This matter has been scheduled for a two-day bench trial on the docket of Judge R. Brooke Jackson in the U.S. District Courthouse, Courtroom A902, 9th Floor, 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado, to commence on January 11, 2016 at 9:00 a.m. A Trial Preparation Conference is set for January 5, 2016 at 1:30 p.m. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 2/18/2015. (rbjsec.)
November 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO SET SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: The parties are ordered to set an initial scheduling conference in this Court (with Judge Jackson) pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.1 no later than 45 days after the answer, motion to dismiss or other response to the complaint is filed. See the order for details. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 11/13/2014. (rbjsec.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blanco et al v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Blanco
Represented By: Daniel J. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Duke
Represented By: Daniel J. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?